Guevara v. Republic of Peru

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-23223
District Judge Marcia G. Cooke, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Marcia G. Cooke
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 12:10 AM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jose Guevara, Plaintiff

Represented by Diaz Reus & Targ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Olesia Yevgenyevna Belchenko +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 obelchenko@diazreus.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos Fernando Gonzalez +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 cgonzalez@diazreus.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brant Collin Hadaway +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 bhadaway@diazreus.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Diaz, Jr. +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 mdiaz@diazreus.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Gerardo J. Rodriguez-Albizu +1 305 375 8220 +1 305 375 8050 grodriguez@diazreus.com

Represented by Green & Lloyd PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Kennedy +1 561 394 2665 +4173 417 417 3535 mattkenn@hotmail.com
No Logo Ministerio Del Inter, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Republic of Peru, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Antonio Ketin Vidal, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos Javier Raurell +1 305 961 9243 +1 305 530 7139 carlos.raurell@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fernando Rospigliosi, Defendant
No Logo Ministerio Del Inter, Defendant
No Logo Republic of Peru, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnine P. Barnes +1 202 861 1633 +1 202 861 1783 jbarnes@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ambika Joline Biggs +1 202 861 1500 abiggs@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Cymrot +1 202 861 1677 +1 202 861 1783 mcymrot@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Porter Julian +1 407 649 4000 +1 407 841 0168 mjulian@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrene L.K. Smith +1 202 861 1634 asmith@bakerlaw.com

Represented by Kelley, Kronenberg, Gilmartin, Fichtel & Wander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/27/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aldo Giuseppe Bartolone, Jr. +1 407 648 9450 +1 407 648 4617 abartolone@kelleykronenberg.com

Represented by Ruden McClosky Smith Schuster & Russell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/27/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Francis Sutton, Jr. +1 407 244 8003 +2448 244 244 8103 william.sutton@ruden.com
No Logo Jose Guevara, Counter-Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Luis Alfredo Percovich, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Represented by Moscowitz & Moscowitz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Wollner Moscowitz +1 305 379 6700 +3794 379 379 4404 jmoscowitz@mmmpa.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman Allen Moscowitz +1 305 379 8300 +3794 379 379 4404 nmoscowitz@moscowitz.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (374) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 375 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
WRIT OF CERTIORARI DENIED by US Supreme Court re 348 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich, 349 Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, USCA # 08-17213-CC (hh) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/27/2010. (tm) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned from USCA (Miami/Records): Consisting of (11) Volumes of Pleadings, (2) Volumes of Transcripts and (7) Accordian Folders 348 Notice of Appeal,, 349 Notice of Appeal, USCA # 08-17213-CC (hh) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 372 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) REVERSE and REMAND the case with the instruction that the case be dismissed without prejudice as to 348 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich, 349 Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter ; Date Issued: 7/19/10 ; USCA Case Number: 08-17213-CC (hh) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE/REPLY to 366 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Objection To and Appeal From Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2009 Endorsed Order by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit "B" January 7, 2010 Article)(Rodriguez-Albizu, Gerardo) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 368 Motion to Stay. I am staying the requirements of Magistrate Judge Bandstra's order pending a ruling by the Eleventh Circuit on Defendant's appeal. In light of this stay, there is no need to brief Defendant's Objection and Appeal on an expedited basis. The parties, however, should file any responses and replies within the time provided by the federal rules. I will issue a ruling on the appeal of Judge Bandstra's Order when it is fully briefed. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/13/2010. (lme) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Support re 368 MOTION to Stay Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2009 Order and Request for Expedited Briefing by Ministerio Del Inter, Republic of Peru. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Stay Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2009 Order and Request for Expedited Briefing by Ministerio Del Inter, Republic of Peru. Responses due by 1/14/2010 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Support re 366 Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) Memorandum of Law in Support of their Objection to and Appeal from Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2009 Endorsed Order, Request for Extension of Time and Request for Expedited Briefing by Ministerio Del Inter, Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Document Requests and Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B-Objections to Document Requests and Interrogatories)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE/REPLY Defendants' Objection to and Appeal from Magistrate Judge's December 14, 2009 Endorsed Order, Request for Extension of Time and Request for Expedited Briefing by Ministerio Del Inter, Republic of Peru. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 352 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; granting 352 Unopposed Motion to Stay Attorneys' Fees and Costs pending resolution of the appeal before the 11th Circuit on the underlying case; granting in part 361 Motion to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution of Monetary Judgment. As such, Peru shall file a formal response to each and every request for discovery, the Court having overruled the argument that an order of attachment or execution is a precondition for same. The undersigned finds that this is not an accurate statement of the law with regard to responding to the discovery requests. This argument is premature and not ripe for review in that no attachment or execution is being requested at this time rather the discovery is necessary to determine property upon which lawful execution may issue at a later date. Accordingly, all requests for production or interrogatories shall be responded to unless privileged information is requested or information subject to diplomatic immunity. If so, a privilege log shall be produced in accordance with this Court's local rules. Additionally, the Court specifically excludes at this time Document Request 10 and Interrogatory 6, finding the requests overly broad and burdensome. The amended discovery responses, responsive documents and privilege log shall be produced within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 12/14/09. (sln) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 361 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution of Monetary Judgment filed by Jose Guevara. (Rodriguez-Albizu, Gerardo) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 361 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution of Monetary Judgment filed by Ministerio Del Inter, Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 361 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution of Monetary Judgment filed by Jose Guevara Motions referred to Ted E. Bandstra. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/19/09. (tm) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Discovery in Aid of Execution of Monetary Judgment by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 12/3/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's Discovery Requests in Aid of Execution, # 2 Exhibit "B" Responses to Discovery Requests in Aid of Execution, # 3 Exhibit "C" Conferral Letter)(Rodriguez-Albizu, Gerardo) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 348 Notice of Appeal, 349 Notice of Appeal, receipt of: COR/ROA date received by USCA 08/19/2009 USCA number 08-17213-CC (amb) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals Consisting of (11) Volumes of Pleadings, (2) Volumes of Transcripts and (7) Accordian Folders re 348 Notice of Appeal,, 349 Notice of Appeal, (hh) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Readiness transmitted to USCA re 348 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich, 349 Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, USCA # 08-17213-CC (hh) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of motion to dismiss held on 4-29-2008 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158. 