Doe et al v. The Pike School, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-11730
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 9:28 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edgar Pauk, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen L. Durso +1 617 728 9123 +1 617 426 7972 dursolaw@tiac.net
No Logo Robert Roe, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Andy Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather M. Gamache +1 617 482 0600 hgamache@apslaw.com
Space John F.X. Lawler +1 617 482 0600 +1 617 482 0604 jlawler@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowditch & Dewey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela E. Berman +1 617 757 6538 +1 617 757 3138 pberman@bowditch.com
No Logo Charles C. Alexander, Defendant
No Logo David H. Black, Defendant
No Logo David A. Frothingham, Defendant
No Logo Frederick B. Beams, Defendant
No Logo Groton School, Defendant
No Logo John Latta, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Choate, Defendant
No Logo Judith Elefante, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 2nd Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca G. Pontikes +1 617 357 1888 +1 617 357 1884 rpontikes@pontikeslawllc.com
No Logo Judith R. Klau, Defendant
No Logo Mary S. Drinker, Defendant
No Logo Michael G. Tronic, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Congleton, Defendant
No Logo Stephen D. Purington, Defendant
No Logo The Pike School, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren E. Parisi +1 617 526 6000 lauren.parisi@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melick, Porter & Shea, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison B. Cherundolo +1 617 523 6200 acherundolo@melicklaw.com
Space Michael John Mazurczak +1 617 502 9640 +1 617 502 9740 maz@melicklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Keefe +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 robert.keefe@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Walter Morris, Defendant
No Logo William M. Polk, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 448 - Civil Rights: Education
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Heather M. Gamache (Gamache, Heather) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 67 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff DOE has until May 12, 2014 to fully respond to The Pike School's interrogatories and requests for production. Having brought this lawsuit, plaintiff has the duty to timely fulfill all discovery obligations. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to do so will result in the dismissal of his claims for failure to prosecute. (RGS, int2) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION to Compel Plaintiff John Doe's Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents by The Pike School, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Pike School's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit B to Pike School's Motion to Compel)(Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 15 Grotons motion to dismiss John Does claims under Title IX and Mass. Gen. Laws ch. 93, § 102. (RGS, law4) Modified text on 2/10/2014 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None
          Supplemental Opposition re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Durso, Carmen) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Hearing re Groton's Motion to Dismiss Counts 11 and 12 held on 1/31/2014. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Durso, Lawler, Parisi, Pontikes, Mazurczak) (RGS, law4) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Pamela E. Berman terminated. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pamela E. Berman by Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Groton School, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic.(Gamache, Heather) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (RGS, law4) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting deadlines: Initial Disclosures due 2/3/14; Written Discovery due by 3/3/14; All Fact Discovery to be completed by 10/3/2014; Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures due by 10/31/14; Defendants' Expert Disclosures due by 11/28/14; Expert Discovery due 12/31/14; Dispositive Motions due on or before 1/30/2015 with Oppositions due within 21 days, leave of court required for Replies, if any. This session does not consider treating physicians as experts as their treating notes provide the best view of plaintiff's medical condition. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Status Conference held on 1/16/2014. Status of case discussed; deadlines set; order setting deadlines to issue.(Court Reporter: None)(Attorneys present: Durso; Mazurczak; Keefe; Pontikes; Gamache; Parisi) (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This case having been reassigned to this session upon the recusal of Judge O'Toole, the Order setting out the Pretrial Schedule issued on December 16, 2013 is VACATED. The court will hold a status conference on January 16, 2014. At the conference, the court will discuss a revised schedule and the substance of the claims. 55 , 53 , 54 Status Conference set for 1/16/2014 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER of Recusal entered. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 12/16/2013. Intial disclosures by 2/21/14. Depositions to begin by 4/1/14 and must conclude by 3/31/15. ( Fact Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2014). The court recuses itself from the case. (Court Reporter: Marcia Patrisso at 617-737-8728.)(Attorneys present: For Plaintiffs: Carmen Durso; For Defendants: Allison Cherundolo, Robert Keefe, Rebecca Pontikes, Heather Gamache) (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Heather M. Gamache on behalf of Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Groton School, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic (Gamache, Heather) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Cherundolo, Allison) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Parisi, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/8/2013, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Party. (Durso, Carmen) (Entered: 12/08/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/8/2013, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Counsel. (Durso, Carmen) (Entered: 12/08/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/8/2013, Entered: None
