District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Delaware District Court Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit United States Supreme Court

Delaware Coalition for Open Go v. Leo Strine, Jr., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 12-3859

Tags
Last Updated December 2, 2019 at 11:36 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Delaware Court of Chancery, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu
No Logo State of Delaware, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com
No Logo American Society Of Newspaper Editors, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Associated Press, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Atlantic Media, Inc., Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Bloomberg LP, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Ew Scripps Co, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Gannett Co Inc, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Maryland-delaware District Of Colombia Broadcasters Association, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Amicus Appellee
Officially listed as "New York Times Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
News Corporation News Corporation, Amicus Appellee
Officially listed as "News Corp"
Unknown Role, Euniverse, Inc.
Unknown Role, Fts, Inc.
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Fox Corp
Unknown Role, Pl Brands, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
National Public Radio, Inc. National Public Radio, Inc., Amicus Appellee
Officially listed as "Npr Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Public Citizen, Inc., Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Lawrence Nelson +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 snelson@citizen.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Reuters America LLC Reuters America LLC, Amicus Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Washington Post Company, LLC, Amicus Appellee
Officially listed as "Washington Post"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL BERRY +1 215 988 9773 berrym@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
No Logo Business Roundtable, Amicus Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy T. Englert, Jr. +1 202 775 4503 +1 202 775 4510 renglert@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Amicus Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy T. Englert, Jr. +1 202 775 4503 +1 202 775 4510 renglert@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc., Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Finger & Slanina LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Finger +1 302 573 2525 +1 302 573 2524 dfinger@delawgroup.com
No Logo Delaware State Bar Association, The Corporation Law Section, Not Party - Amicus Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Mark Hurd +1 302 658 9200 SHurd@mnat.com
No Logo The Hon Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
Space Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu
No Logo The Hon John W. Noble, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
Space Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu
No Logo The Hon Leo E. Strine, Jr., Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
Space Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com
No Logo The Hon Sam Glasscock, Iii, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
Space Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu
No Logo The Hon. J. Travis Laster, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre G. Bouchard +1 302 573 3500 abouchard@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@friedlandergorris.com
Space Jeffrey M. Gorris +1 302 573 3508 jgorris@friedlandergorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Hamermesh +1 302 477 2132 lahamermesh@widener.edu
Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1-11-cv-01015
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1-11-cv-01015
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of U.S. Supreme Court disposition at No. 13-869. Motions for leave to file a brief and amici curiae filed by TechNet and Law Firms are granted on 03/24/14. Petition for Writ of Ceriorari filed by Leo E. Strine, Jr. denied on 03/24/2014. (AWI)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None ?
    NOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Leo E. Strine, Jr. on 01/21/2014 and placed on the docket 01/23/2014. Supreme Court Case No. 13-869. (CND)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011452102 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None ?
      MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (TYW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011428622 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None ?
        JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellants. (TYW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 003011428616 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None ?Court Filing
          PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SLOVITER, FUENTES and ROTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 37. Judge: SLOVITER Authoring, Judge: FUENTES Concurring, Judge: ROTH Dissenting. (TYW)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None ?
            ARGUED on Thursday, May 16, 2013. Panel: SLOVITER, FUENTES and ROTH, Circuit Judges. David L. Finger arguing for Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc; Andrew J. Pincus arguing for Appellant Sam Glasscock III, Appellants J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr. (CMH)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011246969 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None ?
              Oral Argument Notification for Thursday, 05/16/2013. (CMH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011185642 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None ?
                ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Andrew J. Pincus, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster. Certificate of Service dated 03/05/2013. (AJP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011184776 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None ?
                  ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney David L. Finger, Esq. for Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/05/2013. (DLF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011179342 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None ?
                    Calendared for Thursday, 05/16/13. (Rescheduled from Thursday, 05/09/2013)--[Edited 05/01/2013 by CMH] (CMH)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None ?
                      HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Reply Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011161887 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/08/2013 by 3rd party, ECF. (AJP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011160920 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None ?
                          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Amicus Appellant Delaware State Bar Association, filed. (SEG)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011148213 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                            ORDER (VANASKIE, Circuit Judge) granting Motion by Delaware State Bar Association, The Corporation Law Section to Proceed as Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant, filed. Judge: VANASKIE, Authoring. Appearance Form due on or before 02/11/2013. Disclosure Statement due on or before 02/11/2013. (MS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None ?
                              HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Appellee Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011147019 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None ?
                                ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Amicus Appellees American Society of Newspaper Editors, Associated Press, Atlantic Media Inc, Bloomberg LP, EW Scripps Co, Gannett Co Inc, Maryland-Delaware District of Colombia Broadcasters Association, NPR Inc, NY Times Co, News Corp, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Reuters America LLC and Washington Post, filed. (BDB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011147007 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None ?
                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce D. Brown on behalf of Amicus Curiae Reporters Comm for Frdm of the Press, Amer Soc of News Eds, Assoc Press, Atlantic Media Inc, Bloomberg LP, Dow Jones &Co Inc, EW Scripps Co, Gannett Co Inc, The Md-Del-DC B'casters Assn, New York Times Co, NPR Inc, Reuters America LLC, The Washington Post. (BDB)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011145691 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None ?
                                    ORDER (Clerk) filed. Motion by the Reporters Committee for the Freedom of the Press and Twelve News Organizations for Leave to Proceed as Amici Curiae is denied as unnecessary. It is noted that all parties consent to the filing of the amicus brief. The motion will be forwarded tot he merits panel for purpouses of establishing consent. (MS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011143317 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None ?
                                      ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellants' Motion for extension of time to file reply brief until 2/8/13. Counsel is advised, however, to review the Court's notice of 10/15/12, advising that motions for extensions of time are disfavored, filed. (TYW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011140130 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None ?
                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott L. Nelson on behalf of Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc.. (SLN)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011138262 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None ?
                                          ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief until/for 14 Days. Certificate of Service dated 01/16/2013. (AJP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None ?
                                            HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc. in support of Appellee - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011135726 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None ?
                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013 by US mail, ECF. (MLB)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011135723 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                ECF FILER: Motion filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. to proceed as Amicus Curiae in support of Appellee/Respondent. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013. - SEND TO MERITS PANEL for the Court's information only.--[Edited 01/17/2013 by MS] (MLB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011135430 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                  ECF FILER: Request by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. for Oral Argument. [SEND TO MERITS] (AJP)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011134964 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Amicus Public Citizen, Inc. in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013 by ECF. (SLN)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                      HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 10. (RM)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011125989 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2013 by ECF. (DLF)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                          HARD COPY RECEIVED from Proposed Amicus-Appellant Delaware State Bar Association - Amicus Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 10. (RM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                            HARD COPY RECEIVED from Proposed Amici-Appellants Business Roundtable and Chamber of Commerce of the USA - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (RM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011112382 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                              ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012 by ECF. (SMH)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011112379 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                ECF FILER: Motion filed by The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association to proceed as Amicus Curiae in support of Appellant/Petitioner. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012. (SMH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011112180 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roy T. Englert, Jr. on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; Business Roundtable. (RTE)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011112138 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Amici Curiae the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012 by ECF, 3rd party. (RTE)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011111235 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from S. Mark Hurd on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (SMH)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011105463 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX VOLUME I on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 12/12/2012 by ECF. [Edited text to indicate Volume I]--[Edited 12/17/2012 by EAF] (AJP)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011105436 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                          ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Andrew J. Pincus, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster Re-Filing: Volume 1 of Joint Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 12/12/2012. (AJP)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                            HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (MS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                              HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 10. (KEL)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011104486 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2012 by 3rd party, ECF. (AJP)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011110335 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/11/2012 by 3rd party, ECF. [Text edited to indicate Addendum attached, Appendix Volume I removed due to deficiency and re-filed as of 12/12/12]--[Edited 12/17/2012 by EAF] (AJP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011063059 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Leo E. Strine Jr., Sam Glasscock III and Donald F. Parsons Jr. due on or before 12/11/2012. Appendix due on or before 12/11/2012. (TMM)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011061639 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government, filed. (DLF)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011059503 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., received. (AJP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011059477 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. (AJP)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011059474 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. (AJP)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011059469 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J Pincus on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, Jr., The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (AJP)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011053403 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                ORDER (Clerk) Appellants' letter regarding the case caption is construed as a motion to amend the caption, so construed, the motion is granted, filed. 1 filed. (TYW)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011048327 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David L. Finger on behalf of Appellee(s) Delaware Coalition for Open Government, Inc.. (DLF)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011048267 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence A. Hamermesh on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011047308 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Joel E. Friedlander, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster Letter to Ms. Marcia M. Waldron, Clerk of the Court Regarding Case Caption Discrepancies. Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2012. (JEF)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011047116 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. (JEF)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011045703 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey M. Gorris on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011045697 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andre G. Bouchard on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011045694 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joel Friedlander on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TYW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011043103 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. in District Court No. 1-11-cv-01015. (TYW)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?