1-29 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting Robin Dispenzieri before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (rd) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of calendar call held on 9/24/2008 before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158. 1-22 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting Robin Dispenzieri. After the date of release, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/20/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2009. (rd) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter re 349 Notice of Appeal,,,,. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. Trial Transcripts. Order placed by Mark A. Cymrot. (hh) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 349 Notice of Appeal. Receipt of: NOA date received by USCA 01/15/2009. USCA number 08-17213-C (amb) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Luis Alfredo Percovich re 348 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (hh) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Determination of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Unopposed MOTION to Stay Motion for Determination of Attorneys' Fees and Costs ( Responses due by 2/5/2009) by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 993356 re 349 Notice of Appeal,,,, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter (hh) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 348 Notice of Appeal,, date received by USCA 12/29/08 USCA number 08-17213-C (hh) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL of 346 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b),, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion for Contempt,,,, Order on Motion in Limine,, 344 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. Within ten days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Luis Alfredo Percovich as to 346 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b),, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion for Contempt,,,, Order on Motion in Limine,, 336 Order on Motion to Intervene; Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 992467. (hh) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara of Filing Proposals for Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Proposals for Settlement)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying Appeal of Magistrate Judge's October 20, 2008 Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 284 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE/REPLY to 337 Notice (Other) of Filing newspaper article filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 244 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendnat Antonio Ketin Vidal; granting 314 and 316 Antonio Ketin Vidal and Fernando Rospigliosi's Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/16/2008. (lc1) Modified text on 12/17/2008 (dg). (Entered: 12/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re 271 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Jose Guevara. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/16/08. (tm) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 271 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Conform With Ruling. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/16/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Calendar Call held on 12/3/2008. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158 (im) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 324 MOTION to Strike 323 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 236 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Filing Newspaper Article from Diario La Republica (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Newspaper Article from Diario La Republica)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 238 Luis Alfredo Percovich's Motion to Intervene and/or Stay Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/1/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 324 MOTION to Strike 323 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 301 MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits, 291 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 264 Memorandum in Support,,, DE-264-11: Report of the Venezuelan General Assembly filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 183 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 183 Motion to Dismiss; granting 243 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims; denying 280 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/7/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in response to Defendants Objection and Appeal [DE-309] of Order of the Magistrate Judge by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 314 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Excerpts)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE/REPLY to 310 Memorandum in Support, 309 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Defedants' Original Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel -- Declaration of SAC Solomon)(Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 315 Memorandum in Support, 318 Statement (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Currier Deposition Excerpts)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 313 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Currier Deposition Excerpts)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi for dates of 11/13/08, 11/19/08 through 11/21/08, 12/08/08 through 12/09/08, 12/15/08 through 12/18/08, 12/24/08 through 01/09/09 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 284 MOTION for Reconsideration re 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition (Ex. 1) Currier Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit (Ex. 2) - Nunez Testimony before the 47th Court, # 3 Exhibit (Ex. 3) - Chavez Thanks US, # 4 Exhibit (Ex. 4) - Second Declaration of Costa (signed), # 5 Exhibit (Ex. 5) - Aug. 6, 2008 Letter to Michael Diaz, Jr.)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 271 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 323 Memorandum in Opposition,, by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 11/20/2008 (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 301 MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits, 291 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 264 Memorandum in Support,,, DE-264-11: Report of the Venezuelan General Assembly filed by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 292 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants and/or their counsel should not be held in contempt MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions filed by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 268 Supplemental MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 314 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Reconsideration re 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ketin Vidal Interview, # 2 Exhibit B - SSA Currier Deposition)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
Statement of: Material Facts as to Which There is no Genuine Issue to be Tried by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 314 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 315 Memorandum in Support, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 314 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Ex. 1) Declaration of Vidal, # 2 Deposition (Ex. 2) Deposition of Rospigliosi taken 05-22-08, # 3 Deposition (Ex. 3) Deposition of Currier (excerpts), # 4 Deposition (Ex. 4) Deposition of Longa taken 09-11-08, # 5 Deposition (Ex. 5) Deposition of Guevara taken 07-23-08, # 6 Exhibit (Ex. 6) Second Declaration of Costa (signed))(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antonio Ketin Vidal. Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply Brief in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit (Ex. 1) to Proposed Sur-Reply Brief in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 271 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying Objection to and Appeal from Magistrate Judge's September 26, 2008 Endorsed Order and Granting in Part Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Discovery Order of September 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2008. (lc1) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Support re 309 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court of October 20, 2008 Endorsed Omnibus Order filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 304 Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,, (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE/REPLY to 266 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Jose Guevara. See DE 306 (lk) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING re 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Defendants Vidal and Rospigliosi to file motion for summary judgment by 10/24/08 as specified in body of order; Guevara to file response by 10/28/08. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/21/08. (tm) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE in Opposition re 266 Defendants' Objection to and Appeal From Magistrate Judge's Sep 26, 2008 261 Endorsed Order Denying DE-259 Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Reconsideration DE-267 filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Errata H)(Hadaway, Brant) Modified text on 10/21/2008 (lk). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
