FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. v. FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01053
District Judge Robert L. Wilkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 13, 2021 at 10:56 PM DT (2.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Acadia Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Admiral Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Berkley Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo FAIRHOLME FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a series of Fairholme Funds, Inc. Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
a series of Fairholme Funds, Inc. Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of its series, The Fairholme Fund Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
on behalf of its series, The Fairholme Fund Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent J. Colatriano +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 vcolatriano@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
v.
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas David Zimpleman +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 616 8470 thomas.d.zimpleman@usdoj.gov
No Logo EDWARD DEMARCO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Block Bergman +1 202 942 5474 +1 202 942 5999 david_bergman@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard N. Cayne, PHV +1 202 942 5858 +1 202 942 5999 howard.cayne@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asim Varma +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 asim_varma@aporter.com
No Logo Federal Housing Finance Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Block Bergman +1 202 942 5474 +1 202 942 5999 david_bergman@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard N. Cayne, PHV +1 202 942 5858 +1 202 942 5999 howard.cayne@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asim Varma +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 asim_varma@aporter.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Surreply
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                          Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 59 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (rdj)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 57 Order, 56 Memorandum & Opinion, 58 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3867937. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 31 Motion for supplementation of the administrative record, limited discovery, suspension of briefing on thedefendants' dispositive motions, and a status conference as moot due to the dismissal of this case pursuant to the Court's Order 57 issued this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2014. (ztg, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING the defendants' motions to dismiss and DENYING the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2014. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2014. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Order on Motion to Take Judicial NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER on DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE granting in part and denying in part (33) Motion to Take Judicial Notice in case 1:13-cv-01025-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (29) Motion to Take Judicial Notice in case 1:13-cv-01053-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (37) Motion to Take Judicial Notice in case 1:13-cv-01439-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (21) Motion to Take Judicial Notice in case 1:13-mc-01288-RCL. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2014. (tg, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                      REPONSE re 53 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of July 10, 2014 Hearing in S.D. Iowa)(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 9/4/2014 to correct event(rdj).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (S.D. Iowa Order))(Cayne, Howard)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Howard C. Nielson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nielson, Howard)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Administrative Procedure Act Claims filed by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Enlargement of Page Limits by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. Case related to Case No. 4:14-cv-0042 (S.D. Iowa). (Varma, Asim) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. Case related to Case No. 4:14-cv-42 (S.D. Iowa). (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Arbitrary and Capricious Claims and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (McElvain, Joel) Modified on 5/5/2014 to correct docket link (jf, ). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Enlargement of Page Limits by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Discovery Order Issued by United States Court of Federal Claims by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (See Docket Entry 38 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 28 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Arbitrary and Capricious Claims and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Summary Judgment, 27 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Plaintiffs' Suppl. Memorandum on APA, Fiduciary Duty, and Contract Claims filed by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 28 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Arbitrary and Capricious Claims and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 3/24/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order [Proposed By Plaintiffs] On Defendants' Motion For Judicial Notice)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION for Suspension of Briefing on Defendants' Dispositive Motions MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Leave to File filed by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Discovery Order Issued by United States Court of Federal Claims by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION for Suspension of Briefing on Defendants' Dispositive Motions MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Leave to File filed by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION for Suspension of Briefing on Defendants' Dispositive Motions MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Leave to File filed by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM re 31 MOTION for Supplementation of the Administrative Records, for Limited Discovery, for Suspension of Briefing on Defendants' Dispositive Motions, and for a Status Conference filed by FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC, FAIRHOLME FUND by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 (Declaration of Vincent J. Colatriano))(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Supplementation of the Administrative Records, for Limited Discovery, for Suspension of Briefing on Defendants' Dispositive Motions, and for a Status Conference by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles). Added MOTION for Discovery, MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Leave to File Supplement on 2/13/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION To Conform Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion for Judicial Notice to Briefing Schedule Established for Defendants' Dispositive Motions by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Arbitrary and Capricious Claims and Memorandum in Support by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cayne, Howard). