Fitzgerald Scott v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5206

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 8:57 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207567597 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1478270] granting appellant's third unopposed motion to postpone briefing to accommodate mediation [1477878-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 03/26/2014. APPENDIX due 03/26/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/25/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/09/2014 [13-5206]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566959 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
    UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1477878] by Fitzgerald Scott to suspend briefing schedule [Service Date: 01/31/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556668 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1471826] considering motion to postpone briefing schedule [1471578-3], setting revised briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/24/2014. Appendix due 02/24/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/26/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/09/2014 [13-5206]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556245 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
        MODIFIED EVENT--UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1471578] by Fitzgerald Scott to suspend briefing schedule [Service Date: 12/19/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5206]--[Edited 12/20/2013 by LMF] (Light, Jeffrey)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207541024 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
          CLERK'S ORDER filed [1463236] granting motion to postpone the briefing schedule to accommodate mediation [1462712-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 12/24/2013. Appendix due 12/24/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/23/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 02/06/2014 [13-5206]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207540132 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1462712] by Fitzgerald Scott to suspend briefing schedule [Service Date: 10/23/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207528765 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1456168] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 10/25/2013. Appendix due 10/25/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 11/25/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/09/2013 [13-5206]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519593 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1450941] to certificate [1450940-2], notice [1450933-2] filed by USA. [13-5206] (Tenny, Daniel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519590 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1450940] by USA [Service Date: 08/09/2013 ] [13-5206] (Tenny, Daniel)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519578 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1450933] by Daniel Tenny and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee USA. [13-5206] (Tenny, Daniel)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519459 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1450851] to record [1450850-2], report status of transcript (final) [1450849-2], statement [1450848-2], statement [1450847-2], notice [1450846-2], statement [1450845-2], certificate [1450844-2] filed by Fitzgerald Scott. [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519455 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1450850] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ] [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519452 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                          TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1450849] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519449 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                            STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1450848] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ] [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519446 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1450847] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519443 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1450846] by Jeffrey L. Light on behalf of Appellant Fitzgerald Scott. [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519440 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1450845] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ] [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207519437 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1450844] by Fitzgerald Scott [Service Date: 08/08/2013 ] [13-5206] (Light, Jeffrey)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207511230 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                      CLERK'S ORDER filed [1445969] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/09/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/26/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/09/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/09/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/09/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/26/2013 [13-5206]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207511199 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1445954] by Fitzgerald Scott seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-01696-ABJ. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-5206]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?