Battle v. Weisermazars, L.L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02859
District Judge Jesse M. Furman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 10:17 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Angela Battle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Solo Practitioner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roosevelt Theodore Seymour +1 718 802 0055 +1 718 624 7133 roosevelt@seymourlaw.us
v.
No Logo WeiserMazars LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Paul Englander +1 212 735 8720 +1 917 522 3121 jenglander@morrisoncohen.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Scott Lupion +1 212 735 8708 elupion@morrisoncohen.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 25, 2013 conference, the Court approves the parties' proposed settlement of the FLSA claims at issue here. The Court having been advised that all other claims have also settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty (30) days if the settlement is not consummated. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/25/2013) (lmb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 protective orderCourt Filing
    PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/27/2013) (tro)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. Defendant shall submit a proposed protective order to the Orders and Judgments Clerk in the next couple weeks. Deposition due by 11/25/2013. Fact Discovery due by 11/25/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/25/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jeffrey P. Englander and Roosevelt Seymour dated 7/24/2013 re: The attorneys for the parties in the above referenced matter submit this joint letter in accordance with your Order of May 8, 2013 setting a Pretrial Conference in this action for July 25, 2013. Document filed by Angela Battle, Weisermazars, L.L.P.(lmb) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Order filed January 3, 2011). Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/8/2013. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/3/2011) (rpr) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Weisermazars, L.L.P..(Englander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Weisermazars, L.L.P..(Englander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for all parties hereto that the time for Defendant to appear, answer or move with respect to the complaint herein is hereby extended to and including June 27, 2013; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendant waives any defenses to proper service of the summons and complaint; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that a facsimile signature on this stipulation and proposed order will be deemed an original and the stipulation maybe signed in counterparts which together constitute one instrument., Weisermazars, L.L.P. answer due 6/27/2013. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/6/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Scott Lupion on behalf of Weisermazars, L.L.P. (Lupion, Evan) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Paul Englander on behalf of Weisermazars, L.L.P. (Englander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/25/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/8/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT against Weisermazars, L.L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1066140)Document filed by Angela Battle.(laq) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 780 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?