Steven Nakash, et al v. nVidia Corporation, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 11-15186

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 10:41 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Justin M. Lichterman, Esquire for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. [8730181] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Marcus Daniel Merchasin for Appellant Steven F. Helfand. [8663602]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF with correct version (single case number), resent notice. 06/17/2013 by ASW]--[Edited: Spread docket text to consolidated appeals 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-15186. 08/05/2013 by RY] (MDM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas L Cox, Jr. for Appellant Nikki Johnson. [8671853]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15186. Resent NDA. 08/05/2013 by RY] (TLC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Steve A. Miller for Appellant Chase A. Thompson. [8666963]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-15190, 11-15192, 11-15186. Resent NDA. 08/05/2013 by RY] (SAM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KKW): Respondent NVIDIA Corporation’s motion to continue the August 13, 2013 hearing date is DENIED. These cases shall remain on for oral argument on August 13, 2013, at 9 a.m. in San Francisco, California. [8718987] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 Motion to continue hearing of case. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717747] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert P. Varian for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717719] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RPV)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James N. Kramer for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717703] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JNK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Justin M. Lichterman for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717402] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Nicole Marie Duckett for Appellees Steven Nakash, Nathan DeBockler, Lance Waidzunas, Brian Robinson and Todd Feinstein. [8662900] (NMD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                      Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, August 13, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8657508] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Nathan DeBockler, Todd Feinstein, Steven Nakash, Brian Robinson and Lance Waidzunas Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel. Date of service: 05/28/2013 [8644125] (NMD)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                          Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Nathan DeBockler, Todd Feinstein, Steven Nakash and Lance Waidzunas. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [8635469]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct service date. Resent NDA. 05/20/2013 by RY] (NMD)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                            Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Frank Barbara. Date of service: 08/01/2011. [8635238] (JDP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                              Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8620143] (SS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [8095902] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                  Terminated Eric David Freed for Tracy Leblanc in 11-15182, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15186, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15190, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15191, Nancy Walther Graf in 11-18044, Zanetta Taddesse-Bonsignore, Mauricio Chavez and Vincent Bonsignore in 11-56066 and Lu Li in 12-55050 [8071514] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-18044, 11-56066, 12-55050] (PH)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    Terminated George K. Lang for Tracy Leblanc in 11-15182, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15186, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15190, Tracy Leblanc in 11-15191 and Tracy Leblanc in 11-15192 [8071484] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (PH)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/12/2012. [8030717] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (AT)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                        Filed clerk order: The reply brief [89] submitted by Steven F. Helfand in 11-15190 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7996415] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RH)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steven F. Helfand in 11-15190. Date of service: 12/09/2011. [7996095] [11-15190, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15191, 11-15192]--[COURT UPDATE : Un-spread filing for 11-16298. Resent NDA. 12/12/2011 by TW] (JWD)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [86] submitted by Nikki Johnson in 11-15192 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7995984] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RH)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                              Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Nikki Johnson in 11-15192. Date of service: 12/08/2011. [7993444] [11-15192, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 12/09/2011 by GD] (TLC)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): The court will initiate a further assessment conference by telephone on December 8, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. [7982626] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (AF)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 reply to response (,motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 11/25/2011. [7978572] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (AT)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Received Appellee Nathan DeBockler notice regarding notice of filing a portion of their answering brief under seal.. [7978215] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (WP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Nikki Johnson in 11-15192 response supporting motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 11/23/2011. [7977594] [11-15192, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-16298] (TLC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Filed clerk order: The reply brief [77] submitted by Frank Barbara in 11-15186 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7976571] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RH)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Frank Barbara in 11-15186. Date of service: 11/22/2011. [7976430] [11-15186, 11-15182, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192]--[COURT UPDATE: Un-applied brief from 11-16298. Per 9/29/2011and 10/05/2011Orders, 11-16298 briefed separately. Resent NDA. 11/23/2011 by RY] (JDP)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The motion of appellant Nikki Johnson (“Johnson”)for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief for appellant Johnson is due December 8, 2011. Appellant Johnson is reminded that the typeface of a motion should comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 27(d)(1)(E). Appellant Johnson is also reminded that under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2 an extension of time may be granted only upon a showing of diligence and substantial need. Defendant-Appellee NVIDIA Corporation’s (“NVIDIA”) motion for leave to resubmit certain documents as sealed is granted. NVIDIA shall resubmit Volume 6 of NVIDIA’s supplemental excerpts of record under seal. [7975043] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (WL)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Nikki Johnson in 11-15192 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 12/08/2011. Date of service: 11/21/2011. [7973219] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (TLC)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Submitted (ECF) Appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors response opposing motion (motion to strike). Date of service: 11/18/2011. [7972163] --[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect the content of the filing. Spread filing to case numbers: 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 & 11-16298. Resent NDA. 11/21/2011 by DB] (MFR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents Contained in Defendant-Appellee NVIDIA Corporation's Supplemental Excerpts of Record]. Date of service: 11/14/2011. [7964572] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (AT)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT):Appellee NVIDIA’s motion to strike certain materials included within appellants’ excerpts of record and any related filings shall be referred to the merits panel for resolution. [7961542] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (KKW)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [61] submitted by Nathan DeBockler, Todd Feinstein, Steven Nakash and Lance Waidzunas is filed UNDER SEAL. