Ratliff v. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-00341
District Judge Frank J. Polozola, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 7:10 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Byron A Ratliff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
v.
No Logo Jacobs Engineering Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vicki M. Crochet +1 225 387 3221 +1 225 214 0462 vicki.crochet@taylorporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Lenore Feeney +1 225 387 3221 +3468 346 346 8049 lenore.feeney@taylorporter.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 11/8/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by Byron A Ratliff. (Crochet, Vicki) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      60 DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL...This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 10/11/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
        Letters dated 10/11/07 from Jill Craft Alford and Vick M. Crochet to FJP Re: request for entry of conditional dismissal (BP, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order : The request to extend deadlines from 9/21/07 to 10/5/07 to file the matters set forth above is Granted. Proposed Jury Charges, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Jury Interrogatories, Stipulations, Motions in Limine, Bench Books, and CD exhibit list shall be filed by 10/5/2007. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/18/07. (BP, ) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            Order: The deadline for submission of jury charges, voir dire, jury interrogatories, stipulations, motions in limine, bench books, and CD witness lists is extended to September 21, 2007. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 08/30/2007. (JKH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
              Letter dated 08/29/2007 from Vicki M. Crochet to FJP Re: Attempting mediation to settle (JKH, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank J. Polozola : Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/25/2007. A Jury Trial set for 10/22/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Frank J. Polozola. Proposed Jury Instructions, Voir Dire, jury interrogatories and Any Stipulations shall be filed by 9/7/2007. Motions in Limine shall be filed by 9/7/2007. Two copies of the bench book of exhibits shall be filed on or before 9/7/07. Each party shall file CD with a proposed copy of its exhibit list. This disk shall be filed simultaneously with the bench book of exhibits and shall be submitted in WordPerfect format. See attachment for sample copy and instructions. (Court Reporter E. Champion.) (DMC, ) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                  Proposed Pretrial Order by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2007 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Judge Frank J. Polozola. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2007. (BP, ) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      RULING denying 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., because there are material issues of fact in dispute.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/31/07.(BP, ) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                        SUR-REPLY TO 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Byron A Ratliff. (BP, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 40 MOTION for Leave to file surreply memorandum by plaintiff. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/22/07. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry)(LD) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum by Byron A Ratliff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Surreply Memorandum)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                              CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Reply to Opposition to Mo for Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit B to Reply to Opposition to Mo for Summary Judgment)(Crochet, Vicki) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENT DOCUMENT as to 37 Reply to Response to Motion- This pleading is deficient. Specifically the main document is the same as the second exhibit. This entry needs to be refiled with the correct document attached. The party is given 7 days from the date of this notice to file a corrective document or the document may be stricken. Please entitle the submission CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT, ) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Reply Memo in Support of MSJ# 2 Exhibit B - Reply Memo in Support of MSJ)(Crochet, Vicki) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 35 MOTION for Leave to File reply memo filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 12/18/06. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(LD) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File reply memo (Reply memo not submitted) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (PAH, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                        Statement of Material Facts , In Opposition to filed by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Byron A Ratliff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Thipgen Correspondence# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibt A Part 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Craft, Jill) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Pla's response due by 12/11/06 . Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 12/1/06. (BP, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER..IT IS ORDERED that the pretrial conference scheduled for 12/14/06 is hereby continued without date pending resolution of the dft's motion for SJ. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 11/15/06.(PAH, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Letter dated 11/15/06 from V. Crochet to Judge Polozola Re: Request to continue the pretrial conference. (PAH, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment...Pla's response to the motion due by 12/4/06. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 11/14/06. (BP, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1# 2 Exhibit Part 2# 3 Exhibit Part 3# 4 Exhibit Part 4)(BP, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Statement of Material Facts filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (BP, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (BP, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline.... Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 10/31/2006.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 8/31/2006. (SAH, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline... by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (SAH, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Ann Tureau on 8/24/2006 by Personal Service (SAH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Ajay Mathur on 8/22/06 by Personal Service (SAH, ) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Cathy Landry on 8/21/2006 by Personal Service (SAH, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2006 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Judge Frank J. Polozola. (NLT, ) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Discovery/Motion Deadlines... Motions shall be filed by 9/15/2006.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 6/28/2006. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Motion/Discovery Deadlines by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines... the discovery deadline is extended for 60 days. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 6/22/2006. (NLT, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Byron A Ratliff. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2006 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Judge Frank J. Polozola. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2006. (NLT, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery, including expert discvoery due by 6/30/2006. Dft's Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2006. Dft's Expert Reports due by 6/30/2006. Motions shall be filed by 8/15/2006. No other extensions will be allowed.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 4/10/06. (DCB, ) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (NLT, ) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines... Expert Witness List due by 3/30/2006 for dft. Expert Reports due by 4/30/2006 for dft. Experts shall be deposed by 6/15/2006.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 2/1/2006. (NLT, ) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (DCB, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Judge Christine Noland : Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2006. Counsel for the parties informed the Court that they should be able to complete discovery within the existing deadlines, therefore the record will be reviewed in June 2006, to determine whether the case is ready for pretrial and trial dates. (NLT, ) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER... The Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2005 is CANCELLED... Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2005. Discovery due by 4/28/2006. Expert Witness List due by 1/1/2006 for pla and 2/1/2006 for dft. Expert Reports due by 2/15/2006 for pla and 3/30/2006 for dft. Experts shall be deposed by 4/28/2006. Motions shall be filed by 5/31/2006. Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2006 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 9/1/2005.(NLT, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Byron A Ratliff. (NLT, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc..(NLT, ) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Byron A Ratliff. Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. served on 5/26/2005, answer due 6/15/2005. (SAH, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2005 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland. Status Report due by 8/29/2005.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 5/25/05. (SAH, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250.00 receipt number 86569.), filed by Byron A Ratliff.(PAH, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?