United States of America v. Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. et al
Criminal Case Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:13-cr-00084
District Judge Barbara B. Crabb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2017 at 11:14 PM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sinovel Wind Group Company, Ltd, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzgerald Law Firm SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Michael J Fitzgerald +1 414 221 9600 +1 414 221 0600 mfitz@gfalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained John P. Elwood +1 202 639 6518 +1 202 879 8917 jelwood@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Matthew J. Jacobs +1 415 979 6900 +1 415 651 8786 mjacobs@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Elliott J Joh +1 415 979 6940 +1 415 651 8786 ejoh@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Charles Marwell +1 202 639 6507 +1 202 879 8997 jmarwell@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Matthew J. Ricciardi +1 202 639 6518 +1 202 879 8917 mricciardi@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Amy Lamoureux Riella +1 202 639 6760 +1 202 879 8890 ariella@velaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (309) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter by Darren Clay Halverson on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Stipulation Regarding Translated Documents) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 9/17/2017. (lak) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Government Discovery Letter by Darren Clay Halverson on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 314 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Brief in Reply by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 295 Motion to Compel Sinovel's Compliance with Reciprocal Expert Discovery Obligations. (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 9/1/2017: Corrected docketing event. Terminated reply deadline. Put 295 under advisement. (lak) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 295 Motion to Compel Compliance with Reciprocal Expert Discovery Obligations. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER denying 244 Motion for Authorization to Preserve Evidence Through Deposition of Prospective Witnesses by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/4/2017. (arw) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice Regarding the Government's Response to Sinovel's Motion to Compel the Government to Produce Brady and Giglio Material by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 251 Brief in Opposition. (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 8/7/2017: Regarding motion 239? (lak) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Notice Of Supplemental Authority Regarding Sinovel's Second Motion to Quash Service by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 205 Motion to Quash Service, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Pangang Case Order on Motion to Quash) (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 238 Motion to Compel. (Ex Parte) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/16/2017. (lak) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 303 Brief in Reply, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FL-302, # 2 Exhibit B - FL-302, # 3 Exhibit C - FL-302, # 4 Exhibit D - FL-302) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 303 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 226 Motion to Compel Supplemental Expert Disclosures or, in the Alternative, to Exclude Expert Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FL-302, # 2 Exhibit B - FL-302, # 3 Exhibit C - FL-302, # 4 Exhibit D - FL-302) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 301 Brief in Reply (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 301 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 239 Motion to Compel the Government to Produce Brady and Giglio Material (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Brief in Reply by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 215 Motion in Limine for Admission of Out of Court Statements, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Chart) (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 7/14/2017: Added attachment description. (lak) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Brief in Reply by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 236 Motion in Limine: Electronic and Documentary Evidence Authentication. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 296 Brief in Opposition. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 296 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 282 Sealed Motion to Quash. (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/10/2017. (lak) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Motion to Compel Sinovel's Compliance with Reciprocal Expert Discovery Obligations by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Tsai Letter dated June 23, 2017) (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 236 Motion in Limine: Electronic and Documentary Evidence Authentication. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 292 Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redacted) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2017: Exhibit description. (lak) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 292 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., re: 215 Motion in Limine for Admission of Out of Court Statements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summary of Statement and Analysis) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2017: Exhibit description, etc. (lak) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 290 Brief in Reply, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - June 2, 2017 Email from T. O'Shea) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 290 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., re: 244 Motion for Authorization Under Rule 15 to Preserve Evidence Through Deposition of Prospective Witnesses, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - June 2, 2017 Email from T. O'Shea) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/26/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic to 285 Declaration. (Rahne, Denise) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic to 284 Declaration. (Rahne, Denise) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic to 283 Brief in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic to 282 Motion to Quash. (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Declaration of John R. Samia by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 282 Motion to Quash. (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 284 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Declaration of Anthony A. Froio by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 282 Motion to Quash. (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Brief in Support by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 282 Motion to Quash, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena) (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017: Added exhibit description, etc. E-mail to counsel. (lak) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Motion to Quash, filed by American Superconductor Corporation. (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 280 Motion to Seal Motion to Quash as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/23/2017. (jls) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Motion to Seal Motion to Quash by American Superconductor Corporation as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 6/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 277 Brief in Opposition. (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/18/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 277 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 262 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the court deny 131 Motion to Suppress as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Objection to Report and Recommendations 262 by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of the parties' June 9, 2017 reports, see dkts. 268 and 270 , the court confirms January 8, 2018 as the new, firm trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/15/2017. (jls) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 272 Motion to Seal Opposition Brief as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/14/2017. (jls) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Redaction to 271 Brief in Opposiiton by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - May 26, 2017 Email) (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 6/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Motion to Seal Opposition Brief by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 271 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Brief in Opposition United States of America re: 244 Motion for Authorization Under Rule 15 to Preserve Evidence Through Deposition of Prospective Witnesses. