Williams v. Donald, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Middle District Court, Case No. 5:01-cv-00292
District Judge Hugh Lawson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 6:13 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Danny Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by C. Andrew Head

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/21/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Andrew Head +1 404 817 8572 ahead@cchlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ann B. Oakley +1 404 817 8500 maryann.oakley@hklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan W. Housen +1 404 817 8448 susan.housen@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli Smith Lott +1 404 817 8500 kelli.lott@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Brooke Savage +1 404 817 8500 +1 404 881 0470 brooke.savage@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo Brown, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE CHATMAN, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Jones, Defendant
No Logo Emory Grier, Defendant
No Logo Gary Hall, Defendant
No Logo Glover, Defendant
No Logo James Doctor, Defendant
No Logo JAMES E DONALD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sell & Melton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Beth Hand +1 478 464 5345 +1 478 464 5304 mbhand@sell-melton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin T Brown +1 478 714 5364 kbrown@seyfarth.com
No Logo James Wetherington, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Franke, Defendant
No Logo Leroy Butts, Defendant
No Logo Mary Harris, Defendant
No Logo VICTOR L WALKER, Defendant
No Logo Prison Legal News, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Emory University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Shalf +1 404 712 4652 +1 404 727 6820 sarah.shalf@emory.edu
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned: Consisting of one folder of original exhibits and four volumes of original records (cma) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
    USCA Order Judgment Vacated; Remanded with Instructions re 100 Notice of Appeal filed by Danny Williams (cma) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER dismissing case as moot. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 4/15/2009. (nbp) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James E. Donald, Victor Walker filed by Mary Beth Hand. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Danny Williams filed by Kelli Smith Lott. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lott, Kelli) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
            Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 113 Notice of Filing filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker ). Document filed incorrectly. (cma) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by James E. Donald, Victor Walker (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                NOTICE Report to the Court by James E. Donald, Victor Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Affidavit of Harris Hodges))(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristina M. Correia on behalf of James E. Donald, Victor Walker (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                    USCA Limited Remand Order as to 100 Notice of Appeal filed by Danny Williams (cma) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                      Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 100 Notice of Appeal, 96 Notice of Appeal (wcd) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                        Certificate of Readiness of Record on Appeal forwarded to USCA re 100 Notice of Appeal, 96 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Docket Sheet)(wcd) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Order Directing the Clerk of Court to Supplement the Record Sent to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals by James E. Donald, Victor Walker filed by Mary Beth Hand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Docket Report)(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE Regarding Georgia Department of Corrections' Publication Policy by James E. Donald, Victor Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                              TAXATION OF COSTS in the amount of $1,105.55 against Plaintiff. (cma) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                USCA Case Number 08-10107-B re 100 Notice of Appeal filed by Danny Williams. (cma) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                  TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Danny Williams re 100 Notice of Appeal. NO TRANSCRIPTS ORDERED. (cma) Modified on 1/17/2008 Certified copy and certified copy of docket sheet mailed to USCA(cma). (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                    USCA Case Number 08-10107 B re 96 Notice of Appeal filed by Danny Williams. (cma) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                      Letter of Transmittal re 100 Notice of Appeal. Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Report and Recommendatoin, Order and Judgment mailed to USCA. NOTICE: A Civil Appeal Statement must be filed with the Court of Appeals. A copy of this form may be obtained from the District Clerk's Office or the district court internet site (www.gamd.uscourts.gov). (cma) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 94 Judgment, 93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Report and Recommendations by Danny Williams. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt No.: 508554. Transcript Information Form due by 1/25/2008. (Lott, Kelli) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                          WITHDRAWAL of Motion (Lott, Kelli) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                            BILL OF COSTS by James E. Donald, Victor WalkerResponse to Bill of Costs due by 1/28/2008. (Brown, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                              Letter of Transmittal re 96 Notice of Appeal. Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Order, Recoomendation and Judgment mailed to USCA. NOTICE: A Civil Appeal Statement must be filed with the Court of Appeals. A copy of this form may be obtained from the District Clerk's Office or the district court internet site (www.gamd.uscourts.gov). (cma) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 94 Judgment, 93 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations by Danny Williams. Transcript Information Form due by 1/22/2008. (cma) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal Filed by Danny Williams(cma) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                    JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants. Deposition Disposal Letter due by 2/13/2008. (cma) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment; rejecting 81 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/04/2007. (nbp) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Housen on behalf of Danny Williams (Housen, Susan) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelli Smith Lott on behalf of Danny Williams (Lott, Kelli) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Danny Williams filed by Mary Ann Oakley. (Oakley, Mary) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 85 Request for Oral Argument, by Danny Williams. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 86 Request for Oral Argument filed by Danny Williams ). (cma, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    REQUEST for Oral Argument filed by Danny Williams re 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Victor Walker,, James E. Donald,, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Danny Williams, (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      REQUEST for Oral Argument filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Victor Walker,, James E. Donald,, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Danny Williams,, 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Danny Williams in re: 83 Report and Recommendations (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          OBJECTION to 81 Report and Recommendations filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker Response to Objections to Report and Recomendation due by 10/20/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B)(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 9/20/06. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              RECOMMENDATION to deny 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants James E. Donald and Victor Walker, and to grant 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Danny Williams. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2006. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 9/15/06. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY to Response filed by Danny Williams re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Austin Cherry)# 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Austin Cherry)(Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 78 Response to Motion filed by Victor Walker and James E. Donald, ) is actually a Memorandum in Support of Motion (cma, ) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) Modified on 2/1/2006 to reflect that this is a memorandum in support. Attorney did not correct the filing (cma, ). (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Statement of Disputed Material Facts filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          Statement of Disputed Material Facts filed by Danny Williams re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Danny Williams re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff Danny Williams (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Defendant Donald's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories by James E. Donald (cma, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Defendant Donald's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by James E. Donald (cma, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Defendant Walker's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Victor Walker (cma, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2005 (cma, ). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Defendant Donald's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by James E. Donald (cma, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Defendant Walker's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by Victor Walker (cma, ) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DEPOSITION of Warden Victor Walker taken on May 12, 2005. Court Reporter: Kathryn Keel filed by Danny Williams.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DEPOSITION of Barbara Ann Glover taken on May 12, 2005. Court Reporter: Kathryn Keel filed by Danny Williams.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DEPOSITION of James Edward Donald taken on May 19, 2005. Court Reporter: Linda C. Ruggeri filed by Danny Williams.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION of Linda Marie Brown taken on May 12, 2005. Court Reporter: Kathryn Keel filed by Danny Williams.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION of Alan A. Adams taken on June 28, 2005. Court Reporter: Beth V. Culver filed by Danny Williams.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certification of Need to File Discovery Original Discovery Pursuant to Plaintiff's Request by James E. Donald, Victor Walker.(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Original Discovery by Danny Williams (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ORDER directing all defendants herein to file objections, if any they have, to 53 the Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff Danny Williams filed on behalf of Prison Legal News. The defendants shall have FIFTEEN (15) DAYS from this date in which to submit any objections and the legal bases therefor. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 12/15/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION of Danny Williams taken on February 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Janet S. Paris filed by James E. Donald and Victor Walker.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certification of Need to File Discovery by James E. Donald and Victor Walker.(cma, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Request to File Original Discovery by Danny Williams (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts# 3 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Errata F# 10 Exhibit G-1# 11 Exhibit G-2# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit L# 17 Exhibit M-1# 18 Exhibit M-2# 19 Exhibit N)(Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) Modified on 12/15/2005 to reflect that this document is TERMINATED and RE-FILED at 55 (cma, ). (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff Danny Williams by Prison Legal News filed by Sarah M. Shalf. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief# 2 Corporate Disclosure)(Shalf, Sarah) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re: 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS filed by James E. Donald, Victor Walker re 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Request to Danny Williams to file original discovery document(s) by James E. Donald, Victor Walker.(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Certification of Need to File Discovery Original Deposition of Plaintiff by James E. Donald, Victor Walker.(Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by James E. Donald, Victor Walker filed by Mary Elizabeth Hand. (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO DOCUMENT ISSUED. It appearing that the court reporter has filed the transcripts of depositions in question, 46 Order is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 11/03/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 45 Motion for Order to Show Cause and directing Court Reporter Kathryn Keel to appear before the court at 11:00 A.M. on November 18, 2005. PERSONAL SERVICE by U. S. Marshal ordered. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 11/02/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Motion for Order to Show Cause . Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 10/25/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order to Show Cause by James E. Donald, Victor Walker filed by Mary Elizabeth Hand. (Hand, Mary) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time as prayed for. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 9/1/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Dispositive Motions. by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as prayed for. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 7/1/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Danny Williams (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct as prayed for. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 5/31/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as prayed for. Signed by Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. on 4/15/05. (Hicks, Claude) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by James E. Donald, Victor Walker filed by Kevin T. Brown. (Brown, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Report by Danny Williams filed by Jennifer Brooke Savage. (Savage, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): 31 Notice (Other) filed by Danny Williams, ) Duplicate filing. Same document as 30 . (cma, ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Danny Williams (Head, C.) Modified on 12/23/2004 (cma, )This document is a duplicate of 30 . (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal and of Substitution of Counsel by Danny Williams. (cma, ) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT filed by Kevin T. Brown. (Brown, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by James E. Donald, Victor Walker. (cma, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by James E. Donald, Victor Walker (Attorney Kevin T. Brown); jury demand (dcp) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Substitute Current Occupants for Positions Sued Earlier and for service upon defendants ( signed by Mag. Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. ) (dcp) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Danny Williams in support of [24-1] motion to Substitute Current Occupants for Positions Sued Earlier (dcp) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Danny Williams to Substitute Current Occupants for Positions Sued Earlier (dcp) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [21-2] order by plaintiff Danny Williams. (dcp) (Entered: 07/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Danny Williams by Mary Ann Oakley (dcp) (Entered: 07/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER allowing plaintiff 30 days to name all responsible defendants with respect to the limited claims that are allowed to go forward set Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/26/04 ( signed by Judge Duross Fitzpatrick ) (dcp) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, issuing as mandate, judgment of USCA, affirming in part, vacating in part and remanding ( signed by Judge Duross Fitzpatrick ) (dcp) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript Information Form filed for Danny Williams in re: [16-1] appeal. NO Transcript(s) ordered. (dcp) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperisi and that plaintiff must pay a partial appellate filing fee of $11.65. After the initial payment, plaintiff will be required to make monthly payments of 20% of the deposits made to his prisoner account during the preceding month toward the $105.00 filing fee (signed by Judge Duross Fitzpatrick) [EOD Date 4/8/02] (cma) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Danny Williams to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dcp) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL Re: [13-1] order by Danny Williams . Fee Status: not paid Copy of Notice of Appeal not mailed, no appearance by defendants. Transcript Information Form due 4/19/02 for Danny Williams [EOD Date 4/3/02] (dcp) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Danny Williams (dcp) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT for Bruce Chatman, Leroy Butts, Emory Grier, Douglas Jones, Joyce Franke, Gary Hall, Brown, Glover, Mary Harris, James Doctor, Jim Wetherington against Danny Williams Civil Order File volume # 83 page # 8515 () [EOD Date 3/7/02] (dcp) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to Dismiss as to Frivolity mooting [11-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order, mooting [10-1] motion for Appointment of Counsel, granting [9-1] motion to Supplement amended complaint, granting [8-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint, granting [7-1] motion to Correct Caption, denying [5-1] motion for Class Certification ( signed by Judge Duross Fitzpatrick ) Civil Order File volume # 83 page # 8515 (dcp) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Danny Williams Re: [11-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order (dcp) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/7/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Danny Williams for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (dcp) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Danny Williams for Appointment of Counsel (dcp) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Danny Williams to Supplement amended complaint (dcp) (Entered: 09/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Danny Williams to Amend [1-1] complaint (dcp) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Danny Williams to Correct Caption (dcp) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Danny Williams for Service of Process (dcp) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Danny Williams for Class Certification (dcp) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and directing plaintiff to pay $19.83 initial partial filing fee Set filing fee deadline to 9/10/01 for Danny Williams (signed by Mag. Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr.) [EOD Date 7/31/01] (dcp) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mag. Judge Claude W. Hicks Jr. (dcp) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION/Affidavit by Danny Williams to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dcp) (Entered: 07/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed; (ssa) (Entered: 07/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?