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/21/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/21/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA with Respect to Administrative Record by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Freddie Mac 2010 Form 10-K (0640-1063), # 2 Exhibit Freddie Mac First Quarter 2011 Form 10-Q (1231-1461), # 3 Exhibit Freddie Mac Second Quarter 2011 Form 10-Q (1647-1892), # 4 Exhibit Freddie Mac Third Quarter 2011 Form 10-Q (2114-2357), # 5 Exhibit Freddie Mac 2011 Form 10-K (2765-3247), # 6 Exhibit Freddie Mac First Quarter 2012 Form 10-Q (3532-3774))(McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT COMPILATION REGARDING THIRD AMENDMENT TO SENIOR PREFERRED STOCK PURCHASE AGREEMENTS by EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Part 6, # 8 Exhibit Part 7, # 9 Exhibit Part 8, # 10 Exhibit Part 9, # 11 Exhibit Part 10, # 12 Exhibit Part 11, # 13 Exhibit Part 12, # 14 Exhibit Part 13, # 15 Exhibit Part 14, # 16 Exhibit Part 15, # 17 Exhibit Part 16, # 18 Exhibit Part 17)(Varma, Asim) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Administrative Record part 1, # 2 Exhibit Administrative Record part 2, # 3 Exhibit Administrative Record part 3, # 4 Exhibit Administrative Record part 4, # 5 Exhibit Administrative Record part 5, # 6 Exhibit Administrative Record part 6, # 7 Exhibit Administrative Record part 7, # 8 Exhibit Administrative Record part 8, # 9 Exhibit Administrative Record part 9, # 10 Exhibit Administrative Record part 10, # 11 Exhibit Administrative Record part 11, # 12 Exhibit Administrative Record part 12, # 13 Exhibit Administrative Record part 13, # 14 Exhibit Administrative Record part 14)(McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN ALL CASES: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report submitted on November 6, 2013 and pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, it is hereby ORDERED that the above captioned cases proceed according to the following schedule: Interim co-lead class counsel file a consolidated class action complaint due by 12/3/2013. Defendants file the administrative record due by 12/17/2013.. Defendants file dispositive motions due by 1/17/2014. Plaintiffs file oppositions to defendants motions and cross-motions due by 2/19/2014. Defendants file replies in support of their motions and oppositions to plaintiffs cross motions due by 4/2/2014. Plaintiffs file replies in support of their cross motions due by 5/2/2014. Hearing on defendants dispositive motions and plaintiffs cross-motions set for 6/23/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Robert L. Wilkins.(SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 11/18/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by FAIRHOLME FUND, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order re: Consolidation, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order re: Joint Status Report)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1IN THE FANNIE MAE/FREDDIE MAC SENIOR PREFERRED STOCK PURCHASEAGREEMENT LITIGATIONS; On July 7, 2013, an investment manager filed a complaint in this court against a number of parties, including the Department of the Treasury (Treasury) and the Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA), in its capacity as the conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac). Perry Capital LLC v. Lew, 13-cv-1025. All parties shall appear for a status hearing in this matter on November 12, 2013 at 2:00 pm to discuss the issues specified in this Order. Other than this Joint Status Report, all briefing (including responses to pending motions) and obligations to answer, or otherwise respond to complaints, are still stayed until further notice of the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/9/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION as to Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Block Bergman on behalf of EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Bergman, David) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Neil Cayne on behalf of EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Cayne, Howard) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Asim Varma on behalf of EDWARD DEMARCO, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Varma, Asim) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Zimpleman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (Zimpleman, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. McElvain on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (McElvain, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/16/2013. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2013. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 7/15/2013 (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 7/22/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 7/15/2013 (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 7/22/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 7/15/2013 (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 7/22/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (5) Issued as to EDWARD DEMARCO, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J. Colatriano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Colatriano, Vincent) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Henry Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Fairholme Fund, Fairholme Funds, Inc., MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 13-1025. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3393808) filed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PREFERRED EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, BERKLEY REGIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDWEST EMPLOYERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUND, CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ACADIA INSURANCE COMPANY, FAIRHOLME FUNDS, INC., NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit Notice of Related Cases)(Cooper, Charles). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 588 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?