Tolsma v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00267
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 11:53 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison & Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Robin Tolsma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia M. Hilliker +1 716 848 1547 +1 716 849 0349 jhilliker@hodgsonruss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece, Alfrey, Musat & Bosworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/31/2009 Alan D. Reitzfeld +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 alan.reitzfeld@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/31/2009 Christine Tramontano +1 212 513 3598 +1 212 385 9010 christine.tramontano@hklaw.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance P. Flynn +1 716 200 5050 +1 716 200 5201 tflynn@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2011 Tara Elizabeth Nicola +1 609 520 6028 +1 609 951 0824 tnicola@reedsmith.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Cross-Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    TEXT ORDER. The 109 Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Tolsma v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al 09-CV-267S is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/30/2010. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
        Sealed Document-Decision and Order. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00267-WMS(SG) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
          Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00267-WMS(SG) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00267-WMS(SG) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
              First MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise Pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(c) by Robin Tolsma. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                ORDER regarding the filing of motions to compromise under seal. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                  MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines for later-stage discovery and trial. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                    Mediation Certification by Richard F. GriffinAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00267-WMS(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                      Mediation Certification by Richard F. GriffinAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00267-WMS(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                        Mediation Certification by Richard F. Griffin(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                          Mediation Certification by Richard F. Griffin(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/8/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation. One action has settled. Mediation continues in all other cases. Sealing of settlement papers discussed. Court reiterates importance of confidentiality in the mediation process. Attorney Harrington advises that Defendants may be filing Choice of Law motion. Court advises that it issued an Order granting in camera review of the Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Protocol for downloading the recording discussed. Counsel to agree on procedure and provide Court with proposed Order. Court advises it will extend deadline for providing recording by 30 days. Court advises that it will issue separate order if oral argument is needed on Motions to Remand. Counsel update Court on progress of discovery, including ESI. Counsel advise that they are unable to agree on discovery schedule. Court hears limited argument and advises it will issue Scheduling Order. Court schedules further status conference for October 6, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Douglas A. Latto. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REGARDING AGREED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSMISSION OF THECVR RECORDER AND DFDR RECORDER AND FOR DOWNLOAD OF THE CVR RECORDING FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                Mediation Certification by Richard F. Griffin(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to provide a copy of the unedited cockpit voice recorder under seal to the Court for in camera review. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                      Defendant/Cross-Claimant Colgan Air, Inc.'s ANSWER to 92 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim of Bombardier by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 87 Crossclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Colgan Air, Inc. by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                          ORDER REGARDING THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 5/18/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                            ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief of up to 15 pages in length. Signed by William M. Skretny on 5/10/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to re (18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel CVR filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4a, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4b, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                  CROSSCLAIM against Bombardier, Inc., filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., and Pinnacle Airlines Corp.'s oral request for a conference with the Court and Defendants to discuss mediation is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel, (47 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 28 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 34 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 60 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 68 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 79 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 104 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 294 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Opposition to Plaintiffs' Committee's Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Chief Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/13/2010. Court APPROVES parties' joint proposed briefing schedule relating to Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder: Response due April 23, 2010; Replies due May 10, 2010. Court instructs counsel to make return dates for future motions "at a date and time to be set by the court," and that the Court will then issue an order setting the briefing schedule. There being no objection, court APPROVES Defendant Bombardier's proposed modification to the confidentiality designation it will use on documents to account for certain technical limitations. Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to make a single, joint presentation to mediators on liability and punitive damages. Court extends the deadline for submission of mediation memos from April 19 to May 3, 2010. Counsel reports that the first mediation is scheduled for May 18, 2010. Court rules that mediation sessions may take place outside the courthouse only if all parties agree to an alternate location. Court strongly encourages counsel to agree on mutually agreeable schedule for depositions. Court and counsel agree that an informal conference regarding the proposed ESI order will facilitate reaching a final order. Informal meeting scheduled for April 21, 2010, at 10 a.m. between counsel and the Court's law clerk and IT representative. Court sets a further status conference for July 8, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Bombardier Defendants' 294 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. The Bombardier Defendants are deemed to have joined Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. (95) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (76) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (79) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00267-WMS; (97) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (66) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (87) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (65) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (67) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (104) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (89) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (47) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (53) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (57) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS; (51) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (294) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (60) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (50) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (68) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (73) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (42) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (43) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (33) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (48) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (45) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (46) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (44) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS; (31) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (28) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (34) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (26) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (21) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00140-WMS; (18) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the deadline for completion of the initial mediation session set forth in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to June 30, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010. (39 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 35 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 26 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 81 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 55 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 72 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 21 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Recording by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION signed by Michael S. Krzak, Esq. re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER DENYING the Bombardier Defendants' 275 Motion to Amend. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/23/2010. Associated Cases: (275) 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (90) 1:09-cv-00174; (71) 1:09-cv-00266; (74) 1:09-cv-00267; (92) 1:09-cv-00294; (91) 1:09-cv-00379; (91) 1:09-cv-00378; (82) 1:09-cv-00424; (94) 1:09-cv-00440; (65) 1:09-cv-00488; (65) 1:09-cv-00487; (82) 1:09-cv-00514; (48) 1:09-cv-00727; (52) 1:09-cv-00769; (36) 1:09-cv-00825; (46) 1:09-cv-00929; (68) 1:09-cv-00981; (27) 1:10-cv-00034; (16) 1:10-cv-00140; (12) 1:10-cv-00194. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION modification of Court Order to allow separate Confidential Mediation Memoranda by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for submission of the Confidential Mediation Memorandum required in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to April 19, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/15/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. Relates to: ALL CASES.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00267-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Mediators by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Margaret Eckert, Colgan Air, Inc., Rana Beth Lang, John Lang, Rana Lang, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Pamela Jones, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Kathleen Johnston, FlightSafety, Inc., Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, FlightSafety International Inc., Justine M. Krasuski, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Karen F. Wielinski, Veneita Reid, Lawrence Korczykowski, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Andy Harel, Michael Monachino, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson, Robert R. Perry, Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer, Howard R. Pettys, Dana Hartman, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Kara Beutel, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Robert R. Perry, Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, by agreement of counsel, the deadline for submission of the ESI Plan or Motion for Entry of ESI Plan is March 15, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (ALL)(MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/27/2010. Court construes Defendant FlightSafety, Inc.s 174 Motion for Relief from Application of Initial CMO as Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Motions to Stay 174 179 200 granted from the Bench with no objection or opposition. Stay of the CMO is in effect until Motions to Remand are resolved and stay applies only to cases 09-CV-1039, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1087. Court schedules briefing on 191 207 Motions to Remand, with Defendants Joint Response due by February 22, 2010, and Plaintiffs Replies due by March 8, 2010. Oral argument will be scheduled by separate Order, if necessary. Court extends deadline for submission of ESI Plan or Motion for the Court to Enter an ESI Plan, to February 12, 2010. ESI issues discussed. Court acknowledges that deadlines in CMO may need to be adjusted for later-filed cases. Plaintiffs Committee stipulates that it represents ground claimants. Both sides acknowledge that they will make best efforts at rolling discovery. Court introduces four appointed mediators and interview proceedings take place. Court schedules additional status conference for April 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Phillip Rimmler. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT Defendant Bombardier's (32) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED. Further, that this admission extends to each of the current and future individual actions filed in this multi-district litigation. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/26/2010. (32) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (17) in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS;(28) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (MEAL) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Robert R. Perry, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Xiaojun Pan, John Lang, Rana Lang, Margaret Eckert, Pamela Jones, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Justine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston, Karen F. Wielinski, Lawrence Korczykowski, Andy Harel, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ADR ORDER. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 1/4/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01042-WMS et al.(Martoche, Amy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 60 Answer to Amended Complaint (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by Bombardier, Inc..(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER AMENDING 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re Admission of Attorneys, Appearances and Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. on 12/2/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 11/18/2009. Court denies pending Motions to Consolidate in each individual case as MOOT in light of the MultiDistrict Litigation Panels Order, with no objections. Court directs counsel to meet and confer on submission for Court's consideration regarding a possible amendment of the Case Management Order concerning attorney admission. Counsel reports that the case is progressing and that they are adhering to the deadlines in the Case Management Order. Counsel agree to discuss and attempt to agree on completing several "paperless" depositions before the next status conference. Attorney Musat advises court that additional NTSB proceedings are scheduled for mid-February 2010. Attorney Harrington advises that one case is close to settling and others are being discussed. Court advises counsel that it is working on a Mediation Order that will issue soon. Counsel discuss their respective positions on mediation. Court sets additional status conference for January 27, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. For plaintiffs, Paul Perlman, James Kreindler. For defendants, David Harrington, Richard Musat. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Colgan Air, Inc., Air Crash Near Clarence Center, New York, On February 12, 2009, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Michael Monachino, Robert R. Perry, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 10/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED, subject to payment of the requisite fee. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 10/14/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on the Parties' Efforts to Draft a Case Management Order by Robin Tolsma. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Initial Case Management Order)(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on the Parties' Efforts to Draft a Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Robin Tolsma. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information)(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 49 MOTION for Limited Admission of L Richard Musat (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Limited Admission of L Richard Musat by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of Pro Hac petition, # 2 Affidavit of pro hac applicant L. Richard Musat, # 3 Attorney Oath, # 4 Atty.'s civility oath)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J.: Status Conference held on 9/9/2009. Court advises that it has Motions to Consolidate under advisement. Arguments before the Multi-District Litigation Panel scheduled for September 24, 2009; decision expected in early November. Plaintiffs report being close to retaining court-reporting service and litigation consultants. Parties continuing to work through proposed case management and protective orders. Counsel to provide Court with additional submissions to assist in streamlining objections. Court to issue order if oral argument is required. Plaintiffs have served Rule 26 letter and want Rule 26(f) conference. Defendants oppose Rule 26(f) conference at this stage. Court defers issue of Rule 26(f) conference until after case management and protective orders are finalized. Counsel report still discussing mediation issues. Court approves Plaintiffs proposed counsel organization plan. Attorney Harrington is lead defense counsel. Counsel inquire about filing procedures for the multiple cases. Court directs counsel to work with Courtroom Deputy on resolving filing issues. Court advises that Defendants obligation to file Answers is STAYED, pending final resolution of the case management and protective orders, with an Order to follow. An additional status conference is scheduled for 11/18/2009 at 12:00 noon before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. For plaintiffs, Hugh Russ, Michael Krzak. For defendants, David Harrington.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Letter attaching redline CMO and PO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CMO Redline, # 2 Exhibit PO Redline)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order filed by Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/14/09, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/1/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2009. (SG) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier, Inc. re 40 Status Report by Defendants (Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff Robin Tolsma.. (Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Plaintiff Robin Tolsma.. (Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Defendants by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Correction to September 4, 2009 Supplemental Status Report by Robin Tolsma. (Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Status Report by Robin Tolsma. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-7, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. The Notice for Substitution of Attorney for Defendants Colgan Air, Inc. and Pinnacle Airlines, Corp. is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 8/25/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Patrick Flynnh on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Flynnh, Terrance) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. of Substitution of Attorney by Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the status conference scheduled for September 3, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED to September 9, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. FURTHER, that the August 14, 2009 deadline for the submissions discussed at the July 14, 2009 status conference is EXTENDED to August 21, 2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 7/30/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 7/14/2009. Multidistrict panel will not hear argument on 7/30/2009. The following submissions are due by 8/14/2009: Proposed Case Management Order, Proposed Discovery Plan, Proposed Mediation Plan, Proposed Protective Order, Plaintiff's recommendation as to structual organization. An additional Status Conference is scheduled for 9/3/2009 at 2:00 PM before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. For the pltfs. - James Kreindler, Hugh Russ. For the defts. - L. Richard Muszek, Michael Brady, David Harrington, Neil Goldberg. (Court Reporter - Michelle McLaughlin). ATTACHMENT: Attorney Sign in Sheet. MEAL Modified on 8/11/2009 to correct the filing date (MEAL). (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robin Tolsma. Continental Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Perlman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robin Tolsma. Pinnacle Airlines Corp. waiver sent on 7/21/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Perlman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robin Tolsma. Colgan Air, Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Perlman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robin Tolsma. Bombardier, Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2009, answer due 10/19/2009. (Perlman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc., filed by Robin Tolsma.(Perlman, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. re 21 Declaration,, 23 Status Report,, 22 Reply to Response to Motion, (Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memo by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Robin Tolsma, Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., James L. Neill, Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Carrie C. Davidson, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION signed by David J. Harrington re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. in Reply to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel filed by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M. Hilliker on behalf of Robin Tolsma (Hilliker, Julia) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. A status conference has been scheduled before this Court for July 14, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the Motion to Consolidate that has been filed in several of these actions. Plaintiffs shall file their responses by July 2, 2009. Any replies must be filed by July 9, 2009. General case management issues will also be discussed at the conference. Counsel shall confer and file a single Joint Status Memo by July 9, 2009, not to exceed 10 pages, that identifies and summarizes the issues counsel would like to address at the July 14 status conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. on 6/18/09. (JDK) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 16 Response in Support of Motion to consolidate (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Brady on behalf of Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION signed by David J. Harrington re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-11)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alan David Reitzfeld on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Reitzfeld, Alan) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Tramontano on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tramontano, Christine) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Airlines Corp. for Colgan Air, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Harrington on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Continental Airlines, Inc. re 2 Notice of Appearance (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Goldberg on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver K. Beiersdorf on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Continental Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 11903.), filed by Robin Tolsma.(SG) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 273 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?