IN RE: METHYL TERTIARY BUTYL
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 10-4135

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 3, 2016 at 7:24 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3385 - Property Damage: Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT, FILED.[1000886] [10-4135, 10-4329]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
    INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1000854] [10-4135, 10-4329]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[1000508] [10-4135, 10-4329]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
        OPINION, affirming the judgment of the District Court, by BDP, PWH, SLC, FILED.[1000469] [10-4135, 10-4329]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
          FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/02/2013, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant City of New York, The Water Board and Water Finance Agency, RECEIVED. Service date 07/02/2013 by CM/ECF.[980453] [10-4135]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
            FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/28/2013, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation and Mobil Oil Corporation, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[977802] [10-4135]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
              FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/12/2013, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant City of New York, The Water Board and Water Finance Agency, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2013 by CM/ECF.[872439] [10-4135]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/08/2013, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation and Mobil Oil Corporation, RECEIVED. Service date 03/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[869921] [10-4135]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?