BKGTH Productions, LLC v. Does 1-17
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01778

Tags
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 5:59 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BKGTH Productions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Texas Limited Liability Company David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Stephenson Jr. david.thunderlaw@gmail.com
v.
No Logo John (11) Doe, Defendant
No Logo John (12) Doe, Defendant
No Logo John (13) Doe, Defendant
No Logo John (17) Doe, Defendant
No Logo John (4) Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-17, Defendant
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal without prejudice filed in this case on 02/03/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 59 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 58 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve the remaining Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on or before February 4, 2014 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/10/14.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM regarding 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/9/14. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 56 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 55 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Hegarty 54 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. In accordance therewith, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Doe #12's Motion to Sever/Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder 32 is DENIED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 32 Doe #12's Motion to Sever/Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder be denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 52 Minute Order on Motion for Extension of Time to John Doe #12. Text Only Entry (mehcd) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 52 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Plaintiff's second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve the remaining defendants by 1/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/3/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM regarding 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/2/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 50 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE of Service by MAIL by Clerk of Court re 48 Minute Order, 44 Minute Order,, 47 Brief in Opposition to Motion, to John Doe #12. Text Only Entry (ervsl, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs Response docket # 47 to Doe #12's Motion to Sever/Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder-Amended docket # 32 . Doe #12 may file a reply brief in support of the motion to sever/dismiss on or before December 4, 2013. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of the Plaintiffs response brief docket # 47 , a copy of this Courts October 31, 2013 order docket # 44 , and a copy of this order to Doe #12 at the address listed in docket # 26 , by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2013. (ervsl, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BRIEF in Opposition to 32 MOTION to Sever /Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder--Amended filed by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ISP Production Response)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 44 Minute Order to John Doe Defendant #12. Text Only Entry. (mehcd) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena - Amended 31 is denied without prejudice. The Motion for Protective Order-Amended 33 is denied as moot. The Motion to Sever/Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder-Amended 32 will be adjudicated in a separate order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to correct the docket to show the motion as pending". The Clerk is also directed to mail a copy of this order to John Doe 12 at the address listed in docket #14 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/13. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 42 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to John Doe Defendant #12. Text Only Entry. (mehcd) Modified on 11/1/2013 to correct text (mehcd). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 by 12/2/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Party John (4) Doe, John (11) Doe and John (13) Doe terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal without prejudice filed in this case on 10/30/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/31/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service CenturyTel, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service Comcast, # 3 Exhibit Production Response--CenturyTel, # 4 Exhibit Production Response--Comcast)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 38 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 4, John Doe 11, and John Doe 13 by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                WITHDRAWN MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the following motions: 31 Defendant John Doe 12's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena - Amended, 32 John Doe 12's Motion to Sever/Dismiss Defendants for Improper Joinder - Amended, 33 John Doe 12's Motion for Protective Order - Amended, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/20/2013. (mehcd) Modified on 11/1/2013 pursuant to the MO of 10/31/13 (jjhsl, ). (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 32 MOTION to Sever filed by John (12) Doe. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    AMENDED ORDER re: 8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 31 MOTION to Quash filed by John (12) Doe, 33 MOTION for Protective Order filed by John (12) Doe. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant John (12) Doe. (trlee, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Sever/dismiss defendants for improper joinder, by Defendant John (12) Doe. (trlee, ) Modified on 11/1/2013 to Unterm motion pursuant to MO of 10/31/13 (jjhsl, ). (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Quash or modify subpoena, by Defendant John (12) Doe. (trlee, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re 28 Order on Motions mailed to John Doe #12. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Defendant John Doe 12's Motion to Proceed Anonymously 25 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant John Doe #12's Motion to Sever Defendants for Improper Joinder and to Vacate the Order Granting Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas and to Quash the Subpoena 24 is denied without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this order to the address provided by John Doe 12 in the filing at docket #26 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/05/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 25 MOTION for Order to filed by John (12) Doe, 24 MOTION for Order to filed by John (12) Doe. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/4/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by Defendant John (12) Doe. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Sever by Defendant John (12) Doe. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 22 Minute Order Mail to John Doe #12 Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER denying 20 Motion to Quash. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to John Doe #12 at the address listed in docket #14 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/29/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 20 MOTION to Quash Memorandum of John Doe 12 filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/28/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Memorandum of John Doe 12 by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Envelope cover, # 3 Exhibit Case Docket History, # 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Quash)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Party John (17) Doe terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice to dismiss filed in this case on 08/26/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 17 by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Quash by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/26/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 13 MOTION to Quash filed by John Does 1-17. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena and Motion to Dismiss by Defendant John Does 1-17. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Status report
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/17/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/10/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 memorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 7 MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Motion for leave
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to to Take Limited Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration in support of motion, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                                                                                REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hegarty due to BitTorrent case procedure. Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe no longer assigned to this case. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) Modified on 7/10/2013 to reflect change in magistrate judge assignment(agarc, ). (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff BKGTH Productions, LLC (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against John Does 1-17 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3435390), filed by BKGTH Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?