Linden Hill School v. Holland
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-30043
Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 3:04 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Linden Hill School, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Walsh Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Furlong +1 978 409 6161 +1 978 475 5662 furlongm@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Holland Electronics, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Holland"

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson Donovan Madden & Barry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. King +1 413 732 2301 +1 413 785 4658 mking@robinson-donovan.com
No Logo Judge Timothy S. Hillman, ADR Provider
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Linden Hill School. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on May 31, 2007 (afternoon) before Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Court Reporter: Tape. Digital Recording: Yes. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at Philbin & Associates, Dianne M. Quinn, (413) 733-4078 or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on May 31, 2007 (morning) before Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Court Reporter: Tape. Digital Recording: Yes. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at Philbin & Associates, Diane M. Quinn, (413) 733-4078 or the Clerk's Office. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 7/23/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 07/23/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT of Defendant's Counsel in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Michael Holland. (King, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Linden Hill School. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report: Reference for Alternative Dispute Resolution# 2 Exhibit Settlement Order of Dismissal# 3 Exhibit Case Summary, Civil Docket Sheet for Holland v. Zealand et al.)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Furlong on behalf of Linden Hill School (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
              MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Linden Hill School.(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION to Reopen Case by Linden Hill School.(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : ORDER entered. Sixty (60) Day Settlement Order of Dismissal entered by the Court; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2007 (Finn, Mary). Modified on 3/14/2007 (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider, cc/cl.(Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 3/2/2007, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1, Worcester, Massachusetts before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman.(Collins, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference to March 2, 2007 by Linden Hill School.(Furlong, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2007 (Roland, Lisa). (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 3/20/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman.(Collins, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                            REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider.(Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                              Assented to MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Michael Holland.(King, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE of ADR Conference; Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 11/21/2006 10:00 AM in Worcester, Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl.(Roland, Lisa) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy Hillman. (Healy, Bethaney) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2006 (Healy, Bethaney). (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    All parties having consented to the random assignment to Magistrate Judge Neiman, this case will remain before the Magistrate Judge.. (Stuckenbruck, John) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                      JOINT STATEMENT of counsel. (King, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Michael Holland.(King, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linden Hill School. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Linden Hill School.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Holland served on 7/17/2006, answer due 8/7/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Due Diligence# 2 Affidavit of Service)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2006 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Joint statement due 9/14/2006; cc/cl.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Holland.(King, Matthew) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Jillina A. Kwiatkowski re: Service by Linden Hill School. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of John Wozniak re: service by Linden Hill School. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Ptf's MOTION for Extension of Time to and additional 120 days to complete service by Linden Hill School. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against Michael Holland Filing fee: $250.00, receipt number 306216, filed by Linden Hill School. (Attachments: # 1 Cover & Category Sheets)(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 571 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?