Uniloc USA, Inc. v. Distinctive Developments Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00462
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 11:55 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W. Hartsell +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 shartsell@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 806 3818 +1 817 377 3485 coneill@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Distinctive Developments Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Full Fat Productions Ltd., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klemchuk Kubasta LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Casey L Griffith +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 764 6673 casey.griffith@kk-llp.com
No Logo Gameloft S.e., Consol Defendant
No Logo Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd, Consol Defendant
No Logo Laminar Research, LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Mojang Ab, Consol Defendant
No Logo Square Enix, Inc., Consol Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Settlement Papers and Motion to Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Settlement Papers & Motion to Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Settlement Papers & Motion to Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Settlement Papers & Motion to Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None terminate deadlines and hearings
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 83 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Terrance Christopher Newby is removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff in the above captioned case and removed from the electronic service list, and Jonathan D. Jay of the law firm of Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC is substituted as lead counsel. Attorney Terrance Christopher Newby terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/05/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Jay, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims by Uniloc and Electronic Arts Inc against one another are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Uniloc and EA shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/11/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Jack Wesley Hill, T. John Ward, Jr., and Claire Abernathy Henry terminated as attorneys for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/4/15. (mjc, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER that the clerk REOPEN the lead case and the member cases 6:12-cv-463, 6:12cv466, 6:12cv467, 6:12cv468, 6:12cv470, 6:12cv472. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/02/15. (mll, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Mangrum, Brett)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION To Lift Stay and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Newby, Terrance)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION To Lift Stay filed by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Electronic Arts Inc., Full Fat Productions Ltd., Gameloft S.E., Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Laminar Research, LLC, Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 68 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Electronic Arts Inc., Full Fat Productions Ltd., Gameloft S.E., Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Laminar Research, LLC, Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION To Lift Stay and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newby, Terrance)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay for Leave to Amend filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Newby, Terrance)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                      MOTION To Lift Stay by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Electronic Arts Inc., Gameloft S.E., Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Laminar Research, LLC, Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Distinctive ICs, # 2 Exhibit 2 EA ICs, # 3 Exhibit 3 Gameloft ICs, # 4 Exhibit 4 Halfbrick ICs, # 5 Exhibit 5 Laminar ICs, # 6 Exhibit 6 Mojang ICs, # 7 Exhibit 7 SEA ICs, # 8 Exhibit 8 IPR Final Written decision)(Redmond, Megan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2015: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 68 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Electronic Arts Inc., Gameloft S.E., Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Laminar Research, LLC, Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Distinctive ICs, # 2 Exhibit 2 EA ICs, # 3 Exhibit 3 Gameloft ICs, # 4 Exhibit 4 Halfbrick ICs, # 5 Exhibit 5 Laminar ICs, # 6 Exhibit 6 Mojang ICs, # 7 Exhibit 7 SEA ICs, # 8 Exhibit 8 IPR Final Written decision, # 9 Exhibit 9 Emails)(Redmond, Megan)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 68 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay .. (Newby, Terrance) Modified on 2/13/2015 (sm, ).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document (Affadavit) : 68 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.)(Newby, Terrance)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Newby, Terrance) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan David Jay on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jay, Jonathan)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Todd)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott A. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Scott)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mylene A. Landry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Landry, Mylene)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Steven Wayne Hartsell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Terrance C Newby on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4891917. (Newby, Terrance)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby STAYED pending further motion of any party demonstrating good cause to lift the stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case, and this action is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. All pending motions are denied as moot without prejudice to re-filing once the stay is lifted. Any party may request the Court lift the stay for good cause, and the Court will do so only upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 19 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 56 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Electronic Arts Inc., Gameloft S.E., Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Laminar Research, LLC, Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc. Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Bader, Caroline) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadline for Mediation. The deadline for mediation is extended to 8-08-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadline for Mediation by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Mojang AB, Square Enix, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/13. cc:attys 3-12-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order for Consolidated Action by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Full Fat Productions Ltd are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the parties' confidential License and Settlement Agreement. Each party shall bear their own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/13. cc:attys 3-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Full Fat Productions Ltd. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 44 Motion for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/13. cc:attys 3-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order for Consolidated Action by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv462 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. A uniform Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order shall govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and, if necessary, file objections to the previously agreed to Docket Control and Discovery Orders filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Distinctive Developments Ltd. (PR 3-4(a)) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Distinctive Developments Ltd. (PR 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Distinctive Developments Ltd. (PR 3-3 and 3-4) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Distinctive Developments Ltd. (PR 3-1 and 3-2) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Markman Hearing is set for 1-30-2014 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/12. cc:attys 12-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2014. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 7/26/2013. Markman Hearing set for 1/20/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER entered. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Distinctive Developments Ltd. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. The Deadline to Submit Discovery Order and Docket Control Order is extended to 12-05-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File DISCOVERY AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDERS by Distinctive Developments Ltd., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 21 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Distinctive Developments Ltd. on 9/24/2012, by personal service through the Hague Convention. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/12. cc:attys 10-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Distinctive Developments Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent None for Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Disclosure by Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (Redmond, Megan) Modified on 10/15/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Distinctive Developments Ltd..(Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline A Bader for Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric A Buresh for Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan J Redmond for Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft shall have to 10-15-2012 to answer or otherwise repond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/12. cc:attys 8-22-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Distinctive Developments Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Distinctive Developments Ltd., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Distinctive Developments Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3690030.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,857,067)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?