Abdel-Raouf v. Yale University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00776-RNC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 9:46 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ahmed Abdel-Raouf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carey & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Paul Carey +1 203 255 4150 +1 203 255 0380 mcarey@capclaw.com
v.
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen Noonan Davis +1 203 458 9168 cdavis@ddnctlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (148) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      RULING finding as moot 104 MOTION in Limine Defendant's Exhibit 548 by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/4/15. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        RULING finding as moot 122 Motion to Compel the testimony of Dr. Okasha. The doctor testified on 02/03/14. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/4/15. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
            Marked Trial Exhibit List by Yale University. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                Marked Trial Exhibit List by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2015 re 127 MOTION for Directed Verdict as to Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Claim filed by Yale University, 126 MOTION for Directed Verdict As to Counts One through Four of Complaint filed by Yale University. Taking under advisement 126 Motion for Directed Verdict; taking under advisement 127 Motion for Directed Verdict. Jury Trial completed on 2/3/2015. Total Time: 7 hours 7 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Directed Verdict as to Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Claim, 126 MOTION for Directed Verdict As to Counts One through Four of Complaint filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Directed Verdict as to Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Claim by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Directed Verdict As to Counts One through Four of Complaint by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/30/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 2/3/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours 15 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/29/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 1/30/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/28/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 1/29/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours 1 minute(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Copy
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                          Emergency MOTION to Compel Rule 45 Trial Subpoena Dr. Okasha (Responses due by 2/18/2015, ), MOTION for copy(s) by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Mark P. Carey)(Carey, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/26/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 1/28/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 3 hours 11 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/23/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours 29 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2015. Jury Trial Continued Until 1/23/2014 at 10:00 AM. Total Time: 5 hours 20 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Jury Trial - Begun
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Jury Trial held on 1/21/2015 Jury Trial Continued Until 1/22/2015 at 10:00 am. Total Time: 5 hours 15 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano, I. Sanchez Farnham, K. Telhiard.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Preclude
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Oral MOTION to Sequester by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf.Responses due by 2/10/2015 (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Jury Selection
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2015. Total Time: 1 hours 42 minutes(Court Reporter K. Telhiard/Falzarano.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Form
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: In chambers Status Conference held on 1/5/2015. 45 minutes(Court Reporter Falzarano Kirstin Telhiard.) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/4/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. In person Status Conference re: objections asserted at deposition of Dr. Diaz set for 1/5/2015 02:00 PM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 77 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until January 9, 2015 to file the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 12/5/2014. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                RULING denying 74 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order 74 , which seeks to preclude the video deposition of Esperanza Diaz on the grounds that discovery has closed and the defendant has not obtained court permission to take the deposition, is DENIED. There is no reason these arguments could not have been raised when the notice was served in October. Moreover, defense counsel has represented that the witness is leaving the country just after Christmas on sabbatical and will not be available to testify at the trial of this matter, now scheduled for the weeks of January 20 and 26, 2015. A video deposition is the best way to preserve her testimony for trial. Both parties agree that this is an important witness. However, because plaintiffs counsel now represents that he is on criminal jury duty which will not conclude in time to allow the deposition to occur at the noticed time, Dec. 2 at at 10 a.m., construing the Motion as an application to continue the deposition, the Court finds good cause for postponing the deposition until the conclusion of counsels jury service within the next two or three days. Counsel for the parties will confer between themselves and with the witness and reschedule the deposition for a date and time prior to the witness departure from the United States. If counsel are unable to agree, each attorney will submit proposed dates and times to the Court by Monday, December 8, and the Court will schedule the deposition. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 12/1/14. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial Brief due by 12/19/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2015 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Jury Selection set for 1/20/2015 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2015-1/30/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 10/7/14.(Esposito, A.) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        RULING granting 71 on consent Motion to Continue Trial. Jury Selection is scheduled for 1/20/15 at 10:00AM, with presentation of the evidence to follow. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 10/7/14. (Esposito, A.) Modified on 10/8/2014 (Walker, A). (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for all proceedings and order the entry of final judgment Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/16/2014.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial Brief due by 12/19/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2015 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 266 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Jury Selection set for 1/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Jury Trial set for 1/15/2015 -1/27/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 9/16/2014.(Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Status Conference held on 9/12/2014. The parties anticipate filing a consent to trial before a magistrate. Once the consent is filed, the Court will issue its standing pre-trial order with the dates discussed during the conference. 5 minutes (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/12/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons re: consent to magistrate. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the telephone call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact chambers at (203)579-5640 (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REMINDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Monday, September 22, 2014 at 2:00PM. Pursuant to the Court's Settlement Conference Order, not later than 14 days before the conference, plaintiff's counsel shall contact defendant's counsel to initiate settlement discussions, if they are not already on-going. At least 5 days before the conference, each party shall provide to the Court, in confidence, a concise statement, no longer than 3 pages in length, of the evidence the party expects to produce at trial. The statements shall outline the settlement negotiations to date, and identify where possible the obstacles or impediments which have so far prevented settlement of the matter. (Katz, Samantha) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 8/19/2014. 10 minutes (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Calendar Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 8/19/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/6/2014.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling in September 2014 56 Motion to Continue Trial. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/4/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION 56 to Motion for Continuance filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) Modified on 3/17/2014 (Perez, J.). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue TRIAL by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 9/22/2014 9:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton with trial to follow thereafter. The parties are instructed to file two weeks prior to jury selection the following: (1) brief statement of the case; (2) voir dire; (3) exhibit and witness lists; (4) deposition designations and cross designations; and (5) proposed jury instructions and verdict forms. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/5/2014.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER re 48 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Defendant's late discovery request post discover deadline. filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf, 53 Order on Motion for Protective Order. Denying 48 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Defendant's late discovery request post discover deadline. filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf, Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/5/2014.(Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 48 Motion for Protective Order regarding Defendant's late discovery request post discover deadline. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/5/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order for Trial Dates. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION re 48 MOTION for Protective Order regarding Defendant's late discovery request post discover deadline. filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9/5/12 Interrogatories & Reqs for Prod, # 2 Exhibit 11/9/12 Plaintiff's Response to Prod. Req., # 3 Exhibit 2/13/13 Plaintiff's Depo Trans, # 4 Exhibit 2/28/13 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, # 5 Exhibit Portions of Plaintiff's 11/22/13 Depo, # 6 Exhibit 11/9/12 Response to 1st Set of Interrogatories, # 7 Exhibit 11/5/12 Damage Analysis)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 49 Motion for Scheduling Order. The parties are instructed to file a joint scheduling order within ten days of this order. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/21/2014. (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Trial Scheduling Order by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf.Responses due by 3/14/2014 (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order regarding Defendant's late discovery request post discover deadline. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf.Responses due by 3/10/2014 (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Warren W. Eginton for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/18/13.(Sunbury, B.) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Please see attached prefiling conference request. Plaintiff may file his motion for summary judgment on or before 2/20/2014 without a prefiling conference. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/7/2013.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Please see attached prefiling conference request. Defendant, Yale University, may file it's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 2/20/2014 without a prefiling conference. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/7/2013.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 9/20/2013. Case did not settle. Total Time: 2 hours (Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Yale University.(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/20/2013 to complete discovery; dispositive motions due 2/20/2014. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/10/2013. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2013 discovery and file dispositive motions. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER & CALENDAR: A settlement conference is scheduled for 9/20/2013 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/29/13. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Yale moves to dismiss the IIED claim on the ground that the complaint does not allege extreme and outrageous conduct on the part of Yale. The arguments presented in support of the motion have substantial merit. To the extent the IIED claim is based on adverse employment actions, the allegations of the complaint do not show that the employment actions were carried out in a highly offensive manner. To the extent the claim is based on acts of discrimination, such acts normally do not support an IIED claim. To the extent the claim is based on Dr. Chiles's statement following the shooting at Ft. Hood, or statements by others, it is doubtful that the statements provide a basis for a finding of extreme and outrageous conduct on the part of Yale. Even so, the plaintiff persuasively argues based on Judge Arterton's opinion in the Craig case that his allegations, viewed fully and most favorably to him, should be deemed sufficent to survive the motion to dismiss. See Craig v. Yale Univ. Sch. of Med., 838 F. Supp. 2d 4, 11 (D. Conn. 2011). Having considered the parties' arguments, I conclude that the IIED claim should not be dismissed at this time, principally because of the unusual context provided by the residency program at Yale. Accordingly, the motion is hereby denied. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/13. (Chatigny, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery to be completed by 8/19/2013. Counsel have also requested an extension of the prefiling conference request deadline, essentially one month after the due date of May 21, 2013. Counsel are reminded that motions for extension of time are due five days before the deadline with respect to which the extension is requesed. The prefiling conference request is granted to 8/19/2013. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/21/2013. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/18/2013 completion of discovery and file dispositive motions. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 32 defendant's motion for permission to conduct the deposition of the plaintiff in excess of 7 hours. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/29/13. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for a ruling including 32 MOTION to Take Deposition from Ahmed Abdel-Raouf in Excess of 7 Hours. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/21/13. Motion referred to Donna F. Martinez (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Take Deposition from Ahmed Abdel-Raouf in Excess of 7 Hours filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Take Deposition from Ahmed Abdel-Raouf in Excess of 7 Hours by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exh A to Memo in Support)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/9/2012 to respond to defendants initial discover requests. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/9/2012. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/09/2012 to serve response to Defendant's initial discovery requests. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Yale University, Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 10/22/2012 to edit text to add filer. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/16/2012 to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/17/2012. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/16/12 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S 9/17/12 IRPs filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/16/12 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S 9/17/12 IRPs by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/8/2012 to respond to defendant's initial discovery requests. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/28/2012. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2012 serve responses to Defendant's initial discovery requests. by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached order. Discovery due by 7/5/2013; Status Report due by 10/20/2012; Prefiling Conference Request Letter Re: Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2013; Settlement Conference 8/2013; Trial Ready Date 11/1/2013; Trial Brief due by 9/16/2013. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/20/2012. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss Reply due by 10/2/2012. (Glynn, T.) Modified on 9/18/2012 to correct filing date(Glynn, T.). (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/2/2012 to reply to 16 memorandum in opposition. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/17/2012. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/02/2012 to Reply to 16 Memorandum in Opposition to 13 Motion by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 9/18/2012 to edit text to add link. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Entry Correction re 17 Exhibit re replacement pdf. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT A (Courtesy Copy of Unreported Decision) by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf re 16 Memorandum in Opposition to 13 Motion. (Carey, Mark) Modified on 9/7/2012 to edit text and link document. (Blue, A.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2012: # 1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Blue, A.). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Yale University.Responses due by 9/21/2012 (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: Telephone Pre-Filing Conference held on 8/30/2012. 17 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The telephonic Pre-Filing Conference set for 8/7/2012 at 3:00 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny has been RESCHEDULED to 8/30/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall initiate the call to Chambers at 860-240-3659 with all parties on the line. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Pre-Filing Conference Re: Motion to Dismiss set for 8/7/2012 at 3:00 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel shall initiate the call to Chambers at 860-240-3659 with all parties on the line. (Rickevicius, L.) Modified on 7/13/2012to correct phone number (Glynn, T.). (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        "ENTERED IN ERROR" WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) Modified on 6/14/2012 to edit text document is a duplicate entry. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yale University waiver sent on 5/23/2012, answer due 7/22/2012 filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf. (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice (Other) filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Complaint filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/12. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 Efile Attachment)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2012 Discovery due by 11/22/2012. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/12. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Carey, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER & CALENDAR: A settlement conference is scheduled for 9/20/2013 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions. (Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2508301.), filed by Ahmed Abdel-Raouf.(Carey, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?