BKGTH Productions LLC v. Does 1-14
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00667

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 12:05 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Letter from Court
    LETTER from the Court to plaintiff stating that this case will be dismissed if proof of service is not filed within 21 days (cc: All Counsel) (vkb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re [13] Request filed by John Doe, [8] Objections, [11] Objections filed by John Doe, [9] Objections filed by John Doe: The "objections" of the John Doe defendants are overruled. To the extent that any of these filings may be construed as a motion to quash a subpoena, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aaron E Goodstein on 8/12/2013. (cc: all counsel)(djo)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K Russell on behalf of John Doe 10. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/4/2013, Entered: 8/4/2013 Response - non motion
          RESPONSE filed by BKGTH Productions LLC (Vogt, Keith)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Request
            REQUEST by John Doe (No 12 - IP Address 24.241.232.238) to not be included in the civil suit (vkb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Response - non motion
              RESPONSE filed by BKGTH Productions LLC to Doe 7's Objection to Subpoena (Vogt, Keith)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Objections
                OBJECTIONS by John Doe (No 7 - IP Address 68.117.2.59) to the release of information (vkb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Response - non motion
                  RESPONSE filed by BKGTH Productions LLC to Doe 5's Objections to Subpoena (Vogt, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Objections
                    OBJECTIONS by John Doe (No 5 - IP Address 66.190.36.155) to the release of personal information or records (vkb)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Objections
                      OBJECTIONS by Does 1-14 to Release Charter Communication Account Information. (Recka, Joseph)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/23/2013, Entered: 6/23/2013 Report
                        Report To Copyright Office. (Vogt, Keith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                          ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Aaron E Goodstein on 6/18/2013 granting [4] Motion for Discovery. (cc: all counsel) (djo)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Brief in Support of Motion
                            BRIEF in Support filed by BKGTH Productions LLC re [4] MOTION for Discovery Prior to 26(f) . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint Ex B)(Vogt, Keith)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013, Terminated: 6/18/2013 Motion for Discovery
                              MOTION for Discovery Prior to 26(f) by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Darrent Griffin, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Vogt, Keith)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Disclosure Statement
                                  DISCLOSURE Statement by BKGTH Productions LLC. (Vogt, Keith)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by BKGTH Productions LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1703888) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Vogt, Keith)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?