City of Pontiac Retired Employ, et al v. Louis Schimmel, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 12-2087

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 4:54 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (BLC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Per Curiam ORDER filed : The district court's denial of injunctive relief is VACATED and the case is REMANDED to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the order of this court. Decision for publication. Alice M. Batchelder, Chief Judge; Danny J. Boggs, Karen Nelson Moore, R. Guy Cole, Jr., Eric L. Clay, Julia Smith Gibbons, John M. Rogers, Jeffrey S. Sutton, Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague (CONCURRING), Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, Helene N. White, Jane Branstetter Stranch, and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judges. (CL)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
      RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding an additional citation, [178]. Response from Attorney Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Intervenor Michigan Attorney General and Movant MI. Certificate of Service:04/08/2014. (ADL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
        ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 04/01/2014. (ASG)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          CAUSE REARGUED EN BANC on by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya, Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square and Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Intervenor Michigan Attorney General and Movant MI before En Banc Judges; Chief Judge Batchelder, Judges Boggs, Moore, Cole, Clay, Gibbons, Rogers, Sutton, Cook, McKeague, Griffin, Kethledge, White, Stranch and Donald. (KSC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:03/05/2014. (ASG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
              AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. John C. Philo for Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic & Social Justice in support of plaintiffs-appellants' arguments and for reversal. Copies: Electronic. Certificate of Service:12/16/2013. (BLH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Daniel S. Korobkin for ACLU of Michigan. Copies: Electronic. Certificate of Service:12/16/2013. (BLH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                  AMICUS BRIEF (with CD exhibit) filed by Mr. Richard A. Soble for Representatives Jeff Irwin, Doug Geiss, Andrew Kandrevas, Kate Segal and Woodrow Stanley in support of plaintiffs-appellants. Copies: Electronic. Certificate of Service:12/16/2013.--[Edited 02/20/2014 by BLH] (BLH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                    ORDER filed granting motion of the ACLU [131] filed by Mr. Daniel S. Korobkin, motion of Representatives Jeff Irwin, Doug Geiss, Andrew Kandrevas, Kate Segal, and Woodrow Stanley [146] filed by Mr. Richard A. Soble, and motion of Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic & Social Justice [148] filed by Mr. John C. Philo, for leave to file a brief as amicus/amici curiae. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed granting motion to split/share argument time with defendants-appellees [170] filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Michigan Attorney General and MI to split/share argument time. Certificate of Service: 02/12/2014. (ADL)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                          CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service:01/23/2014. Argument Request: requested. (SJH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                            CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:01/23/2014. Argument Request: requested. (ASG)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                              CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Michigan Attorney General and MI. Certificate of Service:01/23/2014. Argument Request: requested. (ADL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory Thomas Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2014. (GTG)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                  Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2014. (ASG)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE filed for Movant MI by Aaron D. Lindstrom. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2014. (ADL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square by John C. Clark. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2014. (JCC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                        Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Intervenor Michigan Attorney General. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2014. (ADL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. John C. Clark for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2014. (JCC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                            Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2014. (SJH)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                              En Banc oral argument date set for 1:30 p.m., Wednesday, March 19, 2014. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 12/31/2013. (LAG)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. John J. Bursch for Michigan Attorney General regarding Withdrawal. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2013. (JJB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                  TENDERED brief in support of plaintiffs/appellants' arguments and for reversal. Received from Attorney Mr. John C. Philo for Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic & Social Justice. (BLH)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Motion filed by Mr. John C. Philo for Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic & Social Justice for leave to file a briefd as amicus curiae. Certificate of service:12/16/2013. (BLH)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                      TENDERED brief in support of plaintiffs-appellants. Received from Attorney Mr. Richard A. Soble for Representative Jeff Irwin, Representative Doug Geiss, Representative Andrew Kandrevas, Representative Kate Segal and Representative Woodrow Stanley. (CD received, PA 4 (HB 4214) immediate effect motion. Ms. Soble to provide a copy to all parties). -[Edited 12/18/2013 by BLH] (BLH)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Motion filed by Mr. Richard A. Soble for Representative Jeff Irwin, Representative Doug Geiss, Representative Andrew Kandrevas, Representative Kate Segal and Representative Woodrow Stanley for leave to file a brief as amici curiae in support of appellant and urging remand. Certificate of service:12/16/2013. (BLH)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. John C. Philo for Maurice & Jane Sugar Law Center for Economic & Social Justice. (BLH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Richard A. Soble for Representative Jeff Irwin, Representative Doug Geiss, Representative Andrew Kandrevas, Representative Kate Segal and Representative Woodrow Stanley. (BLH)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Jay Steinberg for ACLU of Michigan. (BLH)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                TENDERED amicus brief. Received from Attorney Mr. Daniel S. Korobkin for ACLU of Michigan. (BLH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion filed by Mr. Daniel S. Korobkin for ACLU of Michigan for leave to file an amicus brief. Certificate of service:12/16/2013. (BLH)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel S. Korobkin for ACLU of Michigan. (BLH)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      [DEFECTIVE FILING; CORRECTION NEEDED] [Counsel is directed to refile using the docketing event entry "corrected brief". The corrected brief must include Page ID# references following each record entry reference & Page ID# references in the designation of relevant district court documents. The corrected brief is due no later than 01/24/14] --[Edited 01/22/2014 by BLC] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:12/09/2013. (ASG)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square by John L. Miller. Certificate of Service: 12/02/2013. (JLM)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellants supplemental brief due 12/09/2013; intervenor and appellees supplemental brief due 01/21/2014. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Should the appellants wish to file a reply brief, not to exceed twelve (12) pages, it is due by February 4, 2014. (BLH)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER filed granting petition for en banc rehearing [79] filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock, and petition for en banc rehearing [87] filed by Mr. John J. Bursch, to reinstate appeal. The previous decision and judgment of this court is vacated, the mandate is stayed and this case is restored to the docket as a pending appeal. Alice M. Batchelder, Chief Circuit Judge; Danny J. Boggs, Karen Nelson Moore, R. Guy Cole , Jr., Eric L. Clay, Julia Smith Gibbons, John M. Rogers, Jeffrey S. Sutton, Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague, Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, Helene N. White, Jane Branstetter Stranch, and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judges. (BLH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE to petition for en banc rehearing, [87], previously filed by filed by Mr. John J. Bursch in 12-2087 , petition for en banc rehearing, [79], previously filed by filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock in 12-2087. Response filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of service: 10/22/2013. (ASG)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                RULING granting in part the motion to extend time to file response to petitions for rehearing en banc [97] filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs. Response due 10/22/2013. (Mr. Gibbs was also notified by telephone). (BLH)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya to extend time to file response to petition for en banc rehearing. Certificate of Service: 10/04/2013. (ASG)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    LETTER SENT to Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya, notifying that he is directed to respond to the petitions for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock, and Mr. John J. Bursch. Response due 10/08/2013. (BLH)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. John J. Bursch for Michigan Attorney General. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2013. (JJB)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed for Intervenor Michigan Attorney General by John J. Bursch. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2013. (JJB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed for Intervenor Michigan Attorney General by Aaron D. Lindstrom. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2013. (ADL)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service: 09/05/2013. (SJH)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              RULING granting motion to extend time to 09/06/2013 (14 days) to file a petition for rehearing en banc [69] filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock. (BLH)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER filed granting motion from Michigan Attorney General Bill Schuette for an extension of time to 09/06/2013 to file a petition for rehearing en banc as an intervenor [73] filed by Ms. Heather S. Meingast. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Intervenor MOTION filed by Ms. Heather S. Meingast for Michigan Attorney General Bill Schuette to extend time to 09/06/2013 (14 days) to file a petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2013. (BLH)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc until. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2013. (SJH)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TENDERED motion to enlarge time to file petition for rehearing en banc. Received from Attorney Ms. Heather S. Meingast for Movant MI. (BLH)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        OPINION and JUDGMENT filed: VACATED and REMANDED, decision for publication. R. Guy Cole , Jr., Richard Allen Griffin (DISSENT), Circuit Judges and James S. Gwin (AUTHORING), U.S. District Judge for the N. D. of OH. (DA)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 04/03/2013. (ASG)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to INTERVENE filed by Heather S. Meingast for Attorney General Bill Schuette. Certificate of Service: 02/05/2013. (HSM)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed for Movant MI by Heather S. Meingast. Certificate of Service: 02/05/2013. (HSM)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding an additional citation, [38]. Response from Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service:01/24/2013. (SJH)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2013. (ASG)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    LETTER SENT to counsel. The panel requests counsel for both sides to be prepared to discuss at oral argument; 1) the effect of the November 2012 referendum on "Public Act 4", etc., and, 2) what effect does the 2012 referendum have on the collective bargaining agreements, etc.. (BLC)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Delmer Anderson, City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, John Claya, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley and Debra Woods by Gregory T. Gibbs. Certificate of Service: 01/09/2013. (GTG)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 01/07/2013. (ASG)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service: 11/22/2012. (ASG)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:11/19/2012. (ASG)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2012. (SJH)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Oral argument date set for 9:00 a.m. Tuesday, January 15, 2013. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 11/09/2012. (DTS)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square. Certificate of Service:11/01/2012. Argument Request: requested. (SJH)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:10/05/2012. Argument Request: requested. (ASG)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Hitchcock for Appellees Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square Certificate of Service: 09/19/2012. [2 separate forms attached] --[Edited 09/20/2012 by BLC] (SJH)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed for Appellees City of Pontiac, Louis Schimmel and Cathy Square by Stephen J. Hitchcock. Certificate of Service: 09/18/2012. (SJH)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya Certificate of Service: 09/13/2012. (ASG)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Alec Scott Gibbs for Appellants City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, Delmer Anderson, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley, Debra Woods and John Claya. Certificate of Service:09/13/2012. (ASG)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Delmer Anderson, City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, John Claya, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley and Debra Woods by ALEC SCOTT GIBBS. Certificate of Service: 09/13/2012. (ASG)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/05/2012;. appellee brief due 11/07/2012. (BLC)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Delmer Anderson, City of Pontiac Retired Employees Association, John Claya, Thomas Hunter, Henry C. Shoemaker, Yvette Talley and Debra Woods. Transcript needed: n. (BLC)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?