LT Tech, LLC v. Quest Software, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-00591
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 3:17 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
No Logo Lt Tech, LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Quest Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimball Richard Anderson +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kanderson@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter J. Chassman +1 713 651 2623 +1 713 651 2700 pchassman@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip David Price , +1 713 651 2600 +1 713 651 2700 pprice@winston.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Ordered that all attorney's fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/11/2013. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER denying as moot 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/11/2013. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Quest Software, Inc. With Prejudice by LT Tech LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/5/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS - It is ORDERED that, on or before 5/1/2013, all parties shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/4/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Between Plaintiff LT Tech, LLC and Defendant Quest Software, Inc. by LT Tech LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 23 Amended Complaint, Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Scheduling Conference held on 3/5/2013. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (bss, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/4/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 31 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Quest Software, Inc's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Responses due by 4/1/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/4/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chassman, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Quest Software, Inc's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida by LT Tech LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/5/2013
                            Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Quest Software, Inc's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit McHale Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Corcoran Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion to Substitute Party. LT Tech LLC added. Gemini IP, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference (RE: ORDER, DKT. 14) filed by Gemini IP, LLC. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Written Report due by 2/25/2013. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Withdraw 12 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims (in Complaint, Dkt. 1). Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/12/2013. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT - Plaintiff LT Tech, LLC's Second Amended Complaint against Quest Software, Inc., filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reexamination Certificate No. 6,177,932, # 3 Exhibit C - Quest Admissions Regarding the Functionality of Quest's Workspace Help Desk Product)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/8/2013 (baf, ). Modified on 2/11/2013 (baf, ). (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party - Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Substitute LT Tech, LLC by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of William E. Davis, III, # 2 Exhibit A - Patent Assignment Agreement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/11/2013 (baf, ). (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference (RE: ORDER, DKT. 14) by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Defendant Quest Software, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Quest Software, Inc., filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reexamination Certificate No. 6,177,932, # 3 Exhibit C - Quest Admissions Regarding the Functionality of Quest's Workspace Help Desk Product)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Quest Software, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims (Dkt. 12) by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE - The Court hereby directs the parties to confer as required by Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) no later than 1/28/2013 and file a Rule 26 Meeting Joint Written Report no later than 2/11/2013. Management Conference set for 3/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/14/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quest Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dell Inc. for Quest Software, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER 27 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims (in Complaint, Dkt. 1) by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 2/12/2013 (baf, ). (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/4/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Quest Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip David Price on behalf of Quest Software, Inc. (Price, Phillip) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter John Chassman on behalf of Quest Software, Inc. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kimball R Anderson on behalf of Quest Software, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quest Software, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quest Software, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Quest Software, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemini IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TechDev Holdings, LLC for Gemini IP, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Quest Software, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3779832.), filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reexamination Certificate No. 6,177,932, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?