Velez et al v. New Haven Bus Svc, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00019
District Judge Robert N. Chatigny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 9:02 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID PEARSON, Plaintiff
No Logo Debra King, Plaintiff
No Logo Dwayne Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo JAIME GARCIA, Plaintiff
No Logo James Earl Ebron, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Logan, Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH THOMAS, Plaintiff
No Logo Luis Alicea, Plaintiff
No Logo Matias Cabrera, Plaintiff
No Logo Nadine King, Plaintiff
No Logo Roberto Velez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter D. Goselin +1 860 580 9675 +1 860 471 8133 pdgoselin@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Mariusz Kurzyna

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mariusz Kurzyna +1 860 357 6070 +1 860 606 9560 mariusz@kurzynalaw.com
No Logo Zacharie Porcenat, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Daniel Miley, Defendant
No Logo New Haven Bus Svc, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durant, Nichols, Houston, Mitchell & Sheahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Hodgson +1 203 366 3438 chodgson@durantnic.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher John Sugar +1 203 366 3438 +1 203 384 0317 csugar@durantnic.com
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 203
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Objection
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 26 Amended Complaint, by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, Dwayne Clark, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Kenneth Thomas, Roberto Velez.Responses due by 9/6/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Matias Cabrera, Luis Alicea, Zacharie Porcenat, David Pearson, Dwayne Clark, Roberto Velez, Nadine King, Kenneth Thomas, Jose Logan, Debra King. Yale University served on 7/31/2013, answer due 8/21/2013. (Kurzyna, Mariusz) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 8/20/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Plaintiff's counsel shall place the call to chambers at 860-240-3605 with opposing counsel on the line. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/31/13. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, Dwayne Clark, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Kenneth Thomas, Roberto Velez. (Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT by Defendants as to Settlement by Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc. (Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER: Counsel shall report to chambers by 7/26/2013 regarding the status of settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/16/13. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Sugar on behalf of Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc (Sugar, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                              First STATUS REPORT by New Haven Bus Svc, Inc. (Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                STATUS REPORT by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, Dwayne Clark, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Kenneth Thomas, Roberto Velez. (Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Counsel are expected to read the attachments to the Case Management Order. Discovery due by 11/15/2013; Prefiling Conference Requests re Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/13; Trial Ready Date 3/15/2014; Trial Brief due by 2/15/2014. First Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2013. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 6/18/13. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 6/7/2013. Case did not settle. The parties are encouraged to continue discussions. Counsel shall report status to Judge Martinez by no later than 7/9/13. Total Time: 3 hours (Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. by Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc.(Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE: The Settlement Conference set for 5/16/13 has been rescheduled to 6/6/2013 at 1:00 PM before Judge Donna F. Martinez in her Chambers, Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/17/13. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter D. Goselin* *The Law Office of Peter Goselin* *557 Prospect Ave., 2nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc, filed by James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Matias Cabrera, Luis Alicea, Zacharie Porcenat, David Pearson, Roberto Velez, Nadine King, Jose Logan, Debra King, Kenneth Thomas, Dwayne Clark.(Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/8/2013. (Gillenwater, J) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER: A Settlement Conference before Judge Donna F. Martinez is set for 5/16/2013 at 1:00 PM in her Chambers, Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. SEE ATTACHED instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/8/13. (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez to confer with the parties and enter the scheduling order required by F.R.Civ. P. 16(b) and to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/4/13.(Glynn, T.) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE AND ORDER, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2013) Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/1/13.(Blue, A.) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Roberto Velez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unpublished Decisions)(Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/29/2013 to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/22/2013. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Roberto Velez.Responses due by 4/11/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pl.Ex. 1 Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Goselin, Peter) Modified on 3/26/2013 to edit the text to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/29/2013 to respond to 12 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Roberto Velez. (Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/21/2013. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/21/2013 to respond to defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/1/2013. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/21/2013 respond to motion to dismiss 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Roberto Velez. (Goselin, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Case Appendix)(Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc.Responses due by 2/28/2013 (Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Hodgson on behalf of Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc (Hodgson, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