Steven Nakash, et al v. nVidia Corporation, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 11-15190

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 8:40 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Justin M. Lichterman, Esquire for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. [8730181] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas L Cox, Jr. for Appellant Nikki Johnson. [8671853]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15186. Resent NDA. 08/05/2013 by RY] (TLC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Steve A. Miller for Appellant Chase A. Thompson. [8666963]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 11-15190, 11-15192, 11-15186. Resent NDA. 08/05/2013 by RY] (SAM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KKW): Respondent NVIDIA Corporation’s motion to continue the August 13, 2013 hearing date is DENIED. These cases shall remain on for oral argument on August 13, 2013, at 9 a.m. in San Francisco, California. [8718987] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (KKW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192 Motion to continue hearing of case. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717747] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert P. Varian for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717719] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (RPV)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James N. Kramer for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717703] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JNK)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Justin M. Lichterman for Appellee nVidia Corporation in 11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192. Date of service: 07/25/2013. [8717402] [11-15186, 11-15190, 11-15191, 11-15192] (JML)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 107 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?