USA v. Bonventre

Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-mj-00385
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 12:30 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Daniel Bonventre, Defendant

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2010 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Retained Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to The Honorable James C. Francis IV from Andrew J. Frisch dated 3/3/10 re: Requesting an additional day until March 4, 2010, within which to satisfy the requirements of Mr. Bonventre's bond. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/4/10)(aba) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Daniel Bonventre. Mr. Frisch is Respectfully requesting that Two (2 of the Five (5) Co-Signers that Co-Signed Mr. Bonventre's Bond Be Removed as Surities, that Two (2) Co-Signers are Joel and Joan Bonamo, they agreed to Post their Home in Support of the Bond and Signed the Bond in Anticipation of doing so. I Have Proffered Substitute Surities to the government in support of the Bond, Application Granted, So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/2/2010)(dif) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Daniel Bonventre. (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
PRB Bond Entered as to Daniel Bonventre in amount of $ 5 Million PRB to be cosigned by 5 FRP's, secured by 2 million cash/property: assets, Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ, Surrender travel documents & no new applications, Regular pretrial supervision, Defendant to be released upon 3 cosigners, Remaining conditions to be met by 3/3/10, Rifle to be surrendered. (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew James Frisch appearing for Daniel Bonventre. (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT as to Daniel Bonventre (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz) (aba) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 71 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?