Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 69), MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 72), AND PETITION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (ECF NO. 74) ARE DENIED.1(footnote) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that:... THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THIS CASE FROM CIVIL SUSPENSE AND TO MARK THIS CASE CLOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/28/2013.2/28/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER of USCA as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD STEWART, dated 2/12/13, re: We order the Clerk to return Apellant's matter to the District Court for further proceedings, etc.. (fb) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
PETITION by DONALD STEWART to enforce settlement agreement. (fb) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
Judgement on decision by the Court, Anita B. Brody by DONALD STEWART, proof of service, affidavit. (fb) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION BY DONALD STEWART FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL WITHDRAW OF 42 U.S.C. SEC. 1983 CIVIL ACTION AND FILE MOTION TO OPEN JUDGEMENT.(fb) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION BY DONALD STEWART FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR INDIGENT PLFF,PROOF OF SERVICE.(fb) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that THE COURT HAVING BEEN PREVIOUSLY ADVISED THAT THE ABOVE ACTION CANNOT PROCEED TO TRIAL AND DISPOSITION BECAUSE OF THE FOLLOWING REASON:...IT IS ORDERED that THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/19/2012. 11/20/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
PETITIONER DONALD STEWART'S MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT TO RESUBMITT 42 U.S.C. SEC. 1983 FOR BREACH OF SETTLEMENT BY FRAUD AND RETALIATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: # 1 Main Document pt-2) (jpd, ). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None |
|
|
Clerk's Notice to USCA re 67 Notice of Appeal : (jpd, ) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None |
 |
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL by DONALD STEWART. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: # 1 Main Document pt 2) (jpd, ). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by DONALD STEWART. (KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Appearance by CARRIE E. NELSON on behalf of PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES with Certificate of Service(NELSON, CARRIE) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 9/10/07 (stb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 8/29/07. (mac, ) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Settlement Conference held on 8/14/07. (stb, ) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that A CONFERENCE REGARDING THE PARTIES DISCOVERY DISPUTE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, AUGUST 23, 2007 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/10/2007. 8/10/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/3/2007; DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE 9/17/2007; MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/15/2007; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/15/2007; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/1/2007 AND TRIAL POOL SET FOR 10/17/2007.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/4/2007. 8/6/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Appearance by ABBE F. FLETMAN on behalf of CARL R. GREENE AND WITHDRAW OF NOLAN N ATKINSON, JR. AND HELENA I. POCHCIECHANOWSKI with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) Modified on 8/2/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 08/02/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Support re 54 MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by DONALD STEWART. (KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER granting 55 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE FOR JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/31/2007.8/1/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) Modified on 8/1/2007 (mo, ). (Entered: 08/01/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Response to Request for Default, with Certificate of Service and Proposed Order filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B Spurio v. Choice Security# 3 Exhibit C Dep. M. Jones# 4 Exhibit D Dep. T. Carter)(CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, DONALD STEWART, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES..(CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) Modified on 7/27/2007 (fh) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION to Strike 53 Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by DONALD STEWART.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike)(KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES with Affirmative Defenses; Jury Demand, Certificate of Service. (CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) Modified on 7/23/2007 (nd). (Entered: 07/20/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Request for Default DONALD STEWART against PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES, AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(KING, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 07/20/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that THE COURT'S ORDER (PAPER #38) IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/27/2007; DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE 8/8/2007; MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 9/6/2007; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/5/2007; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/22/2007 AND TRIAL POOL SET FOR 9/10/2007.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 07/06/2007. 07/10/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS BEFORE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/14/2007 AT 9:30 AM. SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 6/4/2007. 6/4/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/07 before Judge BRODY. Court Reporter: JAMES SCHEIDT. HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINT MOTION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE UNTIL JULY 27, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 05/22/2007.05/23/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) Modified on 5/31/2007 (mo, ). (Entered: 05/23/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, DONALD STEWART, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES..(CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ET AL.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/16/07. 5/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (ldb, ) Modified on 5/16/2007 (ldb, ). (Entered: 05/16/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #32) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO DEFENDANTS TO REASSERT THEIR CONTENTIONS AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES, HIS CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AGAINST PHA, AND HIS CLAIM UNDER THE PHILADELPHIA CODE ARE DIMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 05/15/2007.05/15/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 05/15/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge ANITA B. BRODY : Oral Argument held on 5/11/07. Argued Sur: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the complaint-C.A.V. Court Reporter: James F.G. Scheidt. (mac, ) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that THE TIME OF THE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, MAY 11, 2007 AT 10:30 A.M. WILL NOW BE HELD AT 2:00 P.M.. THE PROCEEDING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 7-B ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/10/2007. 5/10/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECV AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, MAY 11, 2007 AT 10:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 7-B ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADLEPHIA, PA.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 5/9/2007. 5/9/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER, COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO NOTIFY THE COURT IMMEDIATELY UPON RECEIPT OF ANY ORDER FROM THE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY RESOLVING THE MOTION TO DISMISS, ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/7/07. 3/9/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fb) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 3/7/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/7/2007 09:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. COPIES OF NOTICE MAILED TO COUNSEL BY CHAMBERS.(sah) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/25/2007; DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE 6/8/2007; MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/6/2007; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/6/2007; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/22/2007 AND TRIAL POOL SET FOR 7/9/2007.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/26/2007. 1/30/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge ANITA B. BRODY : Scheduling Conference held on 1/19/07. (mac, ) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed Case Management Plan Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, DONALD STEWART, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES. (CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, JANUARY 19, 2007 AT 04:15 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. 12/12/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Donald Stewart for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Certificate of Service filed by DONALD STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER - IT IS AGREED AND STIPULATED THAT PLAINTIFF DONALD STEWART SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF 14 (FOURTEEN) DAYS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' ABOVE-REFERENCED MOTION TO DISMISS. BY WAY OF THIS STIPULATION, IT IS THE INTENTION OF THE PARTIES THAT PLAINTIFF MUST RESPOND TO THIS MOTION BY MONDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2006. THERE HAS BEEN NO PRIOR EXTENSION GRANTED TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND THE PARTIES RESPECTFULLY REQUEST THAT THIS STIPULATION BE ENTERED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.4(2). APPROVED BY THE COURT.SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/13/2006. 10/20/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Donald Stewart for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1)(CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER - IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND BY THIS STIPULATION, DEFENDANT CARL R. GREENE HEREBY WITHDRAWS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE MOTION TO DISMISS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN THIS CASE ON DECEMBER 19, 2005. FURTHERMORE, IT IS AGREED TO AND STIPULATED BETWEEN PLAINTIFF DONALD STEWART ("PLAINTIFF"), AND DEFENDANTS PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, AND MICHELLE JONES (COLECTIVELY "DEFENDANTS"), THAT ALL DEFENDANTS HAVE SIXTY (60) DAYS FROM THE REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE, OR UNTIL OCTOBER 2, 2006 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 09/13/2006. 09/19/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation to WITHDRAWAL of Claim re 18 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Without Prejudice to Respond to Amended Complaint by PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL R. GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, MICHELLE JONES. (CIECHANOWSKI, HELENA) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONALD STEWART. PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY waiver sent on 8/9/2006, answer due 10/10/2006. (KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, CARL GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, JONES , filed by DONALD STEWART, certificate of service.(fb) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY AGREED AND STIPULATED BETWEEN PLAINTIFF DONALD STEWART ("PLAINTIFF"), AND DEFENDANTS CARL GREEN, THEONITA CARTER, ELIZABETH OUTEN, AND MS. JONES ("DEFENDANTS"), THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF COURT APPROVAL OF THIS STIPULATION. THERE HAVE BEEN NO PRIOR AMENDMENTS. APPROVED BY THE COURT:. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 07/05/2006. 07/11/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER that THE CLERK'S OFFICE SHALL REMOVE THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE FROM CIVIL SUSPENSE AND RESTORE THE CASE TO THE TRIAL DOCKET SO THAT IT MAY PROCEED TO FINAL DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 07/07/2006. 