TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01461-WYD-MEH

Tags
Last Updated October 19, 2017 at 4:28 AM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 18 and this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/27/13. (jjhsl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and John Doe 18 with Prejudice by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 8, 9, 11, 13, 14, 15, and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/26/13. (jjhsl, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 11, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, and John Doe 19 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe Nos. 6 and 17 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/13. (jjhsl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/10/2013, Entered: 11/10/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 and John Doe 17 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER granting [32] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/01/13.(jjhsl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe Nos. 2 and 3 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and John Doe No. 20 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/01/13. (jjhsl, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM regarding [32] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/31/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 20 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 2 and John Doe 3 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part [27] Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall serve the remaining defendants on or before November 1, 2013. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/3/2013. (trlee, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM regarding [27] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/1/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service CenturyTel, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service Comcast, # (3) Exhibit Proof of Service Bresnan, # (4) Exhibit Proof of Service JAB, # (5) Exhibit CenturyTel Production Response, # (6) Exhibit Comcast Production Response, # (7) Exhibit Charter Production Response)(Stephenson, David)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 4 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/09/13. (jjhsl, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 4 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/09/13. (jjhsl, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 4 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 10 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe No. 10 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 10 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 12 and 16 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2013. (trlee, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 12 and 16 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2013. (trlee, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 12 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 16 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected by Interlineation against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 1 and 7 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 7 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 5 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/18/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 5 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2013, Entered: 6/15/2013 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/11/2013. (mehcd)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/10/2013. (mehcd)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding [8] MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/10/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: 6/8/2013 Motion for Leave
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration in support of motion, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/7/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                                                Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                                                  REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants John Doe 1 and 7 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against John Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3394282), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Movie, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?