Holloway v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-02120-MCE-CKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 12:14 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Robyn Holloway, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Bilheimer +1 530 265 6357 +1 530 478 9485 jbilheimer@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by The Boccardo Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2014 Victor F. Stefan +1 408 298 5678 +1 408 298 7503 tstefan@boccardo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilcoxen Callaham Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Wilcoxen +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 dwilcoxen@wilcoxenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilcoxen Callahan Montgomery & Deacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Cooper Callaham +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 wcallaham@wilcoxenlaw.com
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W. Plummer +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 bplummer@wilcoxenlaw.com
No Logo Sterling Holloway, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Bilheimer +1 530 265 6357 +1 530 478 9485 jbilheimer@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Boccardo Law Firm,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2014 Victor F. Stefan +1 408 298 5678 +1 408 298 7503 tstefan@boccardo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilcoxen Callaham Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W. Plummer +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 bplummer@wilcoxenlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Wilcoxen +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 dwilcoxen@wilcoxenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilcoxen Callahan Montgomery & Deacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Cooper Callaham +1 916 442 2777 +1 916 442 4118 wcallaham@wilcoxenlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chi Soo Kim, GOVT +1 916 554 2736 +1 916 554 2900 chi.soo.kim@usdoj.gov
No Logo Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc., Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by gallagherlawus.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin F. Gallagher, PHV +1 651 222 4466 +1 651 494 0143 ben@gallagherlawus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cole Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Nelson Cole +1 916 376 0486 +1 916 376 0478 scole@colenetlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit P.I.: Other
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/17. (Kaminski, H)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/12/16 ORDERING the Joint Pretrial Statement due by 6/9/16; Evidentiary or Procedural Motions due by 6/9/16; Oppositions to Evidentiary or Procedural Motions due by 6/16/16; Trial Brief due by 6/16/16; Replies for Evidentiary or Procedural Motions due by 6/23/16; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/16; Trial (bench trial, 15 days) No Change 8/8/16. (Becknal, R)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
      AMENDED NOTICE OF LIEN by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc.: re 58 Notice. (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 3/16/2016 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
        USCA MEMORANDUM as to 46 Notice of Appeal (14-16079) AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/10/15 ORDERING that Joint Pretrial Statement is due 5/26/16. Evidentiary or Procedural Motions due by 5/26/2016. Opposition due by 6/2/2016. Replies due by 6/9/2016. Joint Status Report Re: Trial date due by 6/7/16. The Final Pretrial Conference date is CONTINUED from 1/14/16 to 6/16/2016. Trial Brief due by 6/2/16. Trial date is CONTINUED from 2/29/16 to 8/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
            DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Brian W. Plummer for Robyn Holloway,Brian W. Plummer for Sterling Holloway (Callaham, William) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
              STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the trial date by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 11/3/2015 (Michel, G.). (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/20/2015 ORDERING 88 Joint Pretrial Statement deadline Reset to 12/4/2015; Evidentiary or Procedural Motions Reset to 12/4/2015; Oppositions due by 12/11/2015 and Replies due by 12/18/2015. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Modify Pretrial Briefing Schedule by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015; GRANTING 62 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant's decision not to de-energize the substation; DENYING 62 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant's decision to move rebar under the electrified lines; DENYING AS MOOT 81 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Construction Expert declaration; DENYING the motion as premature with regard to the trial testimony. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Defendant's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 81) scheduled for hearing on February 19, 2015, is submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                        REPLY by United States of America re 81 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Construction Expert Jeffrey Hughes. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                          OPPOSITION by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway to 81 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Construction Expert Jeffrey Hughes. (Callaham, William) Modified on 2/10/2015 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy A. Shaddox-Waldrop for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/29/2015: On the Court's own motion the 5/11/2015 bench trial is vacated and continued to 2/29/2016 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 2/16/2016. Counsel is directed to Local Rule 285 regarding the content of trial briefs. Accordingly, the 3/26/2015 Final Pretrial Conference is vacated and continued to 1/14/2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 12/24/2015 and shall comply with the procedures outlined in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order. The personal appearances of the trial attorneys or person(s) in pro se is mandatory for the Final Pretrial Conference. Telephonic appearances for this hearing are not permitted. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 12/24/2015. Oppositions must be filed by 12/31/2015 and any reply must be filed by 1/7/2016. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. All other due dates set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order are confirmed. (Shaddox-Waldrop, A) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 62) scheduled for hearing on January 22, 2015, is submitted without oral argument and the hearing is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Construction Expert Jeffrey Hughes by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities)(Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 2/10/2015 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  REPLY by United States of America re 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory S. Capra, # 2 Declaration of Rexford Belleville, # 3 Declaration of Robert Watts)(Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Errata: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Callaham, William) Modified on 1/8/2015 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/22/2014 ORDERING that the 73 opposition filed by Plaintiffs on 12/19/2015 is timely. Because the Court finds that the opposition was timely, Plaintiffs will be entitled to be heard at the hearing, pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment, currently scheduled for 1/8/2015, is VACATED and CONTINUED to 1/22/2015. Under Local Rule 230(d), Defendant will have not less than seven (7) days to file a reply to the opposition. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                        REQUEST for Opportunity to Respond to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Daniel E. Wilcoxen in OPPOSITION TO 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Jeffrey S. Hughes in OPPOSITION TO 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                              STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition to Defendant United States of America's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway re 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                OPPOSITION by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway to 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re Granting Ex Parte Application by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. (Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION of ALEXA R. GREENBAUM re 70 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway for an Order Continuing the Hearing Date Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 and 56(e) and/or F.R.C.P. 1. (Callaham, William) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                          DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY by United States of America re 62 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Lodging Exhibit 2 (Videos) - Defendant's Supplementation of Its Expert Reports by United States of America re 65 Designation/Disclosure of Expert Witness,. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Supplemental Report - Dr. Joseph Capell, # 2 Exhibit 2- Videos and Chronology/ Photographs, # 3 Exhibit 3- Supplemental Report - Dr. Eugene Carragee, # 4 Exhibit Supplemental Report - Dr. Richard Cuneo, # 5 Exhibit Supplemental Report - Maria Toyofuku-Brady, M.S., # 6 Proof of Service)(Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by United States of America: Deposition Transcripts. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by United States of America in re 62 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of Gregory S. Capra, # 4 Declaration of Rexford Belleville, # 5 Declaration of Lyn D. Phillips, # 6 Declaration of Robert Watts, # 7 Declaration of Chi Soo Kim)(Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dr. Capell's Supplemental Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Dr. Carragee's Supplemental Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Mark Cohen's Supplemental Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Dr. Cuneo's Supplemental Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Maria Toyofuku-Brady's Supplemental Report) (Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 10/31/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dr Asarnow's Report re Robyn Holloway, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Dr Asarnow's Report re Sterling Holloway, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Dr Carragee's Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Dr Cuneo's Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Stig Nilsson's Report - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Stig Nilsson's Report - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Michael Poles' Report)(Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Robyn Holloway. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Hughes Documents, # 2 Exhibit 2-Mahla Documents, # 3 Exhibit 3-Dunlevy Documents, # 4 Exhibit 4-Hyland Documents, # 5 Exhibit 5-Bergen Documents, # 6 Exhibit 6-Butler Documents, # 7 Exhibit 7-Lievense Documents)(Wilcoxen, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Lien by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc.. (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 10/3/2014 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                LETTER from attorney Daniel E. Wilcoxen addressed to AUSA Chi Soo Kim attempting to meet & confer over issues with 53 Proposed Order for Independent Medical Examinations. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  LETTER from AUSA Chi Soo Kim in response to attorney Alexa Greenbaum's Letter dated 9/11/2014. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/15/2014 ORDERING Plaintiff Robyn Holloway to submit to an independent orthopedic medical examination performed by Dr. Eugene Carragee on 9/16/2014 at 10:00 AM at the Stanford Medicine Outpatient Center -- Spine Center, 450 Broadway Street, Pavilion A, 1st Floor, Redwood City, CA 94063; ORDERING Plaintiff Robyn Holloway to submit to an independent neurological medical examination performed by Dr. Richard Cuneo on 9/16/2014 at 01:00 PM at the University of California San Francisco, 400 Parnassus Avenue, 8th Floor, Suite A842, San Francisco, CA 94143; ORDERING that Plaintiff Robyn Holloway not be accompanied by any individual at either examination; ORDERING that neither examination be audiotaped, videotaped, nor recorded. (Michel, G) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/15/2014 ORDERING that the medical examinations set for 9/16/2014 proceed as previously scheduled; ORDERING that the plaintiff not be accompanied at the examination by any individual; ORDERING that the examination not be videotaped; ORDERING that the ordinary and customary testing associated with a physical exam for the respective specialties (orthopedic and neurological) be conducted by the examining physicians; ORDERING that the record reflect that the plaintiff's counsel does not stipulate that said medical examinations are independent; ORDERING that copies of the report prepared by each examining physician be provided to the plaintiff's counsel upon receipt by the defendant. (Michel, G) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER re Independent Medical Examinations by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney William Cooper Callaham for Robyn Holloway,William Cooper Callaham for Sterling Holloway. (Bilheimer, John) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/2014 ORDERING 50 Discovery due by 9/30/2014; Initial Expert Disclosures 10/14/2014, Supplemental Expert Disclosures 10/30/2014; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/13/2014, dispositive motion hearing 1/8/2015; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement 3/5/2015; Evidentiary or Procedural Motions filed by 3/5/2015; Trial Briefs by 3/12/2015; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Trial set for 5/11/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Reader, L) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                USCA CASE NUMBER 14-16079 for 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc.. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. Notice of Appeal filed *5/29/2014*, Complaint filed *8/14/2012* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *4/29/2014*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 5/29/2014 in the amount of $505.00*. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information) (Michel, G) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 42 Memorandum and Order by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 5/30/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 42 Memorandum and Order by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. (Filing fee $505.00, receipt number 0972-5348860) (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 5/30/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/14. Attorney John Bilheimer substitues Victor T. Stefan, III for Plaintiffs Robyn & Sterling Holloway.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/14. Added Attorney John Bilheimer for Plaintiffs Robyn and Sterling Holloway; The Boccardo Law Firm/John C. Stein, Esq. TERMINATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The court received the Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (ECF No. 41). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/28/14 ORDERING for the reasons just stated, Security National's Motion to Intervene, ECF Nos. 27 - 28 is DENIED. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. (Bilheimer, John) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: During the entire week of June 9, 2014, the Eastern District of California, Fresno and Sacramento Divisions, is hosting Settlement Week, during which volunteer mediators will conduct mediation sessions at no charge to the parties. Your case has been identified as one potentially appropriate for referral to Settlement Week. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties meet and confer to determine whether they believe participation in mediation would be beneficial. If all parties believe that participation in mediation would be beneficial, they shall, within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, so inform the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Division, in writing, at the address or email address below: ADR Division, Attention: Sujean Park, U.S. District Court, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, CA 95814, email: spark@caed.uscourts.gov.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/11/14 ORDERING the Parties' stipulation and Request to modify the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order 38 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Discovery cuttoff is CONTINUED from 5/23/14 to 7/17/2014. Initial Expert Disclosures cuttoff is CONTINUED from 7/23/14 to 8/13/2014. Supplemental Expert Disclosures CONTINUED from 8/12/14 to 9/2/14. Last day to file Dispositive Motions 9/18/2014.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The court received the Substitution of Attorney adn Proposed Order (ECF No. 36). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. (Bilheimer, John) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motions to Intervene (ECF Nos. 27 and 28) scheduled for hearing on 3/20/2014 are submitted without oral argument. The hearing date of 3/20/2014 is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date.(Deutsch, S) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/11/14. Added attorney Benjamin F. Gallagher, PHV for Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. (Meuleman, A) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. to RESPONSE to 28 Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Reply, # 2 Exhibit B to Reply)(Cole, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2014 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  (DISREGARD - REPLY REFILED IN ITS ENTIRETY AS 34 ) REPLY by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. to RESPONSE to 28 Motion to Intervene. (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2014 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc.. (Cole, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by United States of America to 27 MOTION to INTERVENE Pursuant to FRCP 24, 28 Motion to Intervene. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION to 28 Motion to Intervene by Plaintiffs Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. (Bilheimer, John) Modified on 1/28/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO INTERVENE by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 3/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit) (Cole, Stephen) Modified on 1/27/2014 (Michel, G). (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to INTERVENE Pursuant to FRCP 24 by Security National Insurance Company, as subrogee of All Power, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration Benjamin F. Gallagher, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention)(Cole, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/3/2014 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 5/23/2014; ORDERING that all counsel designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all parties, by 7/23/2014, each expert that they propose to tender at trial; ORDERING that any party designate a supplemental list of expert witnesses twenty (20) days after the designation of expert witnesses; ORDERING that all dispositive motions be heard by 11/13/2014; ORDERING that any dispositive motion be filed eight (8) weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that the opposition and any cross-motion be filed five (5) weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that any reply and the opposition to any cross-motion be filed three (3) weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that any reply to the cross-motion be filed one (1) week prior to the hearing; SETTING a Final Pretrial Conference for 2/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement be filed by 1/15/2015; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed by 1/22/2015; ORDERING that any evidentiary or procedural motions be filed by 1/15/2015; ORDERING that the opposition be filed by 1/22/2015; ORDERING that any reply be filed by 1/29/2015; SETTING a Jury Trial for 3/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England; Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed within seven (7) court days. (Michel, G) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER 24 for independent medical examinations signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/31/2013. Plaintiff Sterling Holloway will submit to psychological independent medical examination on 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at University of California Los Angeles / 48-240 Semel Institute at 760 Westwood Boulevard in Los Angeles, California by Dr. Robert Asarnow, Ph.D.. Plaintiff Sterling Holloway may not be accompanied by any individual. The examination will not be audiotaped, videotaped, or recorded. Parties further stipulate that plaintiff Robyn Holloway will submit to psychological independent medical examination on 1/7/2014 at 10:00 AM at University of California Los Angeles / 48-240 Semel Institute at 760 Westwood Boulevard in Los Angeles, California by Dr. Robert Asarnow, Ph.D.. Plaintiff Robyn Holloway may not be accompanied by any individual. The examination will not be audiotaped, videotaped, or recorded. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Independent Medical Examinations by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/15/13 ORDERING: Discovery cutoff (fact): due by February 21, 2014; Initial expert disclosures: due by March 21, 2014; Supplemental expert disclosures due by April 10, 2014; Last day to file dispositive motions due by May 1, 2014; Last day for dispositive motion hearing is June 26, 2014; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement: due by August 7, 2014; Last day to file evidentiary or procedural motions due by August 7, 2014; Last day to file trial briefs due by August 14, 2014; Final Pretrial Conference set for August 28, 2014; Trial (5 days, bench) set for October 14, 2014. A new Pretrial Scheduling Order will issue in due course. (Becknal, R) Modified docket text on 12/31/2013 (Waggoner, D). (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/5/13 ORDERING that All Discovery shall be completed by 12/20/2013. Disclosure Expert Witnesses due by 1/24/2014. The last day to hear Dispositive Motions shall be 5/15/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 7/10/2014 at 02:00 PM. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 6/26/14. Any Evidentiary or procedural Motions are to be filed by 6/19/2014. Oppositions must be filed by 6/26/14 and any reply must be filed by 7/3/14. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. Jury Trial is SET for 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/5/13 ORDERING that the Action denominated as 2:13-cv-01594 KJM DAD is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in the REASSIGNED case only are VACATED. The Clerk is to issue an order requiring Joint Status Report. The Caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:13-cv-1594 MCE CKD. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustment in the reassignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:13-CV-01594 KJM-DAD by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 10/24/2013 (Becknal, R). (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/13. (Kaminski, H)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/13. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Independent Medical Examinations by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re subpoena issued to Blake Wolfswinkel. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER 14 to modify 10 Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/24/2013. An Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (PTSO) will follow which will incorporate date listed in text and govern deadlines of case. (Marciel, M)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER 14 to modify 10 Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/24/2013. An Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (PTSO) will follow which will incorporate date listed in text and govern deadlines of case. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER modifying the 10 Pretrial Scheduling Order by United States of America. (Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 8/22/2013 (Michel, G). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Blake Wolfswinkel served on 7/29/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2013 PERMITTING Defendant United States to disclose names, social security numbers, dates of birth, addresses, and/or telephone numbers to Plaintiffs in discovery and court filings; ORDERING that all court filings redact social security numbers, dates of birth, and home addresses as provided in L.R. 140(a). (Michel, G) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to permit disclosure by Defendant United States. (Kim, Chi Soo) Modified on 7/31/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/14/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/20/2013. Discovery due by 10/25/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/17/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the recalled appointment of Magistrate Judge * Gregory G. Hollows* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Kim, Chi) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States of America. Attorney Kim, Chi Soo added.(Kim, Chi) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. United States of America served on 8/17/2012, answer due 10/16/2012. (Bilheimer, John) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP Form) (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John G. Bilheimer* *Haley & Bilheimer* *505 Coyote Street, Suite A* *Nevada City, CA 95959*. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway (Bilheimer, John) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2013 PERMITTING Defendant United States to disclose names, social security numbers, dates of birth, addresses, and/or telephone numbers to Plaintiffs in discovery and court filings; ORDERING that all court filings redact social security numbers, dates of birth, and home addresses as provided in L.R. 140(a). (Michel, G)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for personal injuries; demand for jury trial against United States by Robyn Holloway, Sterling Holloway. Attorney Bilheimer, John G. added.(Bilheimer, John) Modified on 8/14/2012 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?