American Airlines, Inc. et al v. The Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-10646
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 11:05 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEFFREY W. MORYAN +1 973 535 0500 jmoryan@connellfoley.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Berent Van Deventer, Jr. +1 973 491 3600 +1 973 491 3555 peter.vandeventer@leclairryan.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Crowley +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 MCrowley@GGFC-Law.com
No Logo Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Patrick Connors +1 212 527 1350 +1 212 527 1680 jconnors@jhcb.com
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. LEE GODFREY +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666
No Logo ICTS International NV, Plaintiff
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Jeffrey McLaughlin +1 206 359 8483 +1 206 359 9483 tmclaughlin@perkinscoie.com
No Logo The Massachusetts Port Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D. Moore +1 203 373 2243 +1 617 523 1231
No Logo The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, Plaintiff
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "UAL Corp."
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Ellis +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 Jellis@QuirkBakalor.com
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
Space Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
v.
No Logo Robert S. Mueller, Defendant
No Logo The Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth E. Goldman +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Beth.Goldman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Sheive Normand +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 sarah.normand@usdoj.gov
No Logo 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs, Interested Party
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0701
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: 12/17/2012 Status Conference reset for 1/23/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, for the Cantor claims and at 3:15 for the Silverstein claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Notice of Change of Attorney. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Crowley, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER NO. - - - - - RESOLVING DISCOVERY AND EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS. For the reasons given, I grant and deny the motions of the Aviation Defendants and the government, as follows: (a) I deny the Aviation Defendants two summary judgment motions to set aside the governments refusals to allow depositions of current and former FBI agents. I grant the governments summary judgment motions to uphold the Department of Justices final determinations. (b) I deny the Aviation Defendants motion for an order that The 9/11 Report as a whole, a Staff Monograph, and Selected Staff Statements are relevant and not excluded by the hearsay rule. I hold that the Monograph and Staff Statements are not admissible under Rule 803(8)(C). I hold that the statements contained in The 9/11 Report attributed to Mohammed and Binalshibh, as well as parts based on what the Commissioners describe as insufficient access to witnesses, are not admissible under Rule 803(8)(C). I hold also that The 9/11 Report as a whole is inadmissible under Rule 403. Specific portions of The 9/11 Report may be admissible under Rules 803(8)(C), particularly as bases for an agreed narrative of the history, context, and chronology of events, as discussed in Section V. The chronology provided in The 9/11 Report is admissible under Rule 803(8)(C). See supra note 12. I hold that other specific statements contained in The 9/11 Report are inadmissible, under 803(8)(C), pending resubmissions in light of this Opinion. (c) I deny the Aviation Defendants' motion for a determination that Mohammed's "substitute testimony" and Binalshibh's interview will survive hearsay-related objections. I hold that both are inadmissible hearsay. (d) As to the Aviation Defendants' motion that testimony given by FBI agents during the Moussaoui trial be considered relevant and admissible, I grant the motion only as to the testimony of Samit and Billings in which they recount what they learned in their investigations. I deny the balance of the motion. Testimony as to what their superiors did or did not do is not relevant, and is not admissible. The parties shall appear for a status conference on July 28, 2009 at 4 p.m. At this conference, I will discuss the status of the remaining discovery and schedule a final pre-trial conference and a trial date. The Clerk shall mark the following motions terminated: Docs. 419, 423, 428, 439, 496, and 713. This Document Relates to 21mc101, 07-7051, 08-10646. Motions terminated: (439 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for an Order that the Prior Moussaoui Trial Testimony of Certain FBI Witnesses is Not Subject to Hearsay-Related Objections Under Federal Rule of Evidence 807. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, (419 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION Determination that Khlaid Sheikh Mohammed's and Ramzi Binalshibh's Prior Out-Of-Court Statements are Not Subject to Any Hearsay-Related Objections to their Admissibility and Accompanying Documents. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, (713 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 17 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment to Set Aside The Federal Bureau of Investigation's Refusal to Allow The Deposition of Special Agent Kenneth Williams. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, (423 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Setting Aside the Federal Bureau of Investigations Refusal to Allow the Depositions of Certain Witnesses and Accompanying Documents. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, (428 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for an Order that the 9/11 Commission Report, Aviation Monograph and Selected Staff Statements Contain Relevant Evidence Not Excluded by the Hearsay Rule. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, (496 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION Notice of Cross Motion for an Order that the 9/11 Commission Report and Staff Statements Contain Relevant Evidence that should not be excluded by the hearsay rule re: (491) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). MOTION Notice of Cross Motion for an Order that the 9/11 Commission Report and Staff Statements Contain Relevant Evidence that should not be excluded by the hearsay rule re: (491) Notice (Other), Notice (Other). filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey., (Status Conference set for 7/28/2009 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Jennifer E. Shafer in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit c, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Shafer, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO 26 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs. (Shafer, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs. (Shafer, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (17 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (17 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Cathi A. Hession in Support re: (41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH, 63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 1 0f 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hession Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hession Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 4, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 3 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 4 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Hession Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Hession Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Hession Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Hession Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Hession Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Hession Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Hession Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 18 Exhibit 13 to Hession Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 14 to Hession Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 15 to Hession Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 16 to Hession Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 17 to Hession Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 18 to Hession Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 19 to Hession Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 20 to Hession Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 21 to Hession Affidavit, # 27 Exhibit 22 to Hession Affidavit, # 28 Exhibit 23 to Hession Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit 24 to Hession Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit 25 to Hession Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Subrogation Claims. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2009Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Robert S. Mueller. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Robert S. Mueller. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Sarah S. Normand in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Robert S. Mueller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Robert S. Mueller.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (17 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 713 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Sarah S. Normand in Support re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          DECLARATION of Jennifer E. Shafer in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Shafer, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (17 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 713 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment. to Set Aside The Federal Bureau of Investigation's Refusal to Allow The Deposition of Special Agent Kenneth Williams. Document filed by 21 MC 101 Plaintiffs. (Shafer, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment to Set Aside The Federal Bureau of Investigation's Refusal to Allow The Deposition of Special Agent Kenneth Williams. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller.(Goldman, Beth) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Berry, Jr. dated 2/4/2009 re: At the December 15, 2008 status conference, you recognized that the issues raised in the Administrative Procedure Act Complaint filed by the Aviation Parties on December 8, 2008 in American Airlines, et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation(FBI). et al (08CV10646) seeking the deposition of FBI witness Kenneth Williams overlap significantly with the Summary Judgment motion filed in American Airlines, et al. V. FBI, et al (07 CV 7051) as well as the Aviation Defendants' three evidentiary motions concerning government discovery currently pending before the Court. Accordingly, counsel for the Government, Plaintiffs and I have agreed to the following simultaneous briefing schedule for the Aviation Parties' motion which w jointly ask that you approve: On February 12, 2009, the Aviation Parties will serve and file their Williams motion with supporting affidavits and memorandum of law; the Government will serve and file its cross-motion with supporting papers and Plaintiffs will serve and file their opposition papers; On February 25, 2009, the Aviation Parties, the Government and Plaintiffs will serve and file their respective opposition/reply papers. Under this proposed schedule, all counsel have agreed that each side would be limited to filing a single twenty (20) page brief on February 12, 2009 and a single five (5) page brief on February 25,2009, for a total limit of twenty-five (25) pages per side. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Cross Motions due by 2/12/2009, Motions due by 2/12/2009, Replies due by 2/25/2009, Responses due by 2/25/2009.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/4/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-10646-AKH(jmi) Modified on 4/3/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying State Street Bank & Trust, State Street Corporation as Corporate Parents. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Inksure Technologies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corp..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation.(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Securitas A.B. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Globe Airport Security Services, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Pinnacle Airlines Corp. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Colgan Air Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying FMR, LLC, AXA Assurances I.A.R.D. Mutuelle, AXA Assurances Vie Mutuelle as Corporate Parents. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Aero Assurance Ltd., ASA Holdings, Inc., Comair Holdings, LLC, Comair, Inc., Comair Services, Inc., Crown Rooms, Inc., DAL Global Services, LLC, DAL Moscow, Inc., Delta AirElite Business Jets, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Pan American World Airways, Inc., Unterstutzungskase GMBH, Delta Airlines Dublin Limited, Delta Airlines Private Limited, Delta Benefits Management, Inc., Delta Connection Academy, Inc., Delta Loyalty Management Services, LLC, Delta Technology, LLC, Epsilon Trading, Inc., Kappa Capital Management, Inc., Nautilus Merger Corporation, New Sky, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying US Airways Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying US Airways, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by US Airways Group, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying United Air Lines, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by UAL Corp..(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying American Airlines, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMR Corporation.(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying American Airlines, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMR Corporation.(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against The Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 671789)Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International NV, The Boeing Company, The Massachusetts Port Authority, The Metropolitan Washington Airport Authority, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corp., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(mbe) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?