alternative MOTION for Expedited breifing, and MOTION in Limine of all documents and exhibits not previously produced by defendants by Jose Guevara. See image DE 301 (lk) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED OMNIBUS ORDER denying in its entirety 250 Peruvian Government's Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jose Guevara's Deposition Testimony, or in the Alternative to Strike Allegations and Bar Him from Testifying as to Certain Topics at Trial; denying 263 Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. After careful review of the arguments presented, the undersigned does not find that sufficient reasons were established to redepose Mr. Guevara. Likewise, the Peruvian Government's request to strike allegations and bar Mr. Guevara from testifying as to certain topics is unwarranted. With regard to the motion to compel directed at the F.B.I., the Court finds that the F.B.I.'s assertion of the law enforcement privilege and the protections provided by the Privacy Act were proper. Further, the undersigned does not agree that the administration of justice requires disclosure when the F.B.I. has indicated that the publication of the information requested, which was outside of this Court's specific Order, would impede or impair law enforcement procedures. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 10/20/08. (lc1) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE to Take VIDEOTAPED Deposition of Kevin Currier by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) Modified text on 10/21/2008 (lk). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 268 Supplemental MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, Exhibits by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 11/3/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email, # 2 Exhibit B-1 - Ketin Vidal Transcript, # 3 Exhibit B-2 Ketin Vidal Transcript, # 4 Exhibit C - Interrogatory Responses, # 5 Exhibit D - Longa Transcript, # 6 Exhibit E - Letter to J. Barnes, # 7 Exhibit F-1 Costa Transcript, # 8 Exhibit F-2 Costa Transcript, # 9 Exhibit G - Vargas Transcript)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 244 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Antonio Ketin Vidal filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Latin America Advisor, October 14, 2008, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Transcript of Costa Deposition, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Transcript of Costa Deposition)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Latin America Advisor, October 14, 2008)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 236 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 12)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 12)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 18)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich. (Moscowitz, Norman) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 263 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Cymrot, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants and/or their counsel should not be held in contempt, MOTION for Contempt ( Responses due by 10/31/2008), MOTION for Sanctions by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 264 Memorandum in Support,,, DE-264-11: Report of the Venezuelan General Assembly by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 10/30/2008 (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 263 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 263 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. filed by Department of Justice. Replies due by 10/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan I. Solomon)(Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE/REPLY to 283 Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich. (Moscowitz, Norman) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Expedite briefing schedule by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. See image DE 284 (lk) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing re 285 Memorandum in Support,,,,, 284 MOTION for Reconsideration re 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 284 MOTION for Reconsideration re 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Ex. 1, Deposition of Jose Guevara, # 2 Exhibit (Ex. 2) Report of Venezuelan Assembly, # 3 Exhibit (Ex. 3) Guevara Statement, # 4 Exhibit (Ex. 4) - Vidal Declaration (Spanish) (signed), # 5 Deposition (Ex. 5) Deposition of Antonio Ketin Vidal, # 6 Exhibit (Ex. 6) Emergency Decree 049-2001, # 7 Deposition (Ex. 7) Deposition of Waldo Longa, # 8 Exhibit (Ex. 8) Miquilena's Interview, # 9 Exhibit (Ex. 9) Pesquera's Interview, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Deposition Ex. 11, Deposition of Fernando Rospigliosi, # 12 Transcripts Ex. 12, Transcript of Chavez Video Press Conference, # 13 Exhibit (Ex. 13) Associated Press Worldstream 06-29-2001 article, FBI says Venezuela seized Montesinos, # 14 Exhibit (Ex. 14) Second signed Declaration of Costa, # 15 Exhibit (Ex. 15) Acuerdo No. 1/Agreement No. 1 (Spanish and English), # 16 Exhibit (Ex. 16) Oficio No. 323-2005-IN-0101 and 332-2005-IN0101 (English and Spanish), # 17 Exhibit (Ex. 17) Ismelda Perez Interview, # 18 Exhibit (Ex. 18) Costa's First Declaration, # 19 Exhibit (Ex. 19) Reggiardo signed Declaration, # 20 Exhibit (Ex. 20) Basombrio Declaration)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 269 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 269 Response in Opposition to Motion by Luis Alfredo Percovich. (Moscowitz, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, of Filing Corrected Exhibit 5 (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Ex. 1, Guevara Deposition)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing re 279 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, 243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Ex. 1-1, Costa Deposition, # 2 Deposition Ex. 1-2, Costa Deposition, # 3 Deposition Ex. 1-3, Costa Deposition, # 4 Deposition Ex. 2-1, Vargas Deposition, # 5 Deposition Ex. 2-2, Vargas Deposition, # 6 Deposition Ex. 2-3, Vargas Deposition, # 7 Deposition Ex. 3, Rospigliosi Deposition, # 8 Exhibit (Ex. 4) Report of Venezuelan Assembly, # 9 Deposition Ex. 5, Guevara Deposition, # 10 Exhibit (Ex. 6) Guevara Statement, # 11 Exhibit (Ex. 7) Nunez statement to Venezuelan Tribunal, # 12 Exhibit (Ex. 8) Nunez statements to the 19th Prosecutor's Office, # 13 Deposition Ex. 9, Vidal Deposition, # 14 Affidavit Ex. 10, John Stewart Affidavit, # 15 Transcripts Ex. 11, Longa Transcript, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 12, Prosecutor's Office Report No 06-05, # 17 Exhibit (Ex. 13) Signed Declaration of Vidal (Spanish), # 18 Exhibit (Ex. 14) Basombrio Declaration)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing re 276 Memorandum in Opposition,, 277 Statement, 244 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Antonio Ketin Vidal by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
Statement of: Material Facts in Dispute by Antonio Ketin Vidal re 276 Memorandum in Opposition,,. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 244 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Antonio Ketin Vidal filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 239 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 236 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) as to Counts I and II filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING on Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. Accordingly, any and all responses to this motion shall be filed no later than October 10, 2008; the reply shall be filed no later than October 14, 2008. Further, the parties are advised that any future request for expedited briefing must be presented in the caption of the motion. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 10/06/08. (lc1) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case, 240 MOTION to Stay filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Replies due by 10/17/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exs. 1 & 1(a) - Emergency Decree - 049-2001 (in Spanish and English, respectively))(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct 230 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 10/23/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 243 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims of Filing Supplemental Deposition Transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Deposition of 30(b)(6) Witness Gino Costa, # 2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Depo of 30(b)(6) Witness Vargas)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case, 240 MOTION to Stay filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 30(b)(6) Depo of Gino Costa, # 2 Exhibit B - Peruvian Penal Code Art 194)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Support re 266 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report of Venezuelan Assembly)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 261 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 250 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Jose Guevara, or in the Alternative to Strike Allegations and Bar Him From Testifying as to Certain Topics at Trial filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Ex. A) - Guevara Interview, # 2 Exhibit (Ex. B) Declaration of Kevin Currier)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 263 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Currier, # 2 