Mary Selvaggio v. Fed. Retirement Thrift Invest., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5056

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 30, 2016 at 5:12 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207510028 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1445357] granting motion for summary affirmance [1428327-2]. The clerk is directed to withhold issuance of the mandate herein until seven days after resolution of any timely petition for rehearing or petition for rehearing en banc. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers, and Tatel. [13-5056]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488019 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
    REPLY FILED [1431788] by Federal Retirement Thrift Investment Board and Thrift Savings Plan to response [1430168-2] [Service Date: 04/19/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-5056] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207485180 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
      MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1430168] by Mary P. Selvaggio to motion for summary affirmance [1428327-2] [Service Date: 04/10/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-5056]--[Edited 04/11/2013 by LMC] (Howard, William)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207481797 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION filed [1428327] by Federal Retirement Thrift Investment Board and Thrift Savings Plan for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/15/2013) [Service Date: 04/01/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [13-5056] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207478131 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1426272] by Mary P. Selvaggio [Service Date: 03/19/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-5056] (Howard, William)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207477707 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1426070] by Federal Retirement Thrift Investment Board and Thrift Savings Plan [Service Date: 03/18/2013 ] [13-5056] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207477702 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1426068] by Peter C. Pfaffenroth and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees Federal Retirement Thrift Investment Board and Thrift Savings Plan. [13-5056] (Pfaffenroth, Peter)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207477134 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1425766] by Mary P. Selvaggio [Service Date: 03/15/2013 ] [13-5056] (Howard, William)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207477129 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1425764] by Mary P. Selvaggio [Service Date: 03/15/2013 ] [13-5056] (Howard, William)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 46 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?