TCYK, LLC v. Zarrouk
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01630-WYD-MEH

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 7:27 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Ahmed Zarrouk and this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/30/13. (jjhsl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Terminated Party
      Party Ahmed Zarrouk terminated pursuant to the [49] notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 12/27/2013. Text Only Entry (ervsl, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Attempted Service)(Stephenson, David)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than December 31, 2013, as to why this Court should not recommend that its claims against the Defendant be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/18/13. (jjhsl, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
            SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jjhsl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Summons Request
              SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ahmed Zarrouk by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Amended Complaint
                Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ahmed Zarrouk, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(jjhsl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER granting [41] Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Corrected Second Amended Complaint, located at docket #41-2, as well as Exhibits A, B and C, located at dockets ## 41-3, 41-4, and 41-5. The Court's December 12, 2013 order directing the Clerk of the Court to file the Second Amended Complaint (docket #37) is withdrawn by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/17/13.(jjhsl, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM regarding [41] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Second Amended Complaint and Case Caption by Interlineation filed by TCYK, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/16/2013. Text Only Entry (ervsl, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM regarding [41] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Second Amended Complaint and Case Caption by Interlineation filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/16/2013. (klyon, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/15/2013, Entered: 12/15/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                        MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Second Amended Complaint and Case Caption by Interlineation by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Document Marked Up Proposed Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Document Clean Copy of Proposed Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A to Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit B to Corrected Second Amended Complaint, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit C to Corrected Second Amended Complaint)(Stephenson, David)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Summons Request
                          SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ahmed Zarrouk, a/k/a Ahmed Zarrouck by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/ModifyCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [37] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint in order to Identify Defendant John Doe 13 by Name. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint, located at docket [37-3], as well as Exhibits A, B and C, located at dockets [37-4], [37-5], and [37-6]. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with the Second Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and this Court's orders. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/12/2013. (mehcd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM regarding [37] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Amended Complaint (Corrected by Interlineation) filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/12/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/12/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                WITHDRAWN MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Amended Complaint (Corrected by Interlineation) by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Document Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Marked Up Copy), # (2) Proposed Document Proposed Ex. A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (3) Proposed Document Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Clean Copy), # (4) Proposed Document Proposed Ex. A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Clean Copy), # (5) Exhibit Ex. B to proposed Second Amended Complaint, # (6) Exhibit Ex. C to proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Stephenson, David) Modified on 12/17/2013 pursuant to the Minute Order of 12/17/13 (jjhsl, ).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 1, 2, 4, 8, 14, 15, 18 and 20 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/13. (jjhsl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 4, John Doe 8, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 18, and John Doe 20 without Prejudice by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [32] Plaintiff's second Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on or before December 17, 2013. The Court will grant no further extensions of this deadline absent a showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/15/2013. (mehcd)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM regarding [32] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 11 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/25/13. (jjhsl, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe 11 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/25/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 11 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [27] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on or before 11/17/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2013. (mehcd)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding [27] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/17/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of Service Verizon Online, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Service Comcast, # (3) Exhibit Proof of Service CenturyTel, # (4) Exhibit Production Response--Verizon, # (5) Exhibit Production Response--Comcast, # (6) Exhibit Production Response--CenturyTel)(Stephenson, David)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 3, 7, 10, and 17 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/17/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 3, 7, 10, and 17 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/17/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 3, John Doe 7, John Doe 10, and John Doe 17 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER. ORDERED John Doe No. 5 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/13/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: 9/13/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER. ORDERED John Doe No. 5 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/13/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 5 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER. ORDERED John Doe No. 9 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER. ORDERED John Doe No. 9 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/04/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 9 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. The Plaintiff tendered an Amended Complaint, for which the caption and content involves a different case. See docket #18. Thus, the tendered Amended Complaint [18] is stricken by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/26/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER. ORDERED John Doe No. 6 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/23/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                              STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrrected by Interlineation against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David) Modified on 8/26/2013 FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR (jjhsl, ). Modified on 8/26/2013 (jjhsl, ).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected by Interlineation against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2013, Entered: 8/25/2013 Amended Complaint
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Motion Picture)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER. ORDERED John Doe Nos. 12, 16, and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/15/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 12, John Doe 16, and John Doe 19 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/17/2013. (mehcd) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/17/2013) (mehcd, ).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [8] Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Priorto Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/24/13.(jjhsl, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding [8] MOTION for Leave to filed by TCYK, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/24/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2013, Entered: 6/23/2013 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration in support of motion, # (2) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/21/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                                                                      REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (sphil, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Magistrate Judge Consent FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. No summons issued. (sphil, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/21/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Notice of Case Association
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Stephenson, David)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. ORDERED John Doe Nos. 12, 16, and 19 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/15/13. (jjhsl, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against John Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3416167), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Spreadsheet of Doe Defendants, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Registration, # (3) Exhibit Local Listings of the Movie, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, David)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?