07/10/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo,) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint Stipulation for Leave to Amend Complaint by DONALD STEWART. (KING, MICHAEL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/29/2006 (np). (Entered: 06/28/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER THAT ALAN COTLER, ESQUIRE, MICHAEL KING, ESQUIRE, AND JEREMY BERGER, ESQUIRE ARE HEREBY APPOINTED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REPRESENTING THE PLAINTIFF, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 06/21/06. 06/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, ) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WILLIAM KING on behalf of DONALD STEWART with Certificate of Service (KING, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION BY DONALD STEWART FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DUE TO THE COURT'S APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL COUNSEL FOR THE PLFF DONALD STEWART.(fb) FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE ENTRY. Modified on 4/11/2006 (td). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 02/16/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DUE TO THE COURT'S APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL COUNSEL (DOC. #20), IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) THE MOTION IS GRANTED; (2) NO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (DOC. #18) SHALL BE DUE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, WHILE THE CLERK'S OFFICE ATTEMPTS TO FIND COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF; AND (3) THIS CASE SHALL BE STAYED AND PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 02/15/2006.02/15/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL. (mo, ) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION BY DONALD STEWART FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DUE TO THE COURT'S APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL COUNSEL FOR THE PLFF DONALD STEWART.(fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 01/30/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (DOC. #15), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS DIRECTED TO APPOINT COUNSEL. . SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/4/2006.1/5/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL. (mo, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by CARL GREENE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ATKINSON, NOLAN) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses with Certificate of Service by THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, JONES.(ATKINSON, NOLAN) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DONALD STEWART. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION BY DONALD STEWART FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL,PROOF OF SERVICE, DECLARATION.(fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Request by DONALD STEWART for resolution for a out of court settlement, proof of service, affidavit. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: U.S. Marshals Service served Summons and Complaint upon CARL GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, JONES by Personal Service. CARL GREENE served on 11/28/2005, answer due 12/19/2005; THEONITA C. CARTER served on 11/28/2005, answer due 12/19/2005; ELIZABETH D. OUTEN served on 11/28/2005, answer due 12/19/2005; JONES served on 11/28/2005, answer due 12/19/2005. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 12/05/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Appearance by NOLAN N. ATKINSON, JR on behalf of CARL GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, JONES with Certificate of Service (ATKINSON, NOLAN) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONALD STEWART. CARL GREENE waiver sent on 10/21/2005, answer due 12/20/2005; THEONITA C. CARTER waiver sent on 10/21/2005, answer due 12/20/2005; ELIZABETH D. OUTEN waiver sent on 10/21/2005, answer due 12/20/2005; JONES waiver sent on 10/21/2005, answer due 12/20/2005. (cdd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 11/02/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Plff, re: In complaince with the court's order of 9/21/05 the complaint will be forwarded to the U.S. Marshal Service to effect service as to all defendants. (fb) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Plff, re: Waiver of Service. (fb) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DEFENDANTS on 9/22/05. Waiver of Service due by 10/24/2005. (fb) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS TO BE FILED, THE SUMMONSES ARE TO ISSUE, SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS TO BE MADE UPON THE DEFTS BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE IN THE EVENT THAT WAIVER OF SERVICE IS NOT EFFECTED UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 4(d)(2), ETC. . SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/16/05. 9/22/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fb) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY FILING FEE OF $250 AS FULLY OUTLINED HEREIN; THE CLERK SHALL FORWARD A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-SMITHFIELD; THE CLERK SHALL REOPEN THIS CASE STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/16/2005. 9/22/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-SMITHFIELD.(le, ) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE by DONALD STEWART to proceed with 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Complaint. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 09/15/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE by DONALD STEWART to proceed with this case. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
ORDER THAT THE PETITION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ITS REASSERTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS ORDER; IF PLAINTIFF FILES WITH THE COURT WITHIN TWENTY (20) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER A NOTICE THAT HE WISHES TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION AND THEREBY OBLIGATE HIMSELF TO PAY THE $250.00 FILING FEE, THIS CASE WILL BE REINSTATED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/1/05. 9/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF FROM CHAMBERS. (jpd) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
APPLICATION by DONALD STEWART to proceed in forma pauperis in a 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 Civil Rights Action, account statement. (fb) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
COMPLAINT (No IFP, No Filing Fee Paid) against CARL GREENE, THEONITA C. CARTER, ELIZABETH D. OUTEN, JONES , filed by DONALD STEWART.(ti, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (brjo, ). (Entered: 08/19/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |