Rivera (RESTRICTED FILER) v. Hayden et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-23336
District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 12:32 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vincent F. Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent F. Rivera
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Law Enforcement, Defendant
No Logo Florida Highway Patrol, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Gen. Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo United States Department of Transporation, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 42 Motion to Reopen Judgment. THE CLERK OF COURT IS INSTRUCTED NOT TO ACCEPT ANY FUTURE FILINGS IN THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/7/2011. (bb) Modified text on 6/7/2011 (bb). (Entered: 06/07/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION To Reopen Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Vincent F. Rivera. (abe) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
      ORDER of Dismissal by USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera, for want of prosecution, appellant has failed to pay the filing and docketing fee in the time fixed by the rules USCA# 10-14541-F (cqs) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Vincent F. Rivera re 37 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (mc) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
          Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera. Date received by USCA: 9/30/2010. USCA Case Number: 10-14541-F. (cqs) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re 37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/27/10. (ch1) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/27/2010
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 36 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Vincent F. Rivera Filing fee $ 455.00. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Fee- Not Paid) (cqs) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER denying 35 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Reopen Judgment by Vincent F. Rivera. (ail) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                    ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA for want of prosecution because the appellant has failed to pay the $450 docketing and $5 filing fees ($455) to the district court clerk within the time fixed by the rules, effective this 1st day of September, 2009 re 29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera: USCA# 09-14040-G (jua) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Vincent F. Rivera re 29 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (amb) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 29 Notice of Appeal, receipt of: NOA date received by USCA 08/10/2009 USCA number 09-14040-G (amb) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER denying 30 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/10/2009. (ps1) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Vincent F. Rivera. (See DE #29 for image) Responses due by 8/24/2009 (amb) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Vincent F. Rivera as to 28 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Vincent F. Rivera. Filing Fee: (FEE NOT PAID). Within ten days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (amb) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 27 Motion to Reopen Judgment. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2009. (ps1) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION reopen judgment by Vincent F. Rivera. (tb) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                    ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA, this appeal is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution because the appellant has failed to pay the $450 docketing and $5 filing fees ($455) to the district court clerk within the time fixed by the rules as to 24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera. USCA #08-16630-F (abd) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Receipt of NOA Transmittal Letter from USCA on 11/24/08 re USCA Case Number:08-16630-F for 24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vincent F. Rivera. (abd) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Vincent F. Rivera as to 23 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Filing Fee:(FEE NOT PAID). Within ten days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (abd) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying 22 Renewed Motion Reopen Judgment. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/28/2008. (ps1) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                            Renewed Motion to Reopen Judgment and Memorandum of Law / MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Vincent F. Rivera. (cqs) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                              ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA, this appeal is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution because the appellant has failed to pay the $450 docketing and $5 filing fees ($455) to the district court clerk within the time fixed by the rules, re 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Vincent F. Rivera. USCA #08-11496-E (abd) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER denying 19 Motion to Reopen Case.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on May 7, 2008. (ps1) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Reopen Case by Vincent F. Rivera. (ls) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                    TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Vincent F. Rivera re 16 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (nc) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 16 Notice of Appeal receipt of: NOA Transmittal date received by USCA 4/3/08 USCA number 08-11496-E (abd) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Vincent F. Rivera as to 15 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, Filing Fee: (FEE NOT PAID) (abd) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER denying 14 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on March 14, 2008. (ps1) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Reopen Case by Vincent F. Rivera. (tb) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER denying 12 Motion for Reconsideration ; Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/29/08. (lh) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order by Vincent F. Rivera. (tb) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, denying 10 objections filed by Vincent F. Rivera, Recommending dismissing without prejudice.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on January 24, 2008.(ps1) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    OBJECTION to 4 Report and Recommendations by Vincent F. Rivera. (lk) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING 4 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent F. Rivera. The case is dismissed without prejudice and any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on January 14, 2008.(ps1) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        OBJECTION to 4 Report and Recommendations by Vincent F. Rivera. (ls) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Docket Correction: re 5 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Vincent F. Rivera, Error: Linked to incorrect document; corrected document by Clerk. (tb) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER DENYING 5 Objection to the Order of Reference filed by Vincent F. Rivera. Plaintiff's Objections to 4 Report are due by January 21, 2008.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on January 10, 2008.(ps1) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              OBJECTION to 2 Clerk's Notice Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick A White by Vincent F. Rivera. (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re 1 Complaint filed by Vincent F. Rivera. Recommending dismissing without prejudice and denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent F. Rivera. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2008.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/31/07.(tw) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Permission to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Vincent F. Rivera. (caw) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Clerks Notice Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. (caw) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 USC 1983, against all defendants, filed by Vincent F. Rivera. (Ifp motion pending.)(caw) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?