A.O. Smith Corporation, et al v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 13-5578

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 6:08 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011724390 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting motion to consolidate for briefing and submission, cases 13-5578 and 13-5599 [4876872-2], and granting the motion to extend time to file briefs [4876872-3] filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein. In view of the already extended briefing schedule, further requests for extension will not be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. A new briefing schedule will issue contemporaneously with this order. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011724432 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
    BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant briefs now due 08/22/2013. appellee briefs now due 10/21/2013. Reply briefs now due 30 days from the filing of appellees' briefs. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011721147 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
      JOINT MOTION to consolidate related appeals, A.O. Smith Corp. v. USA, No. 13-5578 and Continental Insurance Company v. USA, No. 13-5599, to vacate existing briefing schedules and to establish proposed briefing schedule filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein for USA. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2013. --[Edited 06/13/2013 by LAJ to clarify relief requested.] (ABK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011711536 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
        BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/17/2013;. appellee brief due 08/19/2013; (LAJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011689860 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmund Scott Sauer for Appellants Gaylord Entertainment Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC, Gaylord Program Services, Inc., Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P. and Gaylord Hotels, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2013. (ESS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011689863 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmund Scott Sauer for Appellants Gaylord Entertainment Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC, Gaylord Program Services, Inc., Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P. and Gaylord Hotels, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2013. (ESS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011689869 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmund Scott Sauer for Appellants Gaylord Entertainment Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC, Gaylord Program Services, Inc., Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P. and Gaylord Hotels, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2013. (ESS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011689876 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmund Scott Sauer for Appellants Gaylord Entertainment Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC, Gaylord Program Services, Inc., Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P. and Gaylord Hotels, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2013. (ESS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011689882 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edmund Scott Sauer for Appellants Gaylord Entertainment Company, A.O. Smith Corporation, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC, Gaylord Program Services, Inc., Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P. and Gaylord Hotels, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2013. (ESS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 144 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?