Galitski et al v. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-04782

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 10:25 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Newbold, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Taliaferro, Plaintiff
No Logo Shane Galitski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Congress Square II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc R Stanley +1 214 443 4301 +1 214 443 0358 marcstanley@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doyle Lowther LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alyson Amerson +1 213 867 1777 +1 213 867 9922 alyson@doylelowther.com
Space Katherine Sarah DiDonato +1 213 867 1777 +1 213 867 9922 kate@doylelowther.com
Space William James Doyle, II +1 858 935 9960 +1 858 939 1939 bill@doylelowther.com
Space James Robert Hail +1 858 935 9960 +1 858 939 1939 jim@doylelowther.com
Space John Lowther +1 619 573 1700 +1 888 710 6866
Space Samantha A Smith +1 858 935 9960 +1 858 939 1939 samantha@doylelowther.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glynn Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Glynn +1 858 271 1100 +1 858 876 1530 tom@glynnlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley Iola LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott A Kitner +1 214 443 4312 +1 214 443 0358 skitner@stanleyiola.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Woodward +1 214 443 4300 +1 214 443 0358 mwoodward@stanleylawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Consumer Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan M Mansfield +1 619 308 5034 +1 888 341 5048 alan@clgca.com
v.
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David I Hurwitz +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 dih@birdmarella.com
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Dabdoub +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 adabdoub@lynnllp.com
Space Jeffrey Mark Tillotson +1 214 981 3838 +1 214 981 3839 jmt@lynnllp.com
Space John D. Volney +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 jvolney@lynnllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gail A Hayworth +1 214 659 8719 +1 214 659 8802 gail.hayworth@usdoj.gov
  Entries (207) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 12/5/2016 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/9/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Thomas E Glynn on behalf of Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Glynn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Status Report due by 7/1/2016. Motions due by 8/1/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/2/2015) (axm) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
        Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Richard Taliaferro. (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Alan M Mansfield on behalf of Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Mansfield, Alan) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney William J Doyle, II on behalf of Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Doyle, William) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2015. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/3/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (unsealed and redacted version of 195 ). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/28/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 197 MOTION To Seal Certain Parts of Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certifiation re 195 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/11/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION To Seal Certain Parts of Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certifiation re 195 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER re unsealing procedure for 195 sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/28/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        (Document Restricted) Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 137 plaintiffs' September 24, 2014 motion for class certification; denying without prejudice 149 defendant's November 12, 2014 motion to exclude expert opinions offered by plaintiffs' expert; and denying without prejudice 167 plaintiffs' December 22, 2014 motion to exclude opinions offered by designated experts. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/28/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 137 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Hail, James) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2015 re: 137 Motion to Certify Class filed by Shane Galitski, Richard Taliaferro, Brian Newbold. Oral Argument heard. Taken under advisement. Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Marc Stanley with James R. Hale; Defense - Jeff Tillotson with John Volney and Alan Dabdoub. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:15. (chmb) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 137 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Stanley, Marc) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: 150 Response/Objection, filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Order on Motion to Strike
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 185 Motion to Substitute Party. Samsung Electronics America, Inc is substituted as party defendant in place of Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. All claims now apply to this party and any statute of limitations defenses are waived. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC is dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/19/2015) (gr) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Motion to Substitute Party
                                            Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Richard Taliaferro. Party Samsung Electronics America, Inc. added. (Stanley, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Response/Objection
                                              RESPONSE filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re: 171 MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin re 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Reply
                                                REPLY filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re: 164 MOTION to Strike 160 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, and Appendix (Volney, John) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 181 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC shall have until 2/9/2015 to file its Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Appendix and to file its Response to Plaintiffs Motion To Exclude Opinions Offered By Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddum, and Jay Amin. IT IS ALSO HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall have until 3/2/2015 to file their Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude Opinions Offered By Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/29/2015) (tlm) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/23/2013), 171 MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin re 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, 178 Response/Objection, 179 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 171 MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin re 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Excl filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 179 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Reply Brief In Support of Motion To Strike Plaintiffs' Reply Appendix and To File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Opinions Offered By Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu and Jay Amin. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/14/2015) (skt) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 171 MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin re 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, 178 Response/Objection filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Response/Objection
                                                          OBJECTION filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro re: 164 MOTION to Strike 160 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, and Appendix (Hail, James) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 175 Application to File Documents Under Seal. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/13/2015) (tln) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Reply
                                                              REPLY filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re: 149 MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Plaintiffs' Expert W. Ross Stone (Volney, John) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) Modified to enhance text on 1/12/2015 (skt). (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection
                                                                  (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: 164 Motion to Strike, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/23/2013) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Amended Document
                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons. (Dabdoub, Alan) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Marc R Stanley on behalf of Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Stanley, Marc) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 171 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: 12/29/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin re 167 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/23/2013) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: 12/29/2014 Response/Objection