Deposition (Ex. B) - Waldo Longa, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Guevara, # 4 Transcripts D - Guevara Transcript Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on F.B.I., # 6 Exhibit F - Waldo Longa Subpoena, # 7 Exhibit G - Letter from Cymrot to Olkiewicz regarding Subpoena, # 8 Exhibit H - Letter to F.B.I. regarding Subpoenas to Kevin Currier and Waldo Longa, # 9 Exhibit I - July 1st Facsimile, # 10 Exhibit J - Report of Venezuelan Assembly, # 11 Exhibit K - Worldstream Article, # 12 Affidavit (Ex. L) - John Stewart Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit M - List of Documents to be Produced)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony from the F.B.I. by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 250 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Jose Guevara, or in the Alternative to Strike Allegations and Bar Him From Testifying as to Certain Topics at Trial filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of Guevara Transcript, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of Guevara Transcript, # 3 Exhibit B - Longa Transcript)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying 259 Emergency Motion for Protective Order at this time with the provision that the only issues to be addressed at the subject 30(b)(6)deposition are those related to the counterclaims. The District Court clearly ruled that the subject matter of the remaining depositions would be limited to counterclaim issues. Accordingly, both parties may only question the deponent on issues pertaining to the counterclaims. The parties are to strictly adhere to the Court's mandate. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 09/26/08. (lc2) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 259 MOTION for Protective Order of Filing Transcript of 09-24-08 Calendar Call (Attachments: # 1 Transcripts Transcript of 09-24-08 Calendar Call)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
EMERGENCY MOTION for Protective Order by Jose Guevara. (tb) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Calendar Call held on 9/24/2008, ( Jury Trial specially set for 11/3/2008 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke.). Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri - phone number 305-523-5158 (im) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru Representative by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
CORRECTED RE-NOTICE to Take videotaped Deposition of Corporate Representative of defendants Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru Corporate Representative by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) Modified text on 9/25/2008 (lk). (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING on Peruvian Government's Motion to Compel (D.E.250). Accordingly, the response to this motion shall be filed no later than 5 p.m. on Friday, September 26, 2008, and the reply shall be filed no later than 12 noon, Monday, September 29, 2008. The parties are also to address why these discovery motions are being filed in contravention to the Court's Scheduling Order. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 09/24/08. (lc1) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru Representative by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 239 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case filed by Luis Alfredo Percovich. Replies due by 10/6/2008. (Moscowitz, Jane) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 250 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Jose Guevara, or in the Alternative to Strike Allegations and Bar Him From Testifying as to Certain Topics at Trial filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Transcripts Jose Guevara Deposition, # 2 Transcripts Longa Deposition, # 3 Exhibit List of Deposition Topics)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Jose Guevara, or in the Alternative to Strike Allegations and Bar Him From Testifying as to Certain Topics at Trial by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 10/10/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Luis Alfredo Percovich re 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case Intervenor Luis Alfredo Percovich's Notice of Filing Proposed Complaint In Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moscowitz, Norman) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Almon by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena for Deposition - Thomas Almon (Ex. A))(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 122 Motion to Amend Order for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Supplementing Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/22/08. (tm) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 233 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel the Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Representative; deferring ruling on 235 Motion for Sanctions. As such, the Court, once again, orders the defendants to produce a 30(b)(6) representative(s) that is competent to testify as to all areas designated in the notice within five (5) days of the date of this Order. The designee(s) shall be produced at a mutually agreeable date and time in Miami, Florida. If defendants fail to comply with this Order, they shall be ordered to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed on the defendants and/or their counsel personally for failing to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 09/22/08. (lc1) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 239 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Antonio Ketin Vidal by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Counterclaims by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit E - Part 2)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 Second MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions, 235 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Luis Alfredo Percovich re 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case Intervenor Luis Alfredo Percovich's Rule 7.1 Certification (Moscowitz, Norman) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay case by Luis Alfredo Percovich. Responses due by 10/6/2008 See image DE 238 (lk) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 238 MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 10/6/2008 (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene And/Or Stay Case by Luis Alfredo Percovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E)(Moscowitz, Jane) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 233 Second MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of prejudgment interest, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions by Jose Guevara. see image DE 233 (lk) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Calendar Call held on 9/10/2008, Case continued: Calendar Call reset for 9/24/2008 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Jury Trial reset for 9/29/2008 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri - phone number 305-523-5158 (im) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
Second MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition and for Sanctions by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 9/29/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 127 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru, 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending AppealDefendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal, 123 Memorandum in Support, SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 196 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Granting his Unopposed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 211 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Memorandum of Law, Declarations, Affidavits and Deposition Excerpts, and Statement of Facts in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/9/08. (tm) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 119 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 203 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/9/08. (tm) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 124 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying as moot 124 Motion for Protective Order the Court finding that these motions were withdrawn by D.E. 195; denying as moot 225 Defendant Peruvian Government's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Mr. Guevara's Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition and denying as moot 227 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions of Defendants Republica Del Peru et. al. The Court specifically finds that these competing motions do not present a true conflict in that Defendant has designated Mr. Costa as its 30(b)(6) designee. He shall be produced at a mutually agreeable date and time in Miami, Florida. Defendant shall be certain that Mr. Costa is capable of testifying on all areas of inquiry in the notice, otherwise defendants shall insure that an additional designee is identified along with Mr. Costa so that such is assured. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 09/08/08. (lc1) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waldo Longa (amended) by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 9/22/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 225 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Renotice of Corp Rep Depo of Repulica del Peru, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email Exchanges, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Objections & Designations in Response to Rule 30[b] 6 Deposition Notices, # 4 Deposition (Exhibit 4) Antonio Ketin Vidal 05-22-08, # 5 Deposition (Exhibit 5) Fernando Rospigliosi 05-22-08)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 213 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Further Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Trial Subpoenas. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 09/3/08. (lc1) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 197 Motion to Compel; denying 210 Motion for Protective Order; denying 214 Motion to Strike. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 8/27/2008. (rg) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 214 MOTION to Strike 213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Trial Subpoenas MOTION to Strike 213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Trial Subpoenas filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mails)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 212 Reply to Response to Motion, 197 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony, of Filing Supplemental Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 119 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ministerio del Interior del Peru by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Republica del Peru by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 202 Statement, 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 119 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 202 Statement, 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 119 , 196 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on a finding thatPlaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Is Unopposed filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 211 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 202 Statement, 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 119 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 202 Statement, 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 119 , 196 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on a finding thatPlaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Is Unopposed filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 213 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Trial Subpoenas by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 9/11/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange, # 2 Exhibit B - Email Exchange)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Trial Subpoenas by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 197 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony, filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 202 Statement, 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 119 by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 9/8/2008 (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order ; Memorandum in Support incorporated at D.E. 209 by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 197 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony, filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Jose Guevara for dates of October 10-20 and November 5-21, 2008 Michael Diaz, Jr. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara re 198 Order,,, of Non-Comliance (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 197 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony, filed by Department of Justice. Replies due by 8/25/2008. (lk) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
Statement of: Material Facts by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 204 Memorandum in Support, 203 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 200 Memorandum in Opposition, 201 Affidavit,,, 203 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 9/2/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
Statement of: Material Facts in Dispute by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 200 Memorandum in Opposition. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT signed by : Mark A. Cymrot (Declaration). re 200 Memorandum in Opposition by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Jose Guevara dated July 23, 2008, # 2 Deposition Antonio Ketin Vidal dated May 22, 2008, # 3 Deposition Fernando Rospigliosi dated May 23, 2008, # 4 Exhibit Emergency Decree No.049-2001, # 5 Affidavit FBI Special Agent, John Stewart, # 6 Exhibit Article from Associated Press Worldstream, June 29, 2001, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Gino Costa dated August 13, 2008, # 8 Exhibit Letter dated June 21, 2005 from Minster of Interior, # 9 Exhibit IRS Informants' Claims Chart, # 10 Exhibit Letter dated July 1, 2008 from AUSA Carlos Raurell to Mark A. Cymrot)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 119 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of DE BENE ESSE OF GINO COSTA SANTOLALLA by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE to 197 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony. The Court hereby orders defendants and the relevant non-party witnesses, F.B.I. Special Agents Kevin Currier and Waldo Longa to respond to said motion by noon, Monday, August 18, 2008, and the reply shall be filed by noon, Thursday, August 21, 2008. The Court further orders all parties and the non-party witnesses that a meaningful effort to resolve this motion shall be made by all involved within three (3)days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall insure that any pro se or non-party witnesses are served with this mandate. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 08/12/08. (lc1) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Testimony of FBI Agents or, Alternatively, to Perpetuate Testimony, by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FBI Subpoenas, # 2 Exhibit B - Relevancy Statement, # 3 Exhibit C - Raurell Letter)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment, MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on a finding that, Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Is Unopposed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi re 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Protective Order (of Withdrawal) (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark A. Cymrot, Esq. by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena duces tecum)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 185 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings ; granting 186 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings ; granting 187 Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 07/15/08. (lc1) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 183 MOTION to Strike 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses MOTION to Dismiss 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 183 MOTION to Strike 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses MOTION to Dismiss 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jose Guevara (Amended) by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Currier (Amended) by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waldo Longa (Amended) by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Andrene L.K. Smith, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982312. (cw) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Ambika J. Biggs, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982311. (cw) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Johnine P. Barnes, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #982310. (cw) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER resetting calendar call and trial. The calendar call in this case is reset to September 10, 2008, and the trial is reset for the two-week trial period commencing September 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/17/2008. (ra) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses, MOTION to Dismiss 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 7/3/2008 (Belchenko, Olesia) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter of Videotaped Deposition Directed to Thomas Almon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Notice)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 176 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 174 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial ConferenceDefendant's MOTION to Expedite ConsiderationPlaintiff's MOTION to Strike 174 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial ConferenceDefendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration, 174 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial ConferenceDefendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial Conference, 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Continuance of Trial Date and for Pretrial Conference filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of FBI Special Agent Waldo Longa by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena - Deposition of FBI Special Agent, Waldo Longa)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of FBI Supervisory Special Agent, Kevin Currier by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subpoena for Deposition - FBI Supervisory Special Agent Kevin Currier)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jose Guevara by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Taking Deposition of Jose Guevara)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 170 Memorandum of Law, 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Continuance of Trial Date and for Pretrial Conference filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Depo Notices of 12-20-06, # 2 Exhibit B - Depo Notices of 7-11-07)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 174 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial ConferenceDefendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial Conference, 175 Memorandum in Support, by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 6/20/2008 (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 174 Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial ConferenceDefendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial Conference filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Consideration of [D.E. 169] Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date, and for Pre-trial Conference by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
