Jeffrey Smith v. City of Cincinnati, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 13-3321

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 3:35 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011763511 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mark Levy by Thomas L. Feher. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2013. (TLF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011682187 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER filed denying motion to reconsider previous order [4846667-2] filed by Jeffrey Smith. R. Guy Cole , Jr., Circuit Judge; Julia Smith Gibbons, Circuit Judge and Karl S. Forester, U.S. District Judge. (CB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011679936 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
      Supplemental pleading filed. Supplement to motion for reconsideration (CB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011673671 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
        Appellant MOTION filed by Jeffrey Smith to reconsider order dated 04/18/2013. Certificate of service: 04/24/2013. (CB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011660149 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER filed to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (non appealable order) . R. Guy Cole , Jr., Circuit Judge; Julia Smith Gibbons, Circuit Judge and Karl S. Forester, U.S. District Judge. (CB)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 006011658881 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
            APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Jeffrey Smith Copies:1. Certificate of Service:04/10/2013. Argument Request: not received. (CB)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011626185 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
              Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Jeffrey Smith. Transcript needed: n. (CB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011626188 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/01/2013;. appellee brief due 06/03/2013;. (CB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 137 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?