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7960484] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect answering brief filed under seal. Resent NDA. 11/09/2011 by RY] (RH)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [63] submitted by nVidia Corporation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7959890] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RH)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15192 Motion to take judicial notice of Contents of Court Files. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7959524] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15191. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7959522] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182 Motion to strike portion of Certain Materials Included Within Objector-Appellants' Excerpts of Record and Portions Of Their Opening Briefs. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7959519] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT):The motion of Plaintiff-Appellees Todd Feinstein, Nathan DeBockler, and John Russo and Defendant-Appellee NVIDIA Corporation (collectively, “Appellees”) for a second extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The answering briefs for nos. 11-15182, 11-15186, and 11-15190, and 11-15191, and 11-15192 are due November 8, 2011. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering briefs. The optional reply brief for no. 11-16298 remains due October 24, 2011 [7937945] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (KKW)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Tyler Burgert, Nathan DeBockler, Katherine E. Decker, Todd Feinstein, Tracy Leblanc, Chi Lok Leung, Michael Mann, Steven Nakash, National Business Offices Association, Inc., Luis Olivos, Brian Robinson and Lance Waidzunas in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 11/08/2011. Date of service: 10/20/2011. [7935961] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (NMD)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The joint motion of appellees NVIDIA and Lead Plaintiffs Todd Feinstein, Nathan DeBockler, and John Russo (collectively, “Appellees”) for an extension of time to file the answering briefs is granted. The answering briefs for nos. 11-15182, 11-15186, and 11-15190, and 11-15191, and 11-15192 are due October 25, 2011. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering briefs. The answering brief for no. 11-16298 remains due October 6, 2011. The optional reply brief for no. 11-16298 is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief for no. 11-16298. In view of the complexity of the briefing schedule, no telephonic extensions of time in which to file briefs pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) will be granted. [7918073] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (KKW)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 10/25/2011 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 10/04/2011. [7916030] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JN)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellee’s unopposed motion to file a response to appellants’ motion to consolidate is granted. The response submitted on September 14, 2011 has been filed. Appellants’ opposed motion to consolidate nos. 11-15182 and 11-16298 is granted to the extent that the above-captioned appeals shall be assigned to the same merits panel. The appeals shall be briefed separately. The briefing schedule in 11-15182 is unchanged. The answering brief in 11-16298 is due October 6, 2011. The optional reply brief in 11-16298 is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7910884] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192, 11-16298] (KKW)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT):The corrected joint motion for appellees Steven Nakash, et al. and appellees NVIDIA Corporation, et al. for a 40-day extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief for appellees Steven Nakash, et al. and appellees NVIDIA Corporation, et al. is due October 11, 2011. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [7875540] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The opening brief [47] submitted by Steven F. Helfand is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7844742] [11-15190, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15191, 11-15192] (GLS)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steven F. Helfand. Date of service: 08/01/2011. [7839790] --[COURT UPDATE: Filing spread to case number: 11-15182; 11-15186; 11-15191; & 11-15192. Resent NDA. 08/02/2011 by DB] (JWD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [45] submitted by Frank Barbara is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7840403] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (GLS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Frank Barbara in 11-15186. Date of service: 08/01/2011. [7839652] [11-15186, 11-15182, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JDP)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The opening brief [41] submitted by Chase A. Thompson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7828385] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (GLS)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Chase A. Thompson in 11-15191. Date of service: 07/20/2011. [7826340] [11-15191, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15192]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of brief (searchable). Resent NDA.07/20/2011 by TW] (SAM)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The motion of Objectors-Appellants Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors (“HP Consumers”) to file opening brief and certain Excerpts of Record under seal is granted. As directed by the district court judge’s order dated September 3, 2010, portions of the objections of HP Consumers to Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Exhibits A and B shall be filed and maintained under seal. [7777698] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): The court is in receipt of the joint motion of Appellants Frank Barbara and Steven Helfand for an extension of time to file the opening briefs in no. 11-15186 and 11-15190 (“Joint Motion”), the joinder of appellant Chase A. Thompson in the Joint Motion (“Joinder of appellant Thompson”), and response of appellee NVIDIA Corporation to the Joint Motion. The unopposed Joint Motion and Joinder of appellant Thompson are granted. Objectors-Appellants HP Consumer Objectors’ late motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief for no. 11- 15182 is granted. The opening briefs for nos. 11-15186, 11-15190, and 11-15191 are due August 1, 2011. The opening brief for no. 11-15192 for appellant Nikki Johnson has been received and filed. The opening brief for no. 11-15182 for appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors has been received and is ordered filed. The answering briefs are due August 31, 2011. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. Appellants Barbara and Helfand are reminded that the typeface of a motion must comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 27(d)(1)(E).[7776155] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (WL)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Received original and 7 copies of Appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors opening brief (Informal: No) 38 pages. Excerpts of record in 4 volumes. Served on 05/31/2011. Major deficiencies: motion pending. Notified counsel. [7775750] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (GLS)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed Appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors motion to file opening brief and certain excerpts of record UNDER SEAL. Served on 05/31/2011. [7775719] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (GLS)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [33] submitted by Nikki Johnson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7770771] [11-15192, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191] (GLS)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Nikki Johnson in 11-15192. Date of service: 05/31/2011. [7769351] [11-15192, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191] (TLC)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191 response to motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 05/31/2011. [7769117] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Chase A. Thompson in 11-15191 Motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 04/26/2011. Date of service: 05/27/2011. [7767553] [11-15191, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15192] (SAM)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Frank Barbara in 11-15186, Appellant Steven F. Helfand in 11-15190 Joint Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 07/29/2011. Date of service: 05/27/2011. [7767412] [11-15186, 11-15182, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JDP)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors’ opposed motion to supplement the excerpts of record on appeal is denied. See Kirshner v. Uniden Corp., 842 F.2d 1074 (9th Cir. 1988). [7759650] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Hewlett Packard Consumer Objectors in 11-15182 reply to response (). Date of service: 05/17/2011. [7755845] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (MFR)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 response opposing motion (,motion to supplement record on appeal). Date of service: 05/16/2011. [7754493] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AMT): The court is in receipt of the motions for an extension of time to file the opening brief for appellants Steven F. Helfand and Nikki Johnson and the joinders in appellant Helfand’s motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief filed by appellants Frank Barbara and Chase A. Thompson. The motions are granted. The opening briefs for case nos. 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, and 11-15192 are due May 31, 2011. The answering briefs are due June 30, 2011. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. In view of the complexity of the briefing schedule, no telephonic extensions of time in which to file briefs pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) will be granted. [7731080] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Frank Barbara in 11-15186 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 05/31/2011. Date of service: 04/25/2011. [7729232] [11-15186, 11-15182, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Nikki Johnson in 11-15192 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 05/31/2011. Date of service: 04/22/2011. [7726643] [11-15192, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191] (TLC)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Chase A. Thompson in 11-15191 Motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 01/24/2011. Date of service: 04/21/2011. [7725411] [11-15191, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15192] (SAM)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Steven F. Helfand Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 05/31/2011. Date of service: 04/20/2011. [7723938] --[COURT UPDATE: Filing spread to case numbers: 10-15182; 10-15186; 10-15191; & 10-15192. Resent NDA. 04/20/2011 by DB] (JWD)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John William Davis for Appellant Steven F. Helfand in 11-15190. Date of service: 04/12/2011. [7714416] [11-15190, 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JWD)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 Correspondence: Letter to Molly C. Dwyer, Clerk of Court. Date of service: 03/25/2011 [7694940] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KTH)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristofor T. Henning for Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company in 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192. Date of service: 03/25/2011. [7694732] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KTH)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS):The court is in receipt of Apple, Inc’s letter dated February 23, 2011. A review of the district court record shows that plaintiffs did not name Apple, Inc. as a defendant in the complaint in the district court. The Clerk shall remove Apple, Inc. as a third-party defendant-appellee in this case. The briefing schedule is unchanged. [7680862] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): Case not selected for mediation program. Counsel interested in obtaining settlement assistance or program information should contact the Mediation Office. [7665610] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Filed order MEDIATION (MGS): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. Telephone conference to be on 03/01/2011 at 11:00 am. (Pacific Standard Time) [7653432] [11-15192, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Frank Barbara in 11-15186 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/15/2011. [7650205] [11-15186, 11-15182, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of Mediation Questionnaire (correct cases list). Resent NDA. 02/16/2011 by TW] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Filed order MEDIATION (MGS): The Court of Appeals’ records do not indicate that appellant has filed a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with Circuit Rule 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing of this order, appellant shall: (a) file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov); (b) dismiss the appeal voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (c) show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. . [7644045] (KKW)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Received Appellees Tyler Burgert and Nathan DeBockler in 11-15182 letter dated 02/02/2011 re: notice that Edward Y. Kroub is no longer associated with the firm. [7635385] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (MT)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:MT): The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191 and 11-15192. The briefing schedule established on January 24, 2011 in appeal No. 11-15192 shall govern these consolidated appeals. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [7632203] [11-15182, 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/31/2011. Transcript ordered by 02/17/2011. Transcript due 03/21/2011. Appellant Frank Barbara opening brief due 04/28/2011. Appellee Apple Inc., Appellee Tyler Burgert, Appellee Nathan DeBockler, Appellee Katherine E. Decker, Appellee Todd Feinstein, Appellee Hewlett-Packard Company, Appellee Tracy Leblanc, Appellee Chi Lok Leung, Appellee Michael Mann, Appellee Steven Nakash, Appellee National Business Offices Association, Inc., Appellee Luis Olivos, Appellee Brian Robinson, Appellee Lance Waidzunas and Appellee nVidia Corporation answering brief due 05/31/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7621935] (GR)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?