PRETRIAL STIPULATION (PROPOSED) by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
PRETRIAL STIPULATION by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Republic of Peru re 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Continuance of Trial Date and for Pretrial Conference Notice of Filing Declaration of Mark A. Cymrot (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery, Continuance of Trial Date and for Pretrial Conference by Republic of Peru. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Continuance of Trial Date and for Pretrial Conference by Republic of Peru. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default as to Republic of Peru and Ministry of Interior of Peru by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default as to Republic of Peru and Ministry of Interior of Peru by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Jose Guevara by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter.(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION [DE 132] IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME [DE 131] (Diaz, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 155 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 05/23/08. (lc1) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Declaration of Mark Cymrot)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 123 Memorandum in Support, (SUR-REPLY) IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND ORDER FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting 160 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Order for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Plaintiff shall file his sur-reply as a separate document. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/22/2008. (ra) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Order for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) And To Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Order for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 29 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 152 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jose Guevara, Error: Two or More Document Events Filed as One. Correction: Alternative Motion to strike 158 docketed. Instruction to Filer=In the future please select all applicable Events; (lk) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
Alternative MOTION to Strike declaration of Attorney Mark Cymrot by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 6/3/2008. (See image DE 152]). (lk) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 155 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, and Antonio Ketin Vidal, and Fernando Rospigliosi. Other: No description added to attachment. In the future: Add a description to all attachments. (lk) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying in its entirety 148 Motion for Protective Order and plaintiffs' cross motion 152 158 to strike is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ted E. Bandstra on 5/19/2008. (rg) Modified text on 5/23/2008 (wc). (Entered: 05/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1Supplemental Memorandum. (Julian, Matthew) Modified on 5/21/2008 (lk). (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 148 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order FROM DEPOSITION NOTICES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO Extend the Time to Respond to Motions RE: DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 148 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order FROM DEPOSITION NOTICES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO Extend the Time to Respond to Motions filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 148 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order FROM DEPOSITION NOTICES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO Extend the Time to Respond to Motions filed by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 144 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to 1 Notice of Removal, 127 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru filed by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Memorandum in Support)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Emergency Motion for Protective Order from Deposition Notices or in the Alternative to Extend the Time to Respond to Motions by Republic of Peru. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order FROM DEPOSITION NOTICES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO Extend the Time to Respond to Motions by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 MOTION for Conference Call filed by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 141 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Republic of Peru,, Ministerio Del Inter, Error: Two or More Document Events Filed as One. Correction: Motion for extension of time redocketed as DE 144 . Instruction to Filer=In the future please select all applicable Events; (lk) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
Alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to 1 Notice of Removal, by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. ( See image DE 141 ). (lk) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 142 MOTION for Conference Call filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Conference Call by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 127 Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order, 125 Memorandum of Law filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Strike 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. Replies due by 5/19/2008. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 137 Motion for Sanctions, granting 137 Motion to Strike Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/12/08. (tm) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION to Strike Improper Letter To Court by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 5/22/2008 (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying in part 132 and referring to Magistrate Judge 133 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/8/2008. (ra) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 131 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/8/2008. (ra) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: originally filed as 132 MOTION to Strike 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to filed by Jose Guevara, Error: Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief.;CORRECTION: docketed 133 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Guevara,, Instruction To Filer= In the future please select all applicable Reliefs by holding down ctrl key and selecting extension of time and sanctions; (tb) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions by Jose Guevara.(see image 132 ) (tb) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pendi by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 5/21/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fernando Rospigliosi by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Antonio Ketin Vidal by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke : Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2008 re 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal,, Fernando Rospigliosi,, 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Republic of Peru,, Ministerio Del Inter,, Antonio Ketin Vidal,, Fernando Rospigliosi,. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri - phone number 305-523-5158 (im) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Republica del Peru and Ministerio del Interior del Peru by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email to Counsel)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Jose Guevara. (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Extension of Time Pursuant to Rule 56(f) and for Protective Orders by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f), MOTION for Protective Order by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark A. Cymrot, Esq.)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 122 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 5/1/2008 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative with Most Knowledge of Defendant Ministerio del Interior del Peru by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Representative With Most Knowledge from Defendant Republic of Peru by Jose Guevara.(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jose Guevara. Responses due by 4/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 85 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/31/2008. (ra) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER deferring ruling on 87 Motion of Defendants Antonio Ketin Vidal and Fernando Rospigliosi to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction. A hearing on this motion will take place on April 29, 2008, at 3:30pm. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/28/2008. (ra) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brant Collin Hadaway on behalf of Jose Guevara (Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
