Mingo Logan Coal Company v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 12-5133

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:27 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Rejection to Appellee US, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [9] docketing statement. Reason(s) This case has been consolidated. All documents must be filed in the lead case, 12-5090. Service: 10/03/2012 by clerk.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
    Notice to Appellee US: The Docketing Statement is overdue. Docketing Statement due 10/09/2012. Service: 09/28/2012 by clerk. [27482]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
      ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeals in 12-5090, -5091, -5092, -5093, -5094, -5095, -5121, -5133, and -5134 [23567-2] filed by Appellee US and Appellants Aracoma Coal Company, et al.; and granting motions to extend time to file the appellants' opening brief [25991-2], [24660-2], [5] filed by the appellants. The appellants' opening brief is due no later than 10/26/2012. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service: 09/26/2012 by clerk. [26888] [12-5090, 12-5121, 12-5133, 12-5134]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION of Appellant Mingo Logan Coal Company to extend the time to until Court rules on Joint Motion to Consolidate (which contains extension of time request), and if Joint Motion is denied, until 21 days after Court's Order to file the appellant/petitioner's principal brief. Response/Opposition due 10/04/2012. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/19/2012 by email. [25992]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
          Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mingo Logan Coal Company. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23731]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
            Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Mingo Logan Coal Company. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23730]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
              Entry of appearance for Steven H. Becker as principal counsel for Appellant Mingo Logan Coal Company. Service: 09/04/2012 by email. [23725]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                Appeal docketed. Received: 08/22/2012. [22514]Entry of Appearance due 09/06/2012. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/06/2012. Docketing Statement due 09/24/2012. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due 10/22/2012.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 89 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?