Patrick Brady v. Hanger Orthopedic Group, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 08-16370

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:18 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED.(PAR, AWT and JAR) [7120224] (SW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (PAMELA ANN RYMER, A. WALLACE TASHIMA and JANE A. RESTANI) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7094220] (DD)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:SC): The Court is of the opinion that the facts and legal arguments are adequately presented in the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. Therefore, this matter is ordered submitted without oral argument on October 9, 2009, at San Francisco, California. [7051100] (SC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
        Notice of Oral Argument on OCTOBER 9, 2009 Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7044432] (AM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
          Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: appellees shall file an answering brief on or before September 10, 2008; appellant may file an optional reply brief on or before September 24, 2008. (SC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:EPM): This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. A settlement assessment conference will be held by telephone on July 11, 2008, at 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before August 4, 2008; appellees shall file an answering brief on or before September 3, 2008; appellant may file an optional reply brief on or before September 17, 2008. (SC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 58 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?