Adams v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00555
Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 12:31 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clarence A. Adams, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clarence A. Adams
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
Status Report Submitted by Federal Bureau Of Prisons (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER approving status report filed September 5, 2013; directing Respondent to file an updated status report on or before October 6, 2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/9/2013. (c/m 9/10/2013)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT Updated by Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER directing the parties to file an updated status report on or before September 5, 2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/16/2013. (c/m 8/16/2013)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Clarence A. Adams (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay and parties to submit a status report on or before August 15, 2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/5/2013. (c/m 6/6/13) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION to Stay by Federal Bureau Of Prisons Responses due by 6/17/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to and including May 31, 2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/15/2013. (c/m 5/15/2015) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Bureau Of Prisons Responses due by 5/31/2013 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis; Respondent to file a response within 30 days; and directing Clerk to mail copy of petition to AUSA Allen Loucks. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/16/2013. (c/m 4/17/2013)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                        Supplement of Complaint from JKB-13-1059. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER consolidating JKB-13-1059 with Civil Action JKB-13-555; directing Clerk to docket a copy of ECF No. 1 from JKB-13-1059 in JKB-13-555 and directing Clerk to close case JKB-13-1059. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/11/2013. (c/m 4/11/2013)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 5 and 6 Motions for Extension of Time to and including 4/10/2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/11/2013. (c/m 4/11/2013) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time by Clarence A. Adams (address change included) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Extension of Time by Clarence A. Adams (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to and including April 15, 2013. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 3/12/2013. (c/m 3/12/2013) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Clarence A. Adams (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting Petitioner 28 days to supplement the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/26/13.(c/m af 2/27/13) (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clarence A. Adams. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?