*Endorsed Order Vacating Notice of Hearing (D.E. 113). The calendar call in this case will take place on June 18, 2008 per the Final Scheduling Order (D.E. 114) entered on March 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/21/2008.(ra) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/23/2008 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 6/18/2008 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Motions due by 4/14/2008. Motions due by 4/14/2008. Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/2/2008.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 03/20/08.(im) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call reset for 3/25/2008 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. (im) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/16/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jose Guevara of Withdrawal of Appearance of Scott A. Burr as Counsel of Record (Burr, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Supplemental Authority re 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens, 95 Memorandum in Opposition, by Jose Guevara (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Authority)(Hadaway, Brant) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Docket Correction: re 107 Notice of Unavailability filed by Jose Guevara, Error: Omitted Dates; Correction: Added Dates of Unavailability; (ls) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Jose Guevara for dates of November 5, 2007 through November 9, 2007 and December 3, 2007 thorugh January 4, 2008 (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Jose Guevara for dates of November 5-9, 2007 and December 3, 2007 to January 4, 2008. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY for dates of 11/5/2007 through 11/9/2007 and 12/3/2007 through 1/4/2008 by Jose Guevara (Diaz, Michael) Modified on 10/25/2007 (ls). [Modified to read as displayed above, by Clerk] (Entered: 10/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ORDER granting 79 Defendants' Motion Regarding Magistrate's Jurisdiction. The motion is granted for the reasons stated in open court. This case will not be referred to a magistrate judge pursuant to the parties' consent to magistrate jurisdiction as stated in the parties' joint scheduling report.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/27/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 69 see image 65 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 09/26/2007. (ld) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 99 Response in Support of Motion filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal,, Fernando Rospigliosi, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction: Re-docketed as Reply to Response to Motion by Clerk. (ls) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. [See Image at DE #99] (ls) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 98 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Republic of Peru,, Ministerio Del Inter,, Antonio Ketin Vidal,, Fernando Rospigliosi, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction: Re-docketed as Reply to Response to Motion by Clerk. (ls) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. [See Image at DE #98] (ls) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a reply brief that is two pages over the page limitation prescribed in the local rules. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/18/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Their Reply Memorandum in Support of the Peru Parties' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 88 Memorandum in Support, 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens, 86 Memorandum in Support, filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice Re-Setting Status Conference: Status Conference re-set for 9/26/2007 at 1:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/30/2007.(lc1) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 Defendant's MOTION for an order determining that a Magistrate Judge shall not be designated to hear dispositive motions and trial of this case filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 91 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion Regarding Magistrate Jurisdiction on or before August 22, 2007. The Court notes that the Parties in this matter have made numerous requests for extensions of time. Moreover, these requests appear to display a lack of diligence and efficiency in prosecuting this matter. Therefore, the Parties are forewarned that the Court will no longer freely grant such requests.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/16/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 84 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens, 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint). Plaintiff shall file his oppositions on or before September 5, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be granted.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/14/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens, 88 Memorandum in Support, 86 Memorandum in Support,, 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Jose Guevara. (Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) filed by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/21/2008
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 8/24/2007 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) for Forum Non Conveniens by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. Responses due by 8/24/2007 (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 Defendant's MOTION for an order determining that a Magistrate Judge shall not be designated to hear dispositive motions and trial of this case filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 81 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose Guevara, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction: Re-docketed as a Response (Other) by the Clerk. (ls) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY to 68 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Jose Guevara. [See Image at DE #81] (ls) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Support re 79 Defendant's MOTION for an order determining that a Magistrate Judge shall not be designated to hear dispositive motions and trial of this case filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1# 2 Exhibit Attachment 2# 3 Exhibit Attachment 3# 4 Exhibit Attachment 4)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Defendant's MOTION for an order determining that a Magistrate Judge shall not be designated to hear dispositive motions and trial of this case by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Plaintiff shall file its sur-reply as a separate document on or before August 6, 2007.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/2/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 9/5/2007 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/2/07.(tm) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT REGARDING Election To Jurisdiction By A United States Magistrate Judge by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Porter Julian on behalf of Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part 65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint no later than August 10, 2007. Moreover, no further extensions of time shall be granted as the Court has already extended this deadline on several occasions. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/27/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Carlos) Modified on 7/19/2007 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #65] (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 66 Memorandum of Law, filed by Republic of Peru,, Ministerio Del Inter, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction: Re-docketed as a Memorandum in Support by the Clerk. (ls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order, 69 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. [See Image at DE #66] (ls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order filed by Republic of Peru,, Ministerio Del Inter, Error: Multiple reliefs filed as one relief; Correction: Re-filed the document(s) with appropriate reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. [See Image at DE #65] (ls) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order filed by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order, 66 Memorandum of Law, To Defendants' Motions for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 65 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A# 2 Local Rule 7.1(A)(3) Statement)(Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint and for a Protective Order by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter. (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 63 MOTION for Attorney: Mark A. Cymrot to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963108; Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 7/16/07.(sl) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Attorney Mark A. Cymrot, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #963108. (cw) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Porter Julian on behalf of Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter (Julian, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Retain Counsel. Defendant Republic of Peru shall retain counsel on or before June 30, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be granted.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/18/2007. (lc1) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Retain Counsel filed by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to retain counsel by Republic of Peru. (tb) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING re 57 Letter from Defendants Requesting Extension of Time to retain counsel. Deadline to retain counsel 6/18/07.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/5/07.(tm) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/6/2007