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - May 26, 2017 email) (Sealed) (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 6/12/2017. (arw) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Letter Regarding Trial Date by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Letter Requesting Supplemental Expert Disclosure by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Confirmation of Trial Date by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Transcript of Telephonic Scheduling Conference, held 6/2/2017 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see Electronic Transcript Instructions. (jls) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Amended Scheduling Order as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Initial Final Pretrial Submissions due 11/28/2017. Responses due 12/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 09:00 AM. Final Hearing Submissions due 12/15/2017. Final Hearing set for 12/20/2017 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/2/2017. (jls) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 234 Motion to Correct Exhibit 123 to the Government's Motion in Limine for Admission of Selected Out-of-Court Statements; granting 237 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1C, 1D, and 5 to Authentication Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/2/2017. (kwf) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the court deny 131 Motion to Suppress as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Objections to R&R due 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/2/2017. (kwf) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 260 Motion to Admit Anthony Alberto Froio Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/2/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Motion to Admit Anthony Alberto Froio Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2039430.) on behalf of American Superconductor Corporation as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Froio, Anthony) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 258 Motion to Admit Timothy Q. Purdon Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/2/2017. (lak) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Motion to Admit Timothy Q. Purdon Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2039259.) on behalf of American Superconductor Corporation as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Purdon, Timothy) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 256 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena) (Ex Parte) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 247 Motion to Seal AMSC's Opposition to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd's Motion to Compel by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/30/2017. (jls) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 253 Declaration. (Rahne, Denise) Main Document 254 replaced on 5/31/2017. Removed Exhibit 1 cover page. (lak) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Declaration of John Samia by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. in Support of AMSC's Opposition re: 238 Motion to Compel. (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Main Document 253 replaced on 5/31/2017. Removed Exhibit 1 cover page. (lak). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Response Stating No Opposition by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun to 241 Motion to Continue Trial Setting. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 239 Motion to Compel the Government to Produce Brady and Giglio Material. (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 5/31/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Redaction by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 248 Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Declaration of John Samia, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Subpoena to AMSC - August 1, 2016, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted Letter to AMSC Counsel - March 22, 2017, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted Email chain, dated March 22 - May 1, 2017, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Austrian Statute) (Rahne, Denise) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Brief in Opposition by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 238 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Samia (Also see 253 .), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to AMSC - August 1, 2016, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to AMSC Counsel - March 22, 2017, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Email chain, dated March 22 - May 1, 2017, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Austrian Statute) (Sealed) (Rahne, Denise) Modified on 5/30/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Motion to Seal AMSC's Opposition to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd's Motion to Compel by American Superconductor Corporation as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Rahne, Denise) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Expert Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 16 by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Michael Bandemer Resume, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Prof. Ron Schnell Resume and Expert Experience, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Craig Christenson Resume) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 244 Motion for Authorization Under Rule 15 to Preserve Evidence Through Deposition of Prospective Witnesses. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Motion for Authorization Under Rule 15 to Preserve Evidence Through Deposition of Prospective Witnesses. (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 226 Motion to Compel Supplemental Expert Disclosures or, in the Alternative, to Exclude Expert Testimony, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - QMW11_9 Log - Bates Nos. 17227-31, # 2 Exhibit - QMW11_2 Log - Bates Nos. 17232-33, # 3 Exhibit - QMW11_10 Log Bates No. 17234) (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Darren Clay Halverson on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Continue Trial Setting by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Timothy O'Shea) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 239 Motion to Compel the Government to Produce Brady and Giglio Material, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Michael Brown, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Michael Brown, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Darren Halverson) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/31/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Compel the Government to Produce Brady and Giglio Material by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Michael Brown, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Michael Brown, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Darren Haverson) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Compel by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Letter, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Email, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Letter, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Email, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Email) (Ex Parte) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Seal Exhibits 1C, 1D, and 5 to Authentication Motion by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Motion in Limine: Electronic and Documentary Evidence Authentication by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A - Chart, # 2 Exhibit 1B - Chart, # 3 Exhibit 1C - Chart, # 4 Exhibit 1D - Subset of Photographic Images, # 5 Exhibit 1E - Photograph, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Series of Still Images, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Chart, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Police Report, # 9 Exhibit 5 - E-mail, # 10 Exhibit 6 - Photograph, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Receipt & CoC, # 12 Exhibit 8 - Photographs, # 13 Exhibit 9 - Photographs, # 14 Exhibit 10 - Chart) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/21/2017: Added exhibit descriptions. (lak) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Response to Sinovel's Notice of Intent to Depose Witnesses Overseas by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., re: 229 Notice. (Other) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/21/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion in Limine to Correct Exhibit 123 to the Government's Motion in Limine for Admission of Selected Out-of-Court Statements by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 123) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/18/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Forensic Image printout) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 231 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel 211 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/17/2017. (jls) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Compel 211 and Sur-Reply Brief by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Reply by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 211 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' March 23, 2017 Letter Regarding Discovery) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/16/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Intent to Depose Witnesses Overseas by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 205 Motion to Quash Service. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 226 Motion to Compel Supplemental Expert Disclosures or, in the Alternative, to Exclude Expert Testimony, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Compel Supplemental Expert Disclosures or, in the Alternative, to Exclude Expert Testimony by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Opposition by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 211 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from D. Halverson, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter from Jeffrey Tsai) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 216 Motion to Seal Exhibit 127 to Attachment A to Motion in Limine for Admission of Out of Court Statements as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/12/2017. (jls) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 111 - Email 8/17/2011 to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 112 - Email 8/24/2011, # 2 Exhibit 113 - Email 8/26/2011, # 3 Exhibit 114 - Letter 9/5/2011, # 4 Exhibit 115 - Email 9/26/2011, # 5 Exhibit 116 - Email 9/28/2011, # 6 Exhibit 117 - Email 10/10/2011, # 7 Exhibit 118 - Email 10/13/2011, # 8 Exhibit 119 - Email 10/21/2011, # 9 Exhibit 120 - Email 12/29/2011, # 10 Exhibit 121 - Email 2/9/2012, # 11 Exhibit 122 - Email 6/4/2013, # 12 Exhibit 123 - Board Minutes 7/1/2013, # 13 Exhibit 124 - Email 7/29/2013, # 14 Exhibit 125 - Contract, # 15 Exhibit 126 - Notebook 4/5/2011, # 16 Exhibit 127 - Video, # 17 Exhibit 128 - Consent) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 91 - Skype 6/10/2011 to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 92 - Email 6/11/2011, # 2 Exhibit 93 - Email 6/11/2011, # 3 Exhibit 94 - Skype 6/13/2011, # 4 Exhibit 95 - Skype 6/15/2011, # 5 Exhibit 96 - Skype 6/16/2011, # 6 Exhibit 97 - Skype 6/16/2011, # 7 Exhibit 98 - Email 6/19/2011, # 8 Exhibit 99 - Email 6/20/2011, # 9 Exhibit 100 - Email 6/21/2011, # 10 Exhibit 101 - Skype 6/23/2011, # 11 Exhibit 102 - Skype 6/24/2011, # 12 Exhibit 103 - Skype 6/24/2011, # 13 Exhibit 104 - Itinerary 6/25/2011, # 14 Exhibit 105 - Email 6/27/2011, # 15 Exhibit 106 - Emails 6/30/2011; 7/3/2011; 7/22/2011, # 16 Exhibit 107 - Email 7/3/2011, # 17 Exhibit 108 - Email 7/9/2011, # 18 Exhibit 109 - Email 7/22/2011, # 19 Exhibit 110 - Email 8/11/2011) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 71 - Email 5/19/2011 to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 72 - Email 5/21/2011, # 2 Exhibit 73 - Email 5/21/2011, # 3 Exhibit 74 - Skype 5/23/2011, # 4 Exhibit 75 - Skype 5/24/2011, # 5 Exhibit 76 - Skype 5/26/2011, # 6 Exhibit 77 - Skype 5/26/2011, # 7 Exhibit 78 - Skype 5/28/2011, # 8 Exhibit 79 - Email 5/29/2011, # 9 Exhibit 80 - Emails 5/29/2011, # 10 Exhibit 81 - Email 5/29/2011, # 11 Exhibit 82 - Skype 5/31/2011, # 12 Exhibit 83 - Email 5/31/2011, # 13 Exhibit 84 - Email 5/31/2011, # 14 Exhibit 85 - Skype 6/2/2011, # 15 Exhibit 86 - Email 6/2/2011, # 16 Exhibit 87 - Email 6/6/2011, # 17 Exhibit 88 - Skype 6/7/2011, # 18 Exhibit 89 - Skype 6/7/2011, # 19 Exhibit 90 - Email 6/7/2011) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 51 - Email 5/9/2011 to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 52 - Email 5/9/2011, # 2 Exhibit 53 - Skype 5/9/2011, # 3 Exhibit 54 - Skype 5/10/2011, # 4 Exhibit 55 - Skype 5/10/2011, # 5 Exhibit 56 - Skype 5/10/2011, # 6 Exhibit 57 - Skype 5/10/2011, # 7 Exhibit 58 - Skype 5/11/2011, # 8 Exhibit 59 - Email 5/11/2011, # 9 Exhibit 60 - Email 5/11/2011, # 10 Exhibit 61 - Email 5/11/2011, # 11 Exhibit 62 - Skype 5/11/2011, # 12 Exhibit 63 - Email 5/12/2011, # 13 Exhibit 64 - Email 5/13/2011, # 14 Exhibit 65 - Skype 5/13/2011, # 15 Exhibit 66 - Skype 5/14/2011, # 16 Exhibit 67 - Skype 5/16/2011, # 17 Exhibit 68 - Skype 5/18/2011, # 18 Exhibit 69 - Skype 5/19/2011, # 19 Exhibit 70 - Skype 5/19/2011) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit 31 - Skype 3/21/2011 to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32 - Email 3/21/2011, # 2 Exhibit 33 - Skype 3/22/2011, # 3 Exhibit 34 - Email 3/22/2011, # 4 Exhibit 35 - Email 3/22/2011, # 5 Exhibit 36 - Email 4/2/2011, # 6 Exhibit 37 - Email 4/5/2011, # 7 Exhibit 38 - Skype 4/6/2011, # 8 Exhibit 39 - Skype 4/7/2011, # 9 Exhibit 40 - Email 4/8/2011, # 10 Exhibit 41 - Email 4/12/2011, # 11 Exhibit 42 - Email 4/14/2011, # 12 Exhibit 43 - Email 4/21/2011, # 13 Exhibit 44 - Skype 4/23/2011, # 14 Exhibit 45 - Skype 4/24/2011, # 15 Exhibit 46 - Email 5/1/2011, # 16 Exhibit 47 - Skype 5/6/2011, # 17 Exhibit 48 - Email 5/6/2011, # 18 Exhibit 49 - Skype 5/9/2011, # 19 Exhibit 50 - Skype 5/9/2011) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 11 - Skype 12/15/2010, to 217 Exhibit, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - Email 12/25/2010, # 2 Exhibit 13 - Calendar Entry 2/20/2011 - 03/03/2011, # 3 Exhibit 14 - Email 2/21/2011, # 4 Exhibit 15 - Email 2/23/2011, # 5 Exhibit 16 - Email 2/24/2011; 3/4/2011, # 6 Exhibit 17 - Email 2/25/2011, # 7 Exhibit 18 - Email 2/26/2011, # 8 Exhibit 19 - Skype 3/1/2011, # 9 Exhibit 20 - Skype 3/2/2011, # 10 Exhibit 21 - Email 3/2/2011, # 11 Exhibit 22 - Skype 3/7/2011, # 12 Exhibit 23 - Calendar Entry 3/7/2011, # 13 Exhibit 24 - Skype 3/8/2011, # 14 Exhibit 25 - Email 3/8/2011, # 15 Exhibit 26 - Skype 3/8/2011, # 16 Exhibit 27 - Skype 3/10/2011, # 17 Exhibit 28 - Email 3/13/2011, # 18 Exhibit 29 - Email 3/18/2011, # 19 Exhibit 30 - Email 3/20/2011) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attachment A to 215 Motion in Limine, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Skype 2/19/2009, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email 7/22/2009, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Skype 1/28/2010, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Skype 3/12/2010, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Skype 10/5/2010, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Skype 10/14/2010, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Email 11/15/2010, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Skype 11/17/2010, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Email 12/13/2010, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Email 12/15/2010) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Seal Exhibit 127 to Attachment A to Motion in Limine for Admission of Out of Court Statements by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion in Limine for