                                            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Durso, Carmen) (Entered: 12/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rebecca G. Pontikes (Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Judith Elefante.(Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Judith Elefante answer due 10/14/2013. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/14/2013 to File Answer to Complaint by Judith Elefante.(Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                        STATE COURT Record David A. Frothingham summons served on 6/18/2013, answer due 7/9/2013; Walter Morris summons served on 6/18/2013, answer due 7/9/2013; Stephen D. Purington summons served on 6/18/2013, answer due 7/9/2013; The Pike School, Inc. summons served on 6/18/2013, answer due 7/9/2013.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Groton School.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mary S. Drinker.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael G. Tronic.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles C. Alexander.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by William M. Polk.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andy Anderson.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by David H. Black.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Richard J. Congleton.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jonathan Choate.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Judith R. Klau.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Frederick B. Beams.(Lawler, John) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Opposition re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint filed by John Doe. (Durso, Carmen) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Judith Elefante answer due 9/30/2013. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/30/13 to File Answer to Complaint by Judith Elefante.(Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca G. Pontikes on behalf of Judith Elefante (Pontikes, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/15/2013 (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File An Opposition by Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Groton School, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic. (Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Reset Deadlines: Charles C. Alexander Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Andy Anderson Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Frederick B. Beams Answer Due by 8/15/2013; David H. Black Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Jonathan Choate Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Richard J. Congleton Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Mary S. Drinker Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Groton School Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Judith R. Klau Answer Due by 8/15/2013; William M. Polk Answer Due by 8/15/2013; Michael G. Tronic Answer Due by 8/15/2013. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION re 1 Notice of Removal, for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint by Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Groton School, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic. (Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Groton School. (Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela E. Berman on behalf of Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Appearance of Counsel)(Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John F.X. Lawler on behalf of Charles C. Alexander, Andy Anderson, Frederick B. Beams, David H. Black, Jonathan Choate, Richard J. Congleton, Mary S. Drinker, Judith R. Klau, William M. Polk, Michael G. Tronic (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Appearance of Counsel)(Lawler, John) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John F.X. Lawler on behalf of Groton School (Lawler, John) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint filed by Groton School. (Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts 11 and 12 of the Amended Complaint by Groton School.(Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela E. Berman on behalf of Groton School (Berman, Pamela) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer of Defendants The Pike School, Inc., David A. Frothingham, Walter Morris, Stephen D. Purington, And John Latta.) by David A. Frothingham, John Latta, Walter Morris, Stephen D. Purington, The Pike School, Inc..(Keefe, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Pike School, Inc.. (Keefe, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Parisi on behalf of David A. Frothingham, John Latta, Walter Morris, Stephen D. Purington, The Pike School, Inc. (Parisi, Lauren) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Keefe on behalf of David A. Frothingham, John Latta, Walter Morris, Stephen D. Purington, The Pike School, Inc. (Keefe, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      THE PIKE SCHOOL, DAVID A. FROTHINGHAM, WALTER MORRIS, AND STEPHEN D. PURINGTON'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Pike School, Inc..(Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Mazurczak on behalf of The Pike School, Inc. (Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B. Cherundolo on behalf of The Pike School, Inc. (Cherundolo, Allison) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Allison B. Cherundolo on behalf of The Pike School, Inc. (Cherundolo, Allison) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Pike School, Inc.. (Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Mazurczak on behalf of The Pike School, Inc. (Mazurczak, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Pike School, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4549932 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Complaint, # 2 Attachment 2 - Summons, # 3 Attachment 3 - Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Attachment 4 - CategoryForm4-4-11)(Mazurczak, Michael) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/18/2013) (Abaid, Kimberly). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/18/2013) (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 946 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?