                                                                          OBJECTION filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro re: 149 MOTION to Strike /Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Plaintiffs' Expert W. Ross Stone (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 166 Motion for Leave to File under seal; granting 168 Motion for Leave to File under seal. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/23/2014) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Portions of Document No. 167 under seal(Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin and appendix filed in support thereof filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Designated Experts Joseph C. McAlexander, Abhiram Reddy Yerramaddu, and Jay Amin (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/23/2013) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Appendix in support of motion to exclude, # 2 Exhibit(s) A) (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Portions of Docket No. 165 Under Seal(Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions Offered by Plaintiff's Expert Ross W. Stone) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: 149 Motion to Strike (Sealed pursuant to order dated 4/23/2013) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Defendant's Objection and MOTION to Strike 160 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, and Appendix filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Dabdoub, Alan) Modified title on 12/22/2014 (awc). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro re: 137 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 161 MOTION To Seal Portions of Docket No. 160 and Exhibits re 160 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/11/2014) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION To Seal Portions of Docket No. 160 and Exhibits re 160 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: 137 Motion to Certify Class (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/1/2011) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Exhibit(s) E, # 7 Exhibit(s) F, # 8 Exhibit(s) G, # 9 Exhibit(s) H) (Hail, James) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless on 8/28/2014. (skt) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Sprint Wireless/Sprint Spectrum LP Records c/o Callie Keep on 8/28/2014. (ykp) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service for a Subpoena served on Sprint Wireless/Sprint Spectrum LP Records c/o Calli Keep on 8/28/2014. (ykp) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 132 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion to Dismiss filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, and granting 103 Motion to Compel filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/22/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 129 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 128 Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify Deadlines and Declaration of Jennifer MacPherson filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/18/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                              (Document Restricted) Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify Deadlines and Declaration of Jennifer MacPherson in Support Thereof (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Deadlines, # 2 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify Deadlines, # 3 Declaration of Jennifer L. Macpherson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Deadlines) (Hail, James) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S FIFTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. The Court, having reviewed Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's Fifth Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel STA to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, and for good cause shown, hereby grants the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, shall have until Wednesday, June 4, 2014, to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel STAY to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 6/3/2014) (mcrd) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of re: 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Volney, John) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: 5/21/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Volney, John) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 122 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 5/21/2014. Defendant's First and Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 117 and 120 are DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/15/2014) (ndt) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                          Third MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel(), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Volney, John) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re: 103 MOTION to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices (Volney, John) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Volney, John) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 118 Motion to Extend Time. Expert Discovery due by 8/22/2014. Replies Brief due by 9/5/2014. Responses Brief due by 8/8/2014. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/1/2014) (ndt) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Modify Deadlines filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Volney, John) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 115 Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices and Appendix filed in support thereof filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. The application to file under seal is granted. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        (Document Restricted) Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices and Appendix filed in support thereof (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices, # 2 Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices) (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re: 98 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Newbold's Express Warranty and Implied Warranty Claims (Volney, John) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 112 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas E. Glynn. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/11/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5970169) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Glynn, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF REFERENCE Referring 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/10/2014) (tln) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 107 Application to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Appendix Exhibits C and D. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/10/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: 4/9/2014 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro re 107 (Document Restricted) Application to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Appendix Exhibits C and D (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal), 108 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix Exhibit B) (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: 4/9/2014 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Defendant Samsung Telecomm. America, LLC to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: 4/9/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Document Restricted) Application to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Appendix Exhibits C and D (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Samsung to Comply with Topic 12 of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of F.R.C.P. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit(s) Appendix Exhibit D) (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro re: 98 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Newbold's Express Warranty and Implied Warranty Claims (Hail, James) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re 104 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 103 MOTION to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices (Volney, John) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re 103 MOTION to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices (Volney, John) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Non-Destructive Testing of Plaintiffs' Mobile Devices filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Volney, John) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan M. Mansfield. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/1/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5947041) filed by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Mansfield, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT. The Parties stipulate and agree that, subject to the conditions set forth herein, Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a First Amended Class Action Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 2/21/2014. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/27/2014) (ykp) Modified on 1/28/2014 (skt). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION Agreed Order To Amend Complaint by Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Richard Taliaferro. (Hail, James) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Marc R Stanley on behalf of Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stanley, Marc) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC; granting in part, denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC; and granting 84 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/5/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC; granting in part, denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC; and granting 84 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/5/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Supplemental Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Judge Solis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Order on Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Summons Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 224 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?