District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit United States Supreme Court

Larry Klayman v. Mark Zuckerberg, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-7017

Tags
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 3:22 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207601945 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1497427] withholding issuance of the mandate. [13-7017]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 01207601942 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION filed [1497426] (Pages: 11) for the Court by Judge Millett [13-7017]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207601935 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1497421] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Tatel, Brown and Millett. [13-7017]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207572773 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Brown and Millett. [13-7017]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207569761 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
          PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1479589] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant -- 10 Minutes, Appellees -- 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 02/18/2014 [13-7017]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207560320 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1473903] scheduling oral argument before Judges TATEL, BROWN, MILLETT Tuesday, 02/25/2014 AM [13-7017]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207541117 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
              APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1463285] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 10/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 9,006 words. [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207540700 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1463055] filed by Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg [Service Date: 10/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 7,508 Words. [13-7017] (Primis, Craig)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207537925 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                  APPENDIX [1461488] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/16/2013 ] [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 01207532381 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                    APPELLEE BRIEF [1458211] filed by Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg [Service Date: 09/25/2013 ] Length of Brief: 7,485 Words. [13-7017] (Primis, Craig)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207524225 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                      APPELLANT BRIEF [1453621] filed by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 08/26/2013 ] Length of Brief: 9,006 words. [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207507055 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1442875] granting appellant's motion to extend time to file the briefs [1442434-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 08/26/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/25/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/09/2013. Deferred Appendix due 10/16/2013. Final Briefs due 10/30/2013. [13-7017]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207506404 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                          UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1442434] by Larry Elliott Klayman to extend time to file brief to 08/26/2013. Pages: 1-10. [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207493949 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1435028] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/27/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/29/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/12/2013. Deferred Appendix due 08/19/2013. Final Briefs due 09/03/2013. [13-7017]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472139 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1422975] by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ] [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472136 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1422974] by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ] [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472133 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1422973] by Larry Elliott Klayman [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472130 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1422972] by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472127 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1422971] by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472124 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1422970] by Larry Klayman on behalf of Appellant Larry Elliott Klayman. [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207472121 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1422969] by Larry Elliott Klayman [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ] [13-7017] (Klayman, Larry)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207471833 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1422804] by Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg [Service Date: 02/28/2013 ] [13-7017] (Primis, Craig)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207471830 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1422803] by Craig S. Primis and co-counsel K. Winn Allen on behalf of Appellees Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg. [13-7017] (Primis, Craig)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462720 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                LETTER SENT [1417645] regarding attorney membership to Kenneth Winn Allen and Craig S. Primis for Mark Zuckerberg and Facebook, Inc.. Application for Admission due 02/28/2013. [13-7017]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462717 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CLERK'S ORDER filed [1417641] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/28/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/15/2013; directing party to file Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/28/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/28/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/28/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/15/2013; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [13-7017]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207462714 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1417637] by Larry E. Klayman seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-cv-00874-RBW. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-7017]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?