Admission of Out of Court Statements by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, (Attachments: # 1 Attachment B - Expert Reports, # 2 Attachment C - Statement, # 3 Attachment D - Employment Documents) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/12/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Government Discovery Letter by Darren Clay Halverson on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., re: 205 Motion to Quash Service, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Advisory Committee on Criminal Rules, # 2 Exhibit B - CCS Email, # 3 Exhibit C - Vacant Email, # 4 Exhibit D - Board of Directors Meeting) (Halverson, Darren) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Compel by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 209 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael J. Fitzgerald withdrawn from case as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/24/2017. (jls) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. by Michael Fitzgerald. by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Adriene Plescia Lynch by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 205 Motion to Quash Service, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Dissolution, # 2 Exhibit 2 - TX SOS Documents, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Agreement Between the United States of America and China (June 19, 2000)) (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 205 Motion to Quash Service. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Quash Service by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Address and Contact Information by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson for all further proceedings. District Judge Barbara B. Crabb no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/11/2017. (jls) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant Sinovel's request (dkt. 197 ) for an extension to May 26, 2017 of its deadline to disclose experts has brought to the surface (again) the persistent tension between the defense team and the government regarding the timing and completeness of the government's disclosures. See dkts. 197 , 199 and 201 . Addressing the issue actually before the court, Sinovel's request for an extension is granted. On a related point, the August 21, 2017 trial date is firm. Some time ago the defense team flagged attorney workload concerns, but this court does not intend to postpone the trial date again. This case was indicted almost four years ago. The trial date still is over four months away. Both sides must do whatever it takes regarding discovery, witnesses, staffing, etc., in order to be ready to proceed with jury selection and trial as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/10/2017. (jls) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to the Court re: Response to Government Letter dated April 7, 2017 by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/9/2017. (lak) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter in Response to Defendants' March 31, 2017 Letter (Dkt. 197) Regarding Expert Disclosures by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Code Movement Report, # 2 Exhibit - Analysis Report, # 3 Exhibit - Analysis Report) (O'Shea, Timothy) Modified on 4/7/2017. (lak) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Regarding Expert Disclosures and Request to Extend the Disclosure Deadline by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/3/2017. (lak) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On March 23, 2017, defendant Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. filed a letter (dkt. 193 ) in which it reports its intent to file a dismissal motion challenging the efficacy of the government's January 5, 2017 summons. See also Feb. 22, 2017 text-only order, dkt. 188. Sinovel may file its motion and all supporting documents not later than April 14, 2017. The government's response is due 21 days after the motion is filed, with any reply by Sinovel due ten calendar days after the government files its response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/28/2017. (jls) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter in Response to Defendant's March 23, 2017 Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re: Discovery by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re: January 5, 2017 Summons, Response re: Order 188 and Request for Scheduling Order by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/24/2017. (lak) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Governing Final Pretrial Conference. (jls) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Expert Testimony as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Government Discovery Letter (March 1, 2017) by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On February 22, 2017 the court held a telephonic hearing at which the parties made their record on the government's issuance of a new summons (dkt. 177 ) to defendant "Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. dba Sinovel Wind Group (USA) Co., Ltd" pursuant to F.R. Cr. P. 4(c)(3)(D)(ii). See dkt. 178 . The defendant, appearing specially, disputed the efficacy of the new summons, as outlined in counsel's February 21, 2017 letter to the court (dkt. 187 ). The parties will confer regarding the need for a new dismissal motion at the district court level. Not later than March 24, 2017, defendant must report to the court whether it will be filing a dismissal motion (which would be due quickly) or has reached an agreement with the government to hold the issue for review by the court of appeals if necessary. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/22/2017. (jls) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re: Special Appearance at Summons Hearing by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 185 Brief in Reply. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., re: 180 Motion to Suppress. (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2017. (lak) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter by Darren Clay Halverson on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 180 Motion to Suppress. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redaction by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to 180 Motion for Suppress Evidence of Warrantless Searches, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/29/2017. (lak) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Suppress Evidence of Warrantless Searches, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Fairhaven Turbine Supply Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Scituate Turbine Supply Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Sabotnig FL-302) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/29/2017: Corrected docketing event. No filer information selected. (lak) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Executed on 1/5/2017 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (jls) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Reissuance of Summons by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Exhibit Indictment) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Reissued as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Delivered to USA for service. Notice Hearing set for 2/2/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List to 172 Evidentiary Hearing (Sealed) by Defendants Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11- 2/17/2012 Email, # 2 Exhibit 14- 11/23/2012 Email, # 3 Exhibit 15- 12/17/2012 Email, # 4 Exhibit 7- 4/27/2012 Email, # 5 Exhibit 18- 5/20/2011 Email + Attachments, # 6 Exhibit 19- 8/2/2016 Email) (Sealed) (voc) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Continued Evidentiary Hearing, held 12/20/2016 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List to 172 Evidentiary Hearing (Sealed) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6- 4/2/2012 Email, # 2 Exhibit 7- 6/21/2013 Letter) (Sealed) (voc) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker:Evidentiary Hearing as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. held on 12/21/2016 [2:55] (Court Reporter LS.) (voc) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third Amended Scheduling Order as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Final Pretrial Submissions due 7/31/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. Final Hearing set for 8/10/2017 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/2016. (jls) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At a December 7, 2016 telephonic status conference, the parties reported that they continue to disagree over the scope of the government's discovery and disclosure obligations in this prosecution. They reported, however, that this disagreement does not affect either side's ability to complete the evidentiary hearing on December 20, 2016, which will go forward as scheduled and which will be completed on that day. On December 20, the parties also should be prepared to set a new schedule leading toward a firm trial date. The court left the door open for the defendant to file a motion to compel discovery but did not set a filing deadline. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/7/2016. (jls) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Response to Attorney Brown's November 18, 2016 Letter Concerning Discovery by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic re: 163 Letter, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Correspondence re: Discovery) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On November 21, 2016, defendant, by counsel, filed with the court a copy of a November 18, 2016 letter it had sent to the government in which counsel raised concerns about the adequacy and completeness of the discovery it has received from the government. (dkt. 163 ) Perhaps in contravention of its policy not to look for trouble, the court is directing the clerk to schedule a telephonic status conference in consultation with the parties, to occur not later than December 9, 2016 so that the court can weigh in if necessary on any lingering discovery disputes before the December 20, 2016 continuation of the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/22/2016. (jls) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re: Discovery Issues by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter (16380 - 16384) by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER canceling the 8/25/16 evidentiary hearing and the remainder of the trial schedule as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. It is the parties' responsibility promptly to notify the court when they are prepared to reschedule the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/22/16. (jat) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Attorney Appearance Darren Clay Halverson appearing for USA. (Halverson, Darren) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) . (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' jointly-proposed schedule for post-hearing briefing (dkt. 152 ) is adopted and entered by the court. Opening brief due 9/2/2016. Brief in Opposition due 9/9/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/16/2016. Objections to R&R due 9/30/2016. Continued Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 08:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2016. (jls) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter with Proposed Briefing Schedule by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Lynch, Adriene) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter (16137 through 16279) by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re: Production by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in Response to Request for Production of Documents (Dkt 143 and Dkt 146) by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing, held August 1, 2016 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter re: Request for Production of Documents by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List to 142 Evidentiary Hearing (Sealed) by Defendants Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 1/26/2012 Thomas Email to Mayers re Information, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 1/26/2012 Mayers Email to O'Shea re FW Information, # 3 Exhibit 6 - 4/27/2012 McGaunn Email to Mayers re Scituate Docs, # 4 Exhibit 9 - Compiled Fairhaven Consent Documents, # 5 Exhibit 12 - 12/7/2012 Fairhaven Consent to Search, # 6 Exhibit 13 - Charlestown CART Notes) See docket 131 -2 for Exhibit 3, Turbine Supply Agreement for Scituate; docket 131 -1 for Exhibit 4, Turbine Supply Agreement for Fairhaven; and docket 126 -4 for Exhibit 5, Turbine Supply Agreement for Charlestown. (jaf) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 144 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List to 142 Evidentiary Hearing (Sealed) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Scituate 1 - Photo of module containing memory information, # 2 Scituate 2 - Photo of faceplate for power module PM3000, # 3 Scituate 3 - Photo of motherboard behind faceplate with lineside chip removed, # 4 Scituate 4 - Photo of digital signal processor) See also docket 126 -1, Search Warrant and Affidavit; 126 -2, Consent Forms and Report; and 126 -3, Fairhaven Searches. (jaf) Modified on 8/8/2016. (arw) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter for Production of Documents by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Evidentiary Hearing as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun held on 8/1/2016 [4:07] (Court Reporter CS/FTR.) (jaf) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter Re: 15861-15885, USB Drive Contents from 1B12 and Photos from Searches by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Email) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Pursuant to F.R. Crim. Pro. 17(c)(1), the court authorizes defendant Sinovel to serve its proposed subpoena on AMSC (formerly American Superconductor, Inc.), and the court directs AMSC to produce the designated items in court--or at some other location agreed to by Sinovel and AMSC--before trial on the date specified by Sinovel, without prejudice to AMSC's right to invoke Rule 17(c)(2). All documents filed by Sinovel on this matter shall remain sealed and ex parte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/28/2016. (jls) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have corrected the court's report of the timing of Agent McGaunn's telephonic testimony on August 1, 2016: his testimony actually will be taken from 2:30-3:30 p.m. CDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/28/2016. (jls) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/Notice Regarding Application for Issuance of Subpoena by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena) (Ex Parte) (Brown, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On July 26, 2016, the court held an unscheduled hearing on the parties' disputes over witnesses at the August 1, 2016 evidentiary hearing on Sinovel's pretrial motions. Having heard from both sides, for reasons stated at the hearing, the court ordered that: (1) The evidentiary hearing will begin as scheduled at 9:00 a.m. on August 1, 2016 and will continue until all witnesses, save one, have testified. (2) The hearing will reconvene at 4:00 p.m. CDT on August 1, for FBI Special Agent Scott P. McGaunn--who will be in California--to testify telephonically for one hour. (3) Defendant Sinovel's oral motion to require Agent McGaunn to testify in person is denied without prejudice. (4) Sinovel may renew its motion to require in-person testimony from Agent McGaunn following his telephonic testimony. (5) The parties are to meet and confer about the government's two "possible" witnesses at the August 1, 2016 evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/26/2016. (jls) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redaction to 131 Motion to Suppress, by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/3/2016: Corrected docketing event, termed motion, e-mail to counsel. (lak) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Suppress Evidence of Warrantless Searches and Request for Evidentiary Hearing, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Fairhaven Turbine Supply Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Scituate Turbine Supply Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Sabotnig FL-302) (Sealed) (Tsai, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/3/2016: Corrected docketing event, etc. (lak) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Hearing or Proffer Concerning Co-Conspirator Statements by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Attorney Appearance: Alexander