Seagate Technology LLC et al v. Western Digital Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:04-cv-03709
District Judge David S. Doty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2016 at 11:02 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Seagate Technology LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas B Watson +1 213 694 1200

Toggle Switch Represented by Hennigan Bennett & Dorman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick G. Dorman +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 dormanr@hbdlawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Milton Hadley +1 213 694 1135 +1 213 694 1234 lhadley@mckoolsmithhennigan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prairie Island Indian Community

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip R Mahowald +1 651 267 4006 +1 651 385 4140 pmahowald@piic.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Pearson +1 612 604 6692 +1 612 604 6892 dpearson@winthrop.com
No Logo Seagate US LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Peter R Goglia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J Otteson +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5786 william.otteson@usdoj.gov
No Logo Western Digital Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry L. Bundy +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Kerry.Bundy@faegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E Jorstad +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 ejorstad@faegre.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall E. Kahnke +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 Randall.Kahnke@FaegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Arthur Liebman +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 ken.liebman@FaegreBD.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D Baskin +1 949 760 0991 sbaskin@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Universal Hospital Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M Pulju +1 952 893 3227 +1 952 893 3237 LMPulju@uhs.com
No Logo Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/12/04 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. Court Reporter: Lori A. Simpson. 29 pgs. FILED CONVENTIONALLY. (HLL) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None
    Letter to Hennepin County District Court re certified copy for Order of Remand. (HLL) (Entered: 08/13/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 3 Motion to Remand to the District Court of Hennepin County, Minnesota. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/13/04. (SJH) (Entered: 08/13/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Peter R Goglia (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Otteson, William) (Entered: 08/13/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter R Goglia, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies Inc re 8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Liebman, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Peter R Goglia, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies Inc. (Liebman, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seagate Technology LLC, Seagate US LLC re 6 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 3 MOTION to Remand, 4 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 5 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Mahowald, Philip) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT of Philip R. Mahowald in SUPPORT OF 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Seagate Technology LLC, Seagate US LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Mahowald, Philip) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Seagate Technology LLC, Seagate US LLC. (Mahowald, Philip) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 3 MOTION to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2004 12:45 PM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Senior Judge David S Doty. (Mahowald, Philip) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Remand by Seagate Technology LLC, Seagate US LLC. (Mahowald, Philip) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Seagate Technology LLC, Seagate US LLC. (DFL) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peter R Goglia, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies Inc from Hennepin County,, filed by Peter R Goglia, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies Inc. Assigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson, rcpt. no. 274971, (Filing Fee $150.) (Attachments: # 1 summons and complaint# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DFL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2012: # 3 Cover Letter) (lmb). QC'd on 7/23/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 168 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?