Gemini IP, LLC v. Consona Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-00080
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 12:46 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Agility IP Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy Fischer Greenberg +1 650 227 4800 +1 650 318 3483 kgreenberg@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xiang Long +1 650 227 4800 longxiang@agilityiplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Carl Otteson +1 408 291 2750 +1 650 318 3483 jim@agilityiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
No Logo Consona Corporation, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Consona Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conley, Rose & Tayon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart N. Mesher +1 713 238 8049 +1 713 238 8008 smesher@conleyrose.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles John Rogers +1 713 238 8049 +1 713 238 8008 CRogers@conleyrose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ice Miller LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kregg Thomas Brooks +1 312 726 7126 +1 312 726 2506 kregg.brooks@icemiller.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Nimmo +1 312 726 8149 +1 312 726 7102 anthony.nimmo@icemiller.com
No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. re: 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Consona Corporation With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/27/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Consona Corporation With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
      Gemini IP, LLC's ANSWER to 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Consona Corporation by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristy Fischer Greenberg on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Greenberg, Kristy) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xiang Long on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Long, Xiang) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Caine, David) Modified on 4/25/2012 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Otteson on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Consona Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Consona Holdings, Inc. for Consona Corporation. (Rogers, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                  Defendant Consona Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, First COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Consona Corporation.(Rogers, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stewart Mesher on behalf of Consona Corporation (Mesher, Stewart) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J Rogers on behalf of Consona Corporation (Rogers, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony Nimmo for Consona Corporation. (fee paid) (cm, ) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kregg T Brooks for Consona Corporation. (fee paid) (cm, ) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                            Return of Service Executed as to Consona Corporation on 3/1/2012, answer due: 3/22/2012. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                              Defendant Consona Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gemini IP, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                SUMMONS Issued as to Consona Corporation. (cm, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemini IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TechDev Holdings, LLC for Gemini IP, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Consona Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3445484.), filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?