Proffitt et al v. Greenlight Financial Services et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-01180
District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 4:53 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nancy J. Proffitt, Plaintiff
No Logo Timothy E. Proffitt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mountain State Justice, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Bird +1 304 326 0188 +1 304 326 0189 sara@msjlaw.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F. Hedges 1 +1 304 344 3144 +1 304 344 3145 dan@msjlaw.org
v.
No Logo AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Matthew D. Patterson +1 803 255 9577 +1 803 253 7500

Toggle Switch Represented by KAY CASTO CHANEY LOVE & WISE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Booker +1 304 345 8900 +1 304 345 8909 wbooker@kaycasto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ariella Silberman +1 304 345 8900 +1 304 345 8909 asilberman@kaycasto.com
No Logo Greenlight Financial Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin & Goodwin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie Goodwin Fenwick +1 304 346 7000 +1 304 344 9692 cgf@goodwingoodwin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Ward +1 304 346 7000 +1 304 344 9692 jmw@goodwingoodwin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L. Wilson +1 304 346 7000 +1 304 344 9692 vlw@goodwingoodwin.com
No Logo MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, Defendant
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "U. S. Bank National Association"
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ALLEN GUTHRIE & THOMAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne H. Xu +1 304 345 7250 +1 304 345 9941 whxu@agmtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAY CASTO CHANEY LOVE & WISE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Terrance Rodgers +1 304 345 8900 +1 304 345 8901 trodgers@kaycasto.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED DISMISSAL ORDER directing that this action is dismissed with prejudice; further directing that the Clerk of the Court forward a certified copy of this order to counsel of record. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/17/2011. (cc: attys) (lca)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
    PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Dismissal Order by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association, Greenlight Financial Services, WMC Mortgage, LLC (Bird, Sara) (Modified on 11/15/2011 to add additional filers) (skh).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER directing that a hearing be held in this case on 11/18/2011 at 11:00 AM in Charleston unless a final order is sooner presented to the court for entry. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/4/2011. (cc: attys) (cbo)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting plaintiffs' 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to the pending motions for summary judgment. Responses due by 10/7/2011. Replies due by 10/14/2011. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/3/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
          REPLY by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt to 128 Opposition to Motion to Enlarge Times. (Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text on 10/2/2011) (skh).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
            OPPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services to 127 MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt to Enlarge Times to File Responses and Replies to Pending Summary Judgment Motions (Ward, Joseph) (Modified "objections" to "opposition" to conform to filed document on 9/29/2011) (skh).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt to Enlarge Times to File Responses and Replies to Pending Summary Judgment Motions (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 9/26/2011) (skh).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services of James L. Brown on September 28, 2011 at 10:00 am (Ward, Joseph)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting the parties' 124 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to Pending Summary Judgment Motions; further directing that the deadlines are enlarged as follows: Responses due by 9/26/2011; Replies due by 10/6/2011. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/9/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh) (Modified for clarity of text on 9/12/2011) (skh).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                    JOINT MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association, Greenlight Financial Services, Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC to Enlarge Times to File Responses and Replies to Pending Summary Judgment Motions (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text and to add additional filers on 9/8/2011) (skh).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by WMC Mortgage Corporation of Michael J. Burrell, III on September 9, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. (Rodgers, R.)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                        JOINDER by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association in 118 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation for Summary Judgment (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 9/7/2011) (skh).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM by Greenlight Financial Services in support of 120 MOTION by Greenlight Financial Services for Summary Judgment (Ward, Joseph)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION by Greenlight Financial Services for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B continued, # 4 Exhibit B continued, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Ward, Joseph) (Modified description of attachments on 9/6/2011) (skh).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage Corporation in support of 118 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation for Summary Judgment (Rodgers, R.)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Rodgers, R.) (Modified description of attachments on 9/6/2011) (skh).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association in support of 116 MOTION by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association for Summary Judgment on Counts II and IV of the Second Amended Complaint (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 8/22/2011) (skh).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association for Summary Judgment on Counts II and IV of the Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits B and C)(Silberman, Ariella) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to edit description of attachments on 8/22/2011) (skh).