Akerman appearing for Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Akerman, Alexander) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Search Warrant and Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit - Consent Forms and Report, # 3 Exhibit - Fairhaven Searches, # 4 Exhibit - Charlestown Contracts, # 5 Exhibit - Scituate Contracts, # 6 Exhibit - Fairhaven Contracts, # 7 Exhibit - Fairhaven Turbines Photo) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Discovery by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 121 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Ex Parte) (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Michael L. Brown by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 121 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Ex Parte) (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 118 Motion to Seal and File Ex Parte Application for Subpoena as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/17/2016. (jls) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Seal and File Ex Parte Application for Subpoena by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At the parties' informal joint request, the pretrial motion hearing and any evidentiary hearing shall be held on Wednesday, July 13, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The deadline to file pretrial motions and all supporting briefs is extended to noon on Friday, July 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2016. (jls) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Additional Discovery Agreement 1 by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Status Conference Hearing, held 3/10/2016 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Pretrial motions due 6/10/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 01:30 PM. Counsel for the Government responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Pretrial Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Submissions due 10/21/2016; Responses due 11/4/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 01:30 PM. Final Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 01:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/15/2016. (jls) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Status Conference as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. held on 3/10/2016. [:32] Pretrial motions due 6/10/2016. Pretrial Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 at 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Submissions due 10/21/2016. Responses to Final Pretrial Submissions due 11/4/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 01:30 PM. Final Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 01:30 PM. (Court Reporter CS.) (jat) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Government Discovery Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 106 Motion for Protective Order as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/5/2016. (jls) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Attorney Appearance: Yitai Hu appearing for Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Hu, Yitai) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Order as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/9/2015. (jls) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Arraignment held on 12/9/2015: Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1) entered Not Guilty plea to Counts 1, 2, and 3. Status Conference set for 3/10/2016 at 01:30 PM Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. [:18] (Court Reporter FTR.) (jls) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Change in Counsel by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic (Lynch, Adriene) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT of USCA dismissing appeal as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 84 Notice of Appeal. No record to be returned. (Attachments: # 1 Appellate Opinion, # 2 Rehearing Denial Order, # 3 Mandate) (jls) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 98 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Applicable Party Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/29/2015. (jls) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 97 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Applicable Party Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/29/2015. (jls) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Ex Parte) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Ex Parte) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by Travis R. Wimberly for Appellant Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 84 Notice of Appeal. (jls) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 84 Notice of Appeal. 7th Circuit to give both parties access to the electronic files marked as document numbers 34, 37, 56 Part 1, and 56 Part 2. (jat) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA: The clerk of this court shall maintain document numbers 34, 37, 56-Part 1, and 56-Part 2 under seal. The clerk of this court shall return document numbers 61, 62, and 67 to the district court to be maintained under seal as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 84 Notice of Appeal. (jat) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to US Court of Appeals re: 84 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Certification) (lak) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 84 Notice of Appeal (jat) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of defendant Sinovel Wind Group's pursuit of a petition of mandamus from the Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, see dkt. 88 , defendant's motion to continue the September 30, 2014 arraignment, dkt. 87 , is GRANTED. The court will reschedule the arraignment, if necessary, after the court of appeals has ruled on defendant's petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/26/14. (jat) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Designation of Record on Appeal by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 84 Notice of Appeal. (Elwood, John) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript Request Form by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 84 Notice of Appeal. (Elwood, John) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Docketing from 7th Circuit (USCA Case No. 14-3105) (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, # 2 Petition (part 2), # 3 Appendix (part 1), # 4 Appendix (part 2), # 5 Appendix (part 3)) filed by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (jat) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Continue September 30, 2014 Arraignment by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Jacobs, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Orders as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. to US Court of Appeals re 84 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Information Sheet, # 2 Order 9.10.14, # 3 Order 5.27.14, # 4 Docket Sheet) (jat) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 83 Motion for Hearing as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/11/14. (jat) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re 82 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0758-1411493. No Docketing Statement filed. (Jacobs, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Setting Arraignment Date and Trial Schedule by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER denying 75 Motion to set aside 68 order denying 50 motion to quash as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/10/14. (jat) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court notes that in July it received several letters from various entities regarding matters that may turn out to be relevant in this case. See dkts. 76 , 78 and 80 . It is appropriate for these letters to be filed and the court will continue to docket them, while noting that no one has asked the court to take action on these matters at this time, so none will be taken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/14. (jat) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 75 Motion to set aside 68 order denying 50 motion to quash. (Elwood, John) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Response to July 10, 2014 Letter by Massachusetts Water Authority by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 75 Motion to set aside 68 order denying 50 motion to quash. (Sharda, Munish) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from S. Remsberg, General Counsel for Massachusetts Water Resources Authority (jat) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to set aside 68 order denying 50 motion to quash by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Pangang Order ECF No. 293, # 2 Exhibit B - Kolon Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Bruer Letter to Judge Raggi, # 4 Exhibit D - Former Fed R Civ P 4, # 5 Exhibit E - Former Fed R Crim P 4, # 6 Exhibit F - U.S. China MLAA, # 7 Exhibit G - Pangang Order (Oct 2013) ECF No. 467) (Elwood, John) Modified event on 6/23/2014 (krj). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On June 6, 2014, the government filed a letter to which it attached a June 5, 2014 email from the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority (dkt. 71 ), which prompted a June 13, 2014 response from defendant Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. strenuously objecting to what it characterized as "the destruction of evidence" by MWRA. (dkt. 73 at 3). Duly noted. Neither side has asked the court for action, so the court will take none. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/17/14. (krj) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Response to June 6, 2014 Government Letter by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Order by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 68 Order on Motion to Quash. (Sharda, Munish) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice by United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File objections to 68 order denying motion to quash service. Objections due 6/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/3/14. (krj) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Order Denying Motion to Quash Service Related document: 68 Order on Motion to Quash by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 50 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/27/14. (krj) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in Reply to Government's February 10, 2014 Response by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Jacobs, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter in Response to Sinovel's January 31, 2014 Letter by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Magistrate Judge Crocker with supplemental authority by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Opinion in Daimler AG v Bauman) (Jacobs, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Magistrate Judge Crocker in Response to Dkt. No. 60 by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Riella, Amy) Modified on 11/15/2013. (lak). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Magistrate Judge Crocker by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email exchange with Attorney Riella, # 2 Exhibit Letter from MWRA) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Lei Liu by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. For Reply In Support of Motion re: 50 Motion to Quash (Elwood, John) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Li Lecheng by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. For Reply In Support of Motion re: 50 Motion to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Shareholder Consent)) (Elwood, John) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Reply by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 50 Motion to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (General Ledger), # 2 Exhibit B (Quickbooks image), # 3 Exhibit C (Thiel Offer Letter), # 4 Exhibit D (Thiel Employment Agreement)) (Elwood, John) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibits to 55 Brief in Opposition, filed by United States of America ((Sealed)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 - Bank account info/checks, # 2 Exhibit 16 - Emails/docs., # 3 Exhibit - GJ Transcript, # 4 Exhibit - GJ Exhibits) (Sharda, Munish) Modified exhibit descriptions on 9/9/2013 (mmo). (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun re: 50 Motion to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sinovel Powerpoint Presentation, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Climber.com job posting, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Registered Agent documents, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Mads' Thiel interview , # 5 Exhibit 6 - Businessuites records, # 6 Exhibit 7 - Congressional Subcommittee Report, # 7 Exhibit 8 - Zhi Zhou interview, # 8 Exhibit 9 - Newspaper article, # 9 Exhibit 10 - Service of Process reports, # 10 Exhibit 11 - Vehicle ownership documents , # 11 Exhibit 12 - Texas Tax Records for Sinovel, # 12 Exhibit 13 - Tri Global Energy Records, # 13 Exhibit 14 - WESCO Wind Records, # 14 Exhibit 15 - Gemini Energy Services Records, # 15 Exhibit 17 - Communications with Defense Counsel) (Sharda, Munish) Modified on 9/9/2013; need exhibit descriptions from attorney, Exhibits #5 and #16 filed under entry 56 . (mmo). Modified exhibit descriptions on 9/10/2013 (mmo). (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Yongji Shi by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 50 Motion to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Incorporation Documents, # 2 Exhibit 2 Corporate Documents-Texas) (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disregard - refiled as entry 54 ; Declaration of Yongji Shi by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 50 Motion to Quash (Riella, Amy) Modified on 8/19/2013; requested attorney refile with exhibits attached separately and described. (mmo). (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Amy Lamoureux Riella by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 50 Motion to Quash (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. re: 50 Motion to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Pangang Order), # 2 Exhibit B (Breuer Letter to Judge Raggi), # 3 Exhibit C (MLAA), # 4 Exhibit D (Former Civ Rule 4), # 5 Exhibit E (Former Crim Rule 4), # 6 Exhibit F (Former Crim Rule 9), # 7 Exhibit G (Memo from Judge Raggi to Judge Sutton), # 8 Exhibit H (June 2013 Committee Meeting on Rules)) (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Quash by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Riella, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On August 12, 2013, defendant Sinoval Wind Group submitted a letter reporting that the parties have agreed to stay further proceedings under Rule 5, then reschedule a Rule 5 hearing in conjunction with other proceedings in this case, perhaps a motion hearing on the imminent motion to quash. Because the speedy trial clock has not begun to run and because both sides already are diligently attending to their preliminary disputes in this case, the court is comfortable staying any Rule 5 proceedings pending further input from both sides. The request is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/12/13. (krj) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter asking to hold the rescheduled Initial Appearance in abeyance by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Fitzgerald, Michael) Modified docket text on 8/12/2013 (mmo). (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 46 Motion to Reschedule Arraignment Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/7/2013. (voc) Modified on 8/7/2013 (voc). (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by Michael J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On July 31, 2013, the court held a telephonic hearing to discuss with the parties the concerns regarding the Massachusetts wind turbines raised in the government's July 25, 2013 letter to the court (dkt. 42 ) and to which defendant Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. responded in a July 29, 2013 letter (dkt. 44 ). Only these two parties participated in the hearing, Sinovel maintaining its special appearance (over the government's objection). The record of the hearing speaks for itself and the parties are to be guided by the court's comments and directions during the hearing. By way of overview, the court entered no orders but directed that the parties obtain additional information relevant to this matter, then meet and confer to determine if they can agree on whether and how Sinovel may mirror the relevant drives in the wind turbines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/31/13. (krj) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Response to 42 Government Notice by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Riella, Amy) Modified docket relationship on 7/30/2013 (mmo). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** If defendant wishes to respond in writing to the government's July 25, 2013 letter, then it must file and serve its response not later than July 29, 2013. Regardless whether defendant files a response, on July 31, 2013 at 3:00 p.m., the court will hold a telephonic status conference with counsel for both sides on the topic addressed in the government's letter. The government is responsible for arranging the conference call to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/25/13. (krj) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Government Notice Regarding Wind Turbines Spare Parts by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disregard - refiled as entry 42 ; Modified on 7/25/2013; requested motion to seal; attorney refiled unsealed. (mmo). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 39 Motion to Admit Jeremy Charles Marwell Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/19/13. (krj) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Admit Jeremy Charles Marwell Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1205842.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Marwell, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of initial appearance (revised), held 6/27/13 as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (krj) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document Letter to Attorney Riella (Sealed) (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Attorney Matthew Jacobs by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (O'Shea, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Initial Appearance Hearing, held 6/27/2013 as to Dejan Karabasevic, Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Attorney Riella by Timothy Michael O'Shea on behalf of United States of America as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., Su Liying, Zhao Haichun, Dejan Karabasevic. (Sealed Document) (O'Shea, Timothy) Seaded on 7/8/2013. Per AUSA O'Shea, document contains grand jury information (rep). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Attorney Appearance: Michael J. Fitzgerald appearing for Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. and Sinovel Wind Group (USA) Co., Ltd. (Fitzgerald, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued in case as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (main document - Sinovel Wind Group (USA) - Austin, TX). Delivered to USA for service. (Sealed) Arraignment set for 8/8/2013 at 03:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Sinovel Wind Group (USA), Dover, DE, # 2 Summons - Wind Group (USA), Houston, TX) (krj) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At a June 27, 2013 status conference, the parties and the court agreed to address the question of proper service according to this schedule: July 8, 2013: the government submits its statement explaining how it served defendant Sinovel. August 16, 2013: Sinovel files any motion to quash service along with all supporting documents and any request for an evidentiary hearing. September 6, 2013: the government files its response. September 20, 2013: Sinovel files its reply. At some point during this process the court will consult with counsel to determine the manner in which the court intends to resolve the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/13. (krj) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Initial Appearance as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. held on 6/27/2013. Government to file statement regarding service of summons by 7/8/2013. Defendant to file motion to quash service by 8/16/2013. Response due 9/6/2013. Reply due 9/20/2013. [:21] (Court Reporter CS) (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appointment of Attorney Brian L. Levine as Special Assistant U.S. Attorney in the Western District of Wisconsin. (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Warrant Issued as to Defendant Dejan Karabasevic. Delivered to USMS for service. (Sealed) (krj) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Warrant Issued as to Defendant Zhao Haichun. Delivered to USMS for service. (Sealed) (krj) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant Issued as to Defendant Su Liying. Delivered to USMS for service. (Sealed) (krj) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1) count(s) 1-3; Su Liying (2) count(s) 1-3; Zhao Haichun (3) count(s) 1-3; Dejan Karabasevic (4) count(s) 1-3. (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet as to Dejan Karabasevic (4). (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet as to Zhao Haichun (3). (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet as to Su Liying (2). (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (1) (arw) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (Riella, Amy)[3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 18 Motion to Admit Matthew J. Ricciardi Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/26/2013. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Admit Matthew J. Ricciardi Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1195674.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Ricciardi, Matthew) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 12 Motion to Admit John P. Elwood Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/26/2013. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 13 Motion to Admit Amy Lamoureux Riella Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/26/2013. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 11 Motion to Admit Elliott J. Joh Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/26/2013. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 10 Motion to Admit Matthew Jay Jacobs Pro Hac Vice as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/26/2013. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Admit John P. Elwood Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1195616.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Elwood, John) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Admit Amy Lamoureux Riella Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1195593.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Riella, Amy) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Admit Elliott J. Joh Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1195589.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Joh, Elliott) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Admit Matthew Jay Jacobs Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-1195555.) by Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd.. (Jacobs, Matthew) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Summons Issued in case as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. Delivered to USA for service. Initial Appearance set for 6/27/2013 at 03:30 PM. (rep) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd., d/b/a Sinovel Wind Group (USA), Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Mayers, # 2 Summons) (llj) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT as to Sinovel Wind Group Co., Ltd. (4). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of B.Mayers, # 2 Summons) (llj) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic re: 5 Complaint. (Sealed) (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPERSEDING COMPLAINT as to Dejan Karabasevic. (voc) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 3 Motion to Unseal Case for limited purposes to law enforcement personnel as to Dejan Karabasevic (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/22/12. (rep) Modified on 12/12/2012 (llj). [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for a Limited Unsealing of the Warrant and Complaint by United States of America as to Dejan Karabasevic. (rep) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant Issued as to Defendant Dejan Karabasevic. Delivered to USMS for service. (rep) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT as to Dejan Karabasevic (1). (rep) [3:12-mj-00011-slc] (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 633 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?