Letter from M.C. Oscar S. Gonzalez Carmona to the Court RE: Extension of time to retain counsel (pa) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Docket Correction: re 54 Notice of Change of Address filed by Republic of Peru, Error: More than one document filed, filer instructed: all pleadings must be filed as a separate document(s) Correction: portion missing docketed by the Court. (ls) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Compliance by Republic of Peru re 53 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney [See Image at DE #54] (ls) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by William Francis Sutton, Jr (Sutton, William) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aldo Giuseppe Bartolone, Jr terminated. Additional instructions and deadlines for parties contained in order.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/26/07. (tm) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER:, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown for pretrial Jury Trial set for 3/31/2008 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 3/26/2008 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2007. Discovery due by 11/30/2007.Fact Discovery due by 10/12/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2007. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/22/2008.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 04/19/07.(im) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendants by Republic of Peru. Responses due by 4/27/2007 (Sutton, William) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE UPDATED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by 5/29/07.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/13/07.(tm) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
REPORT REGARDING Joint Scheduling Report by Jose Guevara, Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi, Allen Poppleton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report.Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/16/07. (tm) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/9/07 (tm) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report And Order by Jose Guevara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Carlos) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Discovery. Signed by Judge Stephen T. Brown on 01/23/07 (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/19/07. (tm) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown fornon-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/19/07. (tm) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: (Miami Records) Consisting of (1) Volume of Pleadings and (1) Accordian Folder 33 appeal USCA #: 05-16235-II (hh) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
USCA MANDATE (certified copy) as to Jose Guevara RE: 33 appeal reversed and remanded case back to district court Date Issued: 12/30/06 USCA Appeal #: 05-16235-II (hh) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of Receipt of COR/ROA from USCA on 3/16/06 in re: appeal by Jose Guevara (pc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of Receipt of COR/ROA on 3/16/06 in re: appeal by Jose Guevara (pc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
Certificate of readiness as to Jose Guevara transmitted to USCA Re: [33-1] appeal by Jose Guevara USCA NUMBER: 05-16235-II (hh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
Stipulated NOTICE of filing document omitted from the Record by Jose Guevara, Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Receipt of Notice of Appeal Transmittal Letter from USCA on 11/10/05 as to Jose Guevara Re: [33-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 05-16235-II (hh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
Transcript Information Form re: as to Jose Guevara [33-1] appeal by Jose Guevara . No transcript requested. (hh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jose Guevara of [32-1] order EOD Date 10/18/05, [31-1] order EOD Date: 10/7/05; Filing Fee: $ 255.00; Receipt #: 930027 Copies to USCA and Counsel of Record. (hh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The clerk shall CLOSE this case. ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/14/05) [EOD Date: 10/18/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/6/05) [EOD Date: 10/7/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
Witness list by Jose Guevara (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
FACT Witness list by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
CLERK'S appointment of Allen Poppleton as Mediator (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
Mail returned as undeliverable (DE 19) as to defendant (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None
Letter MOTION by Jose Guevara to appoint Mediator (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
Mail returned as undeliverable (DE 16 ) as to William Francis Sutton (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter to response to [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter, Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi to response to [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Jose Guevara to [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Jose Guevara to [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [17-1] motion for Hearing on [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/7/05) [EOD Date: 6/8/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
RULE 26 Disclosure/Witness list by Jose Guevara (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/7/2005
REQUEST by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter (Attorney ) for Hearing on [14-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER referring case to mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/05) [EOD Date: 6/1/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/05) CCAP [EOD Date: 6/1/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/6/2005
MOTION with memorandum in support by Antonio Ketin Vidal, Fernando Rospigliosi (Attorney Aldo Giuseppe Bartolone Jr.) to dismiss plaintiff's complaint (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
Joint Scheduling Report of Scheduling Meeting by Jose Guevara, Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter 5/13/05 (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
Mail returned as undeliverable (DE 7); Bad Address (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing proof of service of process on Defendant Ministerio Del Interior by Jose Guevara (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFICATION REGARDING REFERRED CASES that pursuant to Administrative Order 2005-9, this case is ready to be transferred to Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 4/1/05) [EOD Date: 4/8/05] (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing proof of service of process on Defendant Peru with attached exhibits by Jose Guevara (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing proof of service of process on defendants Antonio Ketin (Exhibit A) and Fernando Rospigliosi (B) by Jose Guevara (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [6-1] motion to extend time complete service of process on vidal and rospigliosi by 4/8/05 and setting Scheduling meeting report due for 5/13/05 ( Signed by Judge Adalberto Jordan on 3/4/05) [EOD Date: 3/8/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/7/2005
MOTION by Jose Guevara (Attorney ) to extend time complete service of process on vidal and rospigliosi (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of service by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER requiring counsel to meet and file joint scheduling report and proposed order ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/29/04) [EOD Date: 12/30/04] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [2-1] motion to extend time file Notice of Removal ( Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/29/04) [EOD Date: 12/30/04] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/29/2004
MOTION by Republic of Peru, Ministerio Del Inter to extend time file Notice of Removal (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from: 11th Jud. Circuit, Dade Co. FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 913031 ; Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley (No Answer or Motion to Dismiss) (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2004)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 131 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?