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Peoples Bank. (Ward, Joseph)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Consumer Credit Counseling of the Mid-Ohio Valley. (Ward, Joseph)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of certain counts in plaintiffs' second amended complaint by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association, Greenlight Financial Services, Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC (Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text and to add additional filers on 8/11/2011) (skh).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association for Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Silberman, Ariella)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE Of Intent To Serve Subpoena Upon Peoples Bank with attached Subpoena by Greenlight Financial Services (Ward, Joseph)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE Of Intent To Serve Subpoena Upon Consumer Credit Counseling Service of the Mid-Ohio Valley, Inc. with attached subpoena by Greenlight Financial Services (Ward, Joseph)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greenlight Financial Services, Inc. and WMC Mortgage, LLC, for Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures of Anna Desimone. (Ward, Joseph) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add additional filer on 8/2/2011) (taq). (Modified on 8/2/2011 to remove disclosures) (skh).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greenlight Financial Services, Inc. and WMC Mortgage LLC for Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures of Jay Goldman. (Rodgers, R.) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add additional filer on 8/2/2011) (taq).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Mediation by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt (Bird, Sara)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: Granting the 104 JOINT MOTION to extend certain deadlines in the 4/19/2011 81 scheduling order, modifying the schedule as follows: Expert disclosure by opposing party due by 8/1/2011; and expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 8/15/2011. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 8/19/2011. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/5/2011, with Responses due by 9/12/2011, and Replies due by 9/19/2011. With the exception of the modifications herein, the requirements and directives of the 4/19/2011 scheduling order to remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 7/20/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER denying without prejudice WMC Mortgage, LLC's 94 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 7/19/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cbo)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                            JOINT MOTION by Greenlight Financial Services, Timothy E. Proffitt, Nancy J. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, WMC Mortgage Corporation to Extend Deadlines (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Joseph) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add additional filers on 7/18/2011) (skh).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Jodi A. Chiappetta, Claims Administrator, Regulatory & Licensing Department, Lender Processing Services Company. (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                THIRD AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services of Nancy Proffitt on July 27, 2011 at 10:00 am (Ward, Joseph) (Modified text to add "third" on 6/24/2011) (skh).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures (Bird, Sara)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE Of Intent To Serve Subpoena by Greenlight Financial Services (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena To Produce Documents)(Ward, Joseph) (Modified description of attachment on 6/14/2011) (skh).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for Greenlight Financial Services' Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendants (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt in opposition of 94 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide Full And Complete Answers To Certain Interrogatories and Full And Complete Responses To Certain Requests for Production of Documents (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bird, Sara)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Supplemental Answers and Responses to Defendant WMC Mortgage LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Bird, Sara)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER TO 88 Second Amended Complaint by WMC Mortgage Corporation.(Rodgers, R.) (Modified for clarity of text on 5/28/2011) (skh).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND GREENLIGHT FINANCIAL SERVICES REGARDING COUNTS re: Second Amended Complaint by Greenlight Financial Services (Ward, Joseph) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 5/25/2011) (skh).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide Full And Complete Answers To Certain Interrogatories Contained In "WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories To Plaintiffs" And Full And Complete Responses To Certain Requests For Production Of Documents Contained In "WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents to Plaintiffs" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND WMC MORTGAGE, LLC REGARDING COUNTS II, III AND IV OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Rodgers, R.) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 5/25/2011) (skh).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER TO 88 Second Amended Complaint by Greenlight Financial Services.(Ward, Joseph) (Modified on 5/24/2011 to note answer is to the "second" amended complaint) (skh).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for Defendant Greenlight Financial Services' Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Ward, Joseph) (Modified on 5/23/2011 to remove discovery answers and responses) (skh).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER TO 88 Second Amended Complaint by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association.(Booker, William) (Modified on 5/19/2011 to note answer is to the second amended complaint) (skh).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association for Third Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Booker, William)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt against America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U. S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation. (cbo)(Modified on 5/12/2011 to remove Exhibit A sticker from image of document) (skh).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting plaintiffs' 86 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; directing that the proposed second amended complaint attached to the motion to amend is filed today. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/10/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (cbo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bird, Sara) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to edit description of attachment on 5/9/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Greenlight Financial Services (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER In accordance with the 80 Memorandum Opinion and Order; directing that the Clerk terminate WMC Mortgage Corporation's 56 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/6/2011. (cbo)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of WMC Mortgage, LLC Representative(s) on May 5, 2011 at 2:00 pm (Bird, Sara) (Modified text to add "second" on 4/27/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Answers and Responses to Defendant WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting the parties' 76 JOINT MOTION to Amend the 52 Scheduling Order; and modifying the schedule as follows: Discovery requests to be completed by 6/23/2011. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/17/2011, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/17/2011, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/27/2011. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 8/1/2011. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/22/2011, with Responses due by 9/5/2011, and Replies due by 9/12/2011. Settlement meeting and mediation deadline by 10/24/2011. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/31/2011, with responses due by 11/7/2011. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/26/2011, and Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2011 at 11:00 AM in Charleston. Proposed Jury Charge due by 12/5/2011. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 12/12/2011 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2011 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. With the exception of the herein modifications, the requirements and directives of the preceding scheduling order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/19/2011. (cc:attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Count Six is dismissed without prejudice; in the event the Proffitts wish to attempt to replead that count, any amended complaint must be filed by 5/9/2011; granting the 68 JOINT MOTION by ASC and U.S. Bank and the 70 MOTION by Greenlight to join WMC Mortgage Corporation's 56 MOTION to dismiss, with respect to that portion of the motion seeking the dismissal of Count Six and denied in all other respects; and granting the Proffitts' 71 MOTION to Strike the moving defendants' motions to join in all respects except insofar as the motions to join seek the dismissal of Count Six. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/19/2011. (cc: attys) (taq)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation for WMC Mortgage, LLC's Objections, Answers, And Responses To "Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories & Request For Production Of Documents To Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation n/k/a WMC Mortgage, LLC" (Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/15/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Protective Order by America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage, LLC to Amend 52 Scheduling Order (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified on 4/11/2011 for clarity of text and to add additional filers) (skh).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE to April 25, 2011 for Plaintiffs to Serve Answers and Responses to Defendant WMC Mortgage,LLC's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text and to add additional filer on 4/11/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of WMC Mortgage, LLC Representative(s) on April 27, 2011 at 2:00 pm (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE for WMC Mortgage, LLC to Answer and/or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories & Request for Production of Documents to April 15, 2011 by WMC Mortgage Corporation, Nancy J. Profitt, Timothy E. Profitt (Rodgers, R.) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add additional filers on 4/5/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services of Timothy and Nancy Proffitt on May 6, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (Ward, Joseph) (Modified title of entry to add "second" on 3/29/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt to Strike 68 JOINT MOTION by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association for Joinder in 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the Amended Complaint and 70 MOTION by Greenlight Financial Services for Joinder in 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the Amended Complaint (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Greenlight Financial Services for Joinder in 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND WMC MORTGAGE, LLC REGARDING COUNTS III, IV AND V OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Rodgers, R.)(Modified title of entry to conform to filed document on 3/21/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association for Joinder in 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint (Booker, William) (Modified for clarity of text on 3/21/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY by WMC Mortgage Corporation to 60 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation for WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set Of Requests For Admissions To Plaintiffs (Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation for WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents To Plaintiffs (Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation for WMC Mortgage, LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories To Plaintiffs (Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of WMC Mortgage Representative(s) on April 12, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation n/k/a WMC Mortgage, LLC (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT II of the Amended Complaint by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt (Bird, Sara) (Modified title of entry to conform to filed document on 3/3/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt in opposition of 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bird, Sara) (Modified description of attachment on 3/3/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION extending time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation's motion to dismiss to 3/2/2011 by Timothy E. Proffitt, Nancy J. Proffitt, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Bird, Sara) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add additional filers on 2/24/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation's motion to dismiss to 2/25/11 by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text and to add additional filer on 2/5/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage Corporation in support of 56 MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint (Rodgers, R.) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 1/18/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by WMC Mortgage Corporation to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VI of the 40 Amended Complaint (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rodgers, R.) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to add link to #40 amended complaint on 1/18/2011) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO 40 Amended Complaint by WMC Mortgage Corporation.(Rodgers, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN RECEIPT NOTIFICATION FROM SECRETARY OF STATE for WMC Mortgage Corporation re: 53 Summons Returned Executed by Secretary of State: Return Receipt Card signed on by C. Legg on 12/28/2010; answer deadline previously set for WMC Mortgage Corporation re: 40 Amended Complaint. (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to WMC Mortgage Corporation, re: 40 Amended Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 12/23/2010 as to WMC Mortgage Corporation; answer due 1/13/2011. (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER the plaintiffs are directed to serve the newly added defendant forthwith and to file the return of service with the court by 1/15/2011; granting the parties' 51 JOINT MOTION so as to permit a modification of the existing schedule as set forth herein and denied in all other respects; directing that the 35 schedule is modified as follows: Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/23/2011. Expert disclosure by party with burden of proof due by 05/06/2011, opposing party due by 06/06/2011, and Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 06/21/2011. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 07/05/2011. Filing of dispositive motions due by 07/25/2011, with responses due by 8/8/2011, and replies due by 8/15/2011. Settlement meeting and mediation deadline by 9/26/2011. Filing of motions in limine due by 10/03/2011, with responses due by 10/10/2011. Plaintiffs' portion of pretrial order to defendant due by 09/29/2011, and proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/06/2011. Pretrial conference set for 10/14/2011 at 01:30 PM. Proposed jury instructions to be filed by 11/07/2011. Final settlement conference on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM. Trial set for 11/15/2011 at 09:30 AM. With the exception of the herein modifications, the requirements and directives of the original scheduling order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/22/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, U.S. Bank National Association to Suspend 35 Scheduling Order and Continue Case (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified text to conform to filed document on 12/21/2010) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for WMC Mortgage Corporation re: 40 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies mailed to Sara Bird for service. (skh)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for WMC Mortgage Corporation (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER TO 40 Amended Complaint by Greenlight Financial Services.(Fenwick, Carrie)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to U.S. Bank National Association re: 40 Amended Complaint. Accepted by Secretary of State on 11/22/2010 as to U.S. Bank National Association; answer previously filed 11/23/2010. (taq) (Additional attachment added on 2/22/2011: # 1 Return Receipt Notification from WV Secretary of State) (ras)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER TO 40 Amended Complaint by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association.(Silberman, Ariella)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services of Timothy E. Proffitt, Nancy J. Proffitt on 11/19/2010 at 10:30 a.m. (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing that the proposed Amended Complaint is deemed filed; the amended complaint need not be served anew upon the existing defendants but to be served in accordance with Rule 4 as to the newly added defendant; the existing defendants must file their responsive pleadings within 20 days. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/18/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Greenlight Financial Services, America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association (Bird, Sara) (Modified text to conform to filed document and to correct party filers on 11/17/2010) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for U.S. Bank National Association, re: 40 Amended Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies mailed to plaintiffs' counsel for service. (lca)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt against America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation (rap)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Greenlight Financial Services of Timothy and Nancy Proffitt on Friday, November 19, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (Fenwick, Carrie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Disclosure (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Answers and Responses to Defendant Greenlight Financial Services' Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company and U.S. Bank National Association for Defendants America's Servicing Company and U.S. Bank National Association's Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Booker, William) Modified on 9/8/2010 to remove excess filer (rap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 33 JOINT MOTION to Amend 23 Scheduling Order, directing that the schedule is modified as follows: Discovery requests to be completed by 10/18/2010; and all depositions by 12/1/2010, the discovery completion date. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 10/8/2010, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 11/9/2010, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/17/2010. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/21/2010, with Responses due by 1/4/2011, and Replies due by 1/13/2011. Settlement Meeting to be held by 2/22/2011. Any mediation to be concluded by the settlement meeting date. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/28/2011, with responses due by 3/7/2011. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 3/25/2011, and Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2011 at 02:30 PM in Charleston. Proposed Jury Charge due by 5/2/2011. Final Settlement Conference at 02:30 PM on 5/9/2011 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2011 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/3/2010. (cc: attys) (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Bird (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association, Greenlight Financial Services to Amend 23 Scheduling Order (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text and to add additional filers on 8/20/2010) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association for Defendant America's Servicing Company and U.S. Bank's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Silberman, Ariella) Modified on 8/12/2010 to remove excess text (rap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Wilson, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                INCORRECT ENTRY: Image removed. (rap).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 8/9/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified on 8/7/2010 to add additional filers) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of Greenlight Financial Services Representative(s) on August 2, 2010 at 12:00pm (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendants (Ward, Joseph) (Modified on 8/2/2010 to correct typographical error) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Answers and Responses to Defendants America's Servicing Company and U.S. Bank National Association's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of Greenlight Financial Services Representative(s) on August 2, 2010 at 10:00am (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: granting the parties' 22 joint motion to amend the scheduling order. Discovery requests to be completed by 9/3/2010 and all depositions by 10/18/2010. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/19/2010, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/20/2010, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/4/2010. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 11/8/2010, with Responses due by 11/22/2010 and Replies due by 11/30/2010. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 1/10/2011. Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/17/2011, with responses due by 1/24/2011. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 1/12/2011, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2011 02:30 PM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charge due by 2/21/2011. Final Settlement Conference at 03:30 PM on 2/28/2011 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2011 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 6/21/2010. (cc: attys) (tmr) (Modified on 6/22/2010 to note #22 motion to amend scheduling order was granted) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, U.S. Bank National Association to Amend 10 Scheduling Order (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Sara) (Modified for clarity of text on 6/11/2010) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant America's Servicing Company (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice as moot defendants America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities, 2006-WMC 2, and U. S. Bank National Association 18 MOTION for pro hac vice admission. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/28/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Matthew D. Patterson on behalf of America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2. Local counsel: Ariella G. Silberman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # 0425-1257210. (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified on 5/3/2010 to add name of visiting attorney) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew D. Patterson (Silberman, Ariella)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt of America's Servicing Company Representative on May 5, 2010 at 10:00am (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Wilson, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Greenlight Financial Services for Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendants (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph M. Ward on behalf of Greenlight Financial Services. (Ward, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified for clarity of text on 2/5/2010) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt for Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Bird, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greenlight Financial Services for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Ward, Joseph) (Modified on 2/5/2010 to remove extra page from image) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The scheduling conference is cancelled; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/12/2010. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/7/2010; and all depositions by 7/20/2010, the discovery completion date. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 5/21/2010, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 6/21/2010, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/6/2010. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/9/2010, with Responses due by 8/23/2010, and Replies due by 9/1/2010. Settlement Meeting to be held by 10/11/2010. Any mediation concluded by the settlement meeting date. Motions in Limine due by 10/18/2010, with responses due by 10/25/2010. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/14/2010, and Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2010 01:30 PM in Charleston. Proposed Jury Charge due by 11/22/2010. Final Settlement Conference at 02:30 PM on 11/29/2010 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 11/30/2010 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 1/19/2010. (cc:attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by America's Servicing Company, Greenlight Financial Services, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, Nancy J. Proffitt, Timothy E. Proffitt, U.S. Bank National Association. (Wilson, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association for Defendant America's Servicing Company and US Bank's Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Tangible Things (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified on 12/7/2009 to remove extra filer) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/22/2009. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/4/2010. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/11/2010. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 1/25/2010 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/1/2010. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/4/2010. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/2/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association for First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Silberman, Ariella) (Modified on 11/23/2009 to remove extra filer) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenlight Financial Services.(Fenwick, Carrie) (Modified on 11/5/2009 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by America's Servicing Company, MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2, U.S. Bank National Association.(Silberman, Ariella) (Modified on 11/3/2009 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (skh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED AUGUST 1, 2006. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Stanley for discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Greenlight Financial Services. (mkw) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by America's Servicing Company, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust, 2006-WMC 2 with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt #0425-1119579. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkw) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?