Optical Devices LLC v. LG Electronics Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01033
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 2:24 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Optical Devices, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Boundy boundyc@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Brooks brooksr@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EDMOND D. JOHNSON +1 302 777 6539 +1 302 421 8390 johnsone@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah V. Malgeri +1 617 204 5100 malgerin@pepperlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Gordon McMillan, III +1 302 777 6556 +1 302 421 8390 mcmillanj@pepperlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) [SEE REPORT]. (ntl) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Optical Devices LLC as to LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Johnson, Edmond) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) Action Pending ITC Determination - filed by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ormerod, Eve) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herbert H. Finn - filed by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc.. (Ormerod, Eve) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Eve H. Ormerod on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc. (Ormerod, Eve) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER COMPLAINT to December 4, 2013 - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Johnson, Edmond) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William D. Belanger, Goutam Patnaik, Robert A. Brooks, Noah V. Malgeri, Christopher Boundy, and Alexandra C. Fennell - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Optical Devices LLC identifying Corporate Parent OD Management Systems, LLC for Optical Devices LLC.. (McMillan, James) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,809,995 B2; US 6,847,597 B2; US 6,904,007 B2; US 6,970,410 B2; US 7,196,979 B2; US 7,196,979 B2; 7,839,729 B2; US 8,416,651 B2; US RE42,927 E; US RE42,913 E; US RE43,681 E. (jeb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (jeb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1305437.) - filed by Optical Devices LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K and L, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 106 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?