Gemini IP, LLC v. Kaseya International Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-00081
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 6:09 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
v.
No Logo Kaseya International Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kaseya International Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Edward Phipps , +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 cphipps@lockeliddell.com
No Logo Kaseya US Sales, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Michael Vecchione +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 avecchione@lockelord.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Kaseya International Limited and Kaseya US Sales, LLC With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kaseya International Limited, Kaseya US Sales, LLC (Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Kaseya International Limited, Kaseya US Sales, LLC.(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kaseya US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vecchione, Anthony) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/29/2012) (baf, ). (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                  Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kaseya US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vecchione, Anthony) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kaseya US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vecchione, Anthony) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/22/2012) (baf, ). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kaseya US Sales, LLC.( Vecchione, Anthony) Modified on 5/21/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                        Return of Service Executed as to Kaseya US Sales, LLC on 4/11/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re Kaseya US Sales, LLC. (Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS Issued as to Kaseya International Limited. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS Issued as to Kaseya US Sales, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemini IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TechDev Holdings, LLC for Gemini IP, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Kaseya International Limited, Kaseya US Sales, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3445699.), filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?