Siniscalco v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01041
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 10:10 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison & Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Tina Siniscalco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina Siniscalco

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy W. Hoover +1 716 504 5754 +1 716 852 6100 thoover@phillipslytle.com
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth A. Manning +1 716 847 7041 +1 716 852 6100 kmanning@phillipslytle.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance P. Flynn +1 716 200 5050 +1 716 200 5201 tflynn@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010 Tara Elizabeth Nicola +1 609 520 6028 +1 609 951 0824 tnicola@reedsmith.com
No Logo Flight Safety Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Morey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hedwig M. Auletta +1 716 858 3707 +1 716 856 5535 hauletta@damonmorey.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Drury +1 716 858 3845 +1 716 856 5535 tdrury@damonmorey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Colpoys +1 214 740 4213 +1 214 740 4242 mcolpoys@smith-moore.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Scott David +1 214 740 4200 +1 214 740 4242 bdavid@smith-moore.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Denny +1 214 740 4236 +1 214 710 4242 ddenny@smith-moore.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H. Smith +1 214 740 4201 +1 214 740 4242 chsmith@smith-moore.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece, Alfrey, Musat & Bosworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Third Party Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for responses to 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from December 22, 2010, to January 21, 2011. The deadline for replies is extended from January 21, 2010, to February 25, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/16/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 12/9/2010. Decision and Order on outstanding Motions to Remand in five (5) cases to be filed Monday. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Settlement reached as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Stipulation to be filed. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence in January. Schedule set as to 437 486 Motions. Responses due 12/22/2011. Replies due 1/21/2011. Schedule to be worked out as to 501 528 by parties. Court schedules further status conference for 2/9/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Ken Nolan, Doug Latto, Warren Willinger, Justin Green, Dan Rose, Mike Krzak and James Kreindler appeared by telephone.) (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        TEXT ORDERRelates to: 09-CV-1039S, 09-CV-1040S, 09-CV-1041S, 09-CV-1042S, 09-CV-1087S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that in light of this Court's 536 Decision and Order remanding the removed cases to the New York State Supreme Court, County of Erie, Defendants' 495 Motion to Vacate the Stay of the Initial Case Management Order and FlightSafety's 515 517 525 527 Motions to Dismiss and Stay Discovery are DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel. Relates to: All Cases. Response due by 1/14/2011. Reply due by 2/1/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiffs' 191 207 Motions to Remand; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to transfer cases 09-CV-1039S, 09-CV-1040S, 09-CV-1041S, 09-CV-1042S and 09-CV-1087S, to the New York State Supreme Court, County of Erie: DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close the above-referenced cases upon transfer. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/12/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/12/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
              Sealed Document-Exhibits 4-6 and 8 from 504 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 9 and 10 from 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                Sealed Document-Exhibit 7 re 504 Continuation of Exhibits, re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 11 and 12 re 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                  Sealed Document-Exhibit 4 re 501 Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Memorandum) by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re (93 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 517 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS) MOTION to Stay re (86 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 515 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS) MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service and Filing with Certifica MOTION to Stay re (86 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 515 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS) MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service and Filing with Certifica with Certificate of Service and Filing filed by FlightSafety International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) Modified filer on 12/7/2010 (SG). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Stay re (86 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 515 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS) MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service and Filing with Certificate of Service and Filing by FlightSafety International, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) Modified filer on 12/7/2010 (SG). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re (86 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 515 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS) MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service and Filing with Certificate of Service and Filing filed by FlightSafety International, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) Modified filer on 12/7/2010 (SG). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service and Filing by FlightSafety International, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) Modified filer on 12/7/2010 (SG). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [504-1]; [504-2]; [504-3]; [504-5]; [505-1]; [505-2]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [501-5]; [501-6]; [501-7]; [501-9], [501-10], [501-11]; [504-4]; [505-3]; [505-4]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/30/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                  CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments:All exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11 , # 4 Exhibit 12 )Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 to strike remaining exhibits(SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                    CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: All Exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7 , # 5 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibit (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 striking remainder of exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Dana Hartman.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00140-WMS et al.(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 501 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title on 11/29/2010 (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                          First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 STRUCK, # 6 Exhibit 5 STRUCK, # 7 Exhibit 6 STRUCK, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 STRUCK, # 10 Exhibit 9 STRUCK, # 11 Exhibit 10 STRUCK, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. re 82 MOTION to Vacate the Stay of the Initial Case Management Order (Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Vacate the Stay of the Initial Case Management Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/6/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 10/6/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Agreement reached in principle as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence 10/25/2010. Procedural issues resolved as to depositions. Parties working to resolve disputes as to interrogatories. Progress being made. Court to issue decision as to Protective Order as to Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Court to resolve remand motions. Issues relating to state court cases discussed. Parties to resolve concerns through stipulations. Defendants will be filing Choice of Law motion. Court schedules further status conference for 12/9/2010 at at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE UNEDITED COCKPIT VOICE RECORDER AUDIO RECORDING. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 486 Colgan's Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care. Responses due by 12/22/2010. Replies due by 1/21/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 437 Colgan's Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages. Responses due by 12/10/2010. Replies due by 1/10/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER that the CD-ROMs containing the downloaded audio files from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder that was provided to this Court for its in camera review shall be manually filed under seal; that Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Compel Production of Recording (Docket No. 286) is GRANTED; that counsel for all parties are directed to confer and submit to this Court by email an appropriate protective order, consistent with 49 U.S.C. § 1154 (a)(4), by Monday, October 25, 2010 and that following this Courts entry of the protective order, copies of the CD-ROMs containing the download from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder will be made available to the parties. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, United States District Court on 10/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Supplement Addendum, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint by All Parties by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Tina Siniscalco re (207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court, (191 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court (Notice of supplemental authority in support of motions to remand) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER regarding the filing of motions to compromise under seal. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines for later-stage discovery and trial. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/8/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation. One action has settled. Mediation continues in all other cases. Sealing of settlement papers discussed. Court reiterates importance of confidentiality in the mediation process. Attorney Harrington advises that Defendants may be filing Choice of Law motion. Court advises that it issued an Order granting in camera review of the Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Protocol for downloading the recording discussed. Counsel to agree on procedure and provide Court with proposed Order. Court advises it will extend deadline for providing recording by 30 days. Court advises that it will issue separate order if oral argument is needed on Motions to Remand. Counsel update Court on progress of discovery, including ESI. Counsel advise that they are unable to agree on discovery schedule. Court hears limited argument and advises it will issue Scheduling Order. Court schedules further status conference for October 6, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Douglas A. Latto. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER REGARDING AGREED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSMISSION OF THECVR RECORDER AND DFDR RECORDER AND FOR DOWNLOAD OF THE CVR RECORDING FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to provide a copy of the unedited cockpit voice recorder under seal to the Court for in camera review. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Mediation Certification by Krista GottliebAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Gottlieb, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Colgan Air, Inc.'s ANSWER to 62 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim of Bombardier by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 57 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Colgan Air, Inc. by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 5/18/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief of up to 15 pages in length. Signed by William M. Skretny on 5/10/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re (18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel CVR filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4a, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4b, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bombardier, Inc., filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., and Pinnacle Airlines Corp.'s oral request for a conference with the Court and Defendants to discuss mediation is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re (50 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 306 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 49 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS) Reply/Response,, Joint Sur-Sur-Reply and Certificate of Service filed by Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Martoche, Amy) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel, (47 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 28 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 34 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 60 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 68 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 79 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 104 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 294 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Opposition to Plaintiffs' Committee's Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Chief Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/13/2010. Court APPROVES parties' joint proposed briefing schedule relating to Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder: Response due April 23, 2010; Replies due May 10, 2010. Court instructs counsel to make return dates for future motions "at a date and time to be set by the court," and that the Court will then issue an order setting the briefing schedule. There being no objection, court APPROVES Defendant Bombardier's proposed modification to the confidentiality designation it will use on documents to account for certain technical limitations. Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to make a single, joint presentation to mediators on liability and punitive damages. Court extends the deadline for submission of mediation memos from April 19 to May 3, 2010. Counsel reports that the first mediation is scheduled for May 18, 2010. Court rules that mediation sessions may take place outside the courthouse only if all parties agree to an alternate location. Court strongly encourages counsel to agree on mutually agreeable schedule for depositions. Court and counsel agree that an informal conference regarding the proposed ESI order will facilitate reaching a final order. Informal meeting scheduled for April 21, 2010, at 10 a.m. between counsel and the Court's law clerk and IT representative. Court sets a further status conference for July 8, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re (15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court, (19 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 191 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Joint Sur-Reply in Further Opposition filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Bombardier Defendants' 294 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. The Bombardier Defendants are deemed to have joined Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. (95) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (76) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (79) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00267-WMS; (97) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (66) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (87) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (65) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (67) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (104) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (89) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (47) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (53) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (57) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS; (51) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (294) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (60) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (50) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (68) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (73) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (42) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (43) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (33) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (48) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (45) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (46) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (44) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS; (31) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (28) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (34) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (26) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (21) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00140-WMS; (18) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, Defendants' 265 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED, The Sur-Reply shall not exceed 10 pages and must be filed by 4/16/2010. Plaintiffs may respond, not to exceed 10 pages, by 4/23/2010. SO ORDEREDIssued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010 (40) Motion in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (37) Motion in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (38) Motion in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (36) Motion in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (33) Motion in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the deadline for completion of the initial mediation session set forth in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to June 30, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010. (39 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 35 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 26 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 81 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 55 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 72 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 21 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Recording by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION signed by Michael S. Krzak, Esq. re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re (33 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 265 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 36 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION Joint Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Papers in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (33 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 265 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 36 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION Joint Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Papers in Opposition to Motion to Remand on Behalf of Plaintiffs Krasuski, Borner, Siniscalco, Johnston, Wielinski with Certificate of Service filed by Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for submission of the Confidential Mediation Memorandum required in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to April 19, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/15/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. Relates to: ALL CASES.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00267-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION Joint Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Papers in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tina Siniscalco re 35 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, 34 Reply to Response to Motion,, (09-md-2085 re 256 , 257 ) (Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Designation of Krista Gottlieb as Mediator in this case.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/3/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re (15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court, (19 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 191 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court (Reply Affidavit of Terrence M. Connors, Esq.) filed by Kathleen Johnston, Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, Justine M. Krasuski, Karen F. Wielinski. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re (15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court, (19 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 191 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kathleen Johnston, Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, Justine M. Krasuski, Karen F. Wielinski. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Mediators by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Margaret Eckert, Colgan Air, Inc., Rana Beth Lang, John Lang, Rana Lang, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Pamela Jones, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Kathleen Johnston, FlightSafety, Inc., Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, FlightSafety International Inc., Justine M. Krasuski, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Karen F. Wielinski, Veneita Reid, Lawrence Korczykowski, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Andy Harel, Michael Monachino, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson, Robert R. Perry, Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer, Howard R. Pettys, Dana Hartman, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Tina Siniscalco (re ADR Order, Docket #185, paragraph 3) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re (238 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Affidavit of David Denny by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re (238 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Affidavit of Patrick Coulter by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) Modified on 12/14/2010 to show affidavit of "Patrick" Coulter in place of "Michael" Coulter (SG). (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re (238 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Affidavit of Michael King by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re (15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 15 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 207 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court, (19 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 191 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. David on behalf of FlightSafety, Inc. (David, Bryan) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the Defendants' 229 Motion for Leave to File Joint Memorandum in Excess of 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Remand is GRANTED. Defendants' Joint Memorandum is not to exceed 35 Pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010, (27) in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (24) in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (24) in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (23) in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (20) in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS 1:09-md-1087-WMS. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, by agreement of counsel, the deadline for submission of the ESI Plan or Motion for Entry of ESI Plan is March 15, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (ALL)(MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Joint Memorandum in Excess of 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Remand by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/27/2010. Court construes Defendant FlightSafety, Inc.s 174 Motion for Relief from Application of Initial CMO as Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Motions to Stay 174 179 200 granted from the Bench with no objection or opposition. Stay of the CMO is in effect until Motions to Remand are resolved and stay applies only to cases 09-CV-1039, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1087. Court schedules briefing on 191 207 Motions to Remand, with Defendants Joint Response due by February 22, 2010, and Plaintiffs Replies due by March 8, 2010. Oral argument will be scheduled by separate Order, if necessary. Court extends deadline for submission of ESI Plan or Motion for the Court to Enter an ESI Plan, to February 12, 2010. ESI issues discussed. Court acknowledges that deadlines in CMO may need to be adjusted for later-filed cases. Plaintiffs Committee stipulates that it represents ground claimants. Both sides acknowledge that they will make best efforts at rolling discovery. Court introduces four appointed mediators and interview proceedings take place. Court schedules additional status conference for April 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Phillip Rimmler. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT Defendant Bombardier's (32) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED. Further, that this admission extends to each of the current and future individual actions filed in this multi-district litigation. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/26/2010. (32) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (17) in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS;(28) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (MEAL) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Robert R. Perry, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Xiaojun Pan, John Lang, Rana Lang, Margaret Eckert, Pamela Jones, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Justine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston, Karen F. Wielinski, Lawrence Korczykowski, Andy Harel, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (18 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS) MOTION to Remand to State Court byJustine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remand to State Court by Justine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (1st half), # 6 Exhibit E (2nd half), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K (1st half), # 13 Exhibit K (2nd half), # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs' 180 Motion for Leave to File Joint Memorandum in Excess of 25 Pages in Support of Joint Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Memorandum is not to exceed 35 Pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. 17 in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; 14 in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; 14 in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; 14 in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ADR ORDER. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 1/4/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01042-WMS et al.(Martoche, Amy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tina Siniscalco. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Leave to File (by Plaintiffs Krasuski, Borner, Siniscalco and Johnston for leave to file joint memorandum in excess of 25 pages in support of joint motion to remand) by Tina Siniscalco.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order (by Plaintiffs Krasuski, Borner, Siniscalco and Johnson to stay application of MDL Case Management Order) by Tina Siniscalco.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(Hoover, Timothy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Relief from Application of Initial CMO with Certificate of Service by FlightSafety, Inc., FlightSafety International Inc..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS(Auletta, Hedwig) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Airlines Corp for Colgan Air, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Harrington on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with certificate of service by FlightSafety, Inc..(Drury, Thomas) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with certificate of service and filing by FlightSafety, Inc..(Auletta, Hedwig) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AMENDING 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re Admission of Attorneys, Appearances and Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 12/2/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. from New York State Supreme Court County of Erie, case number I-2009-013225. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 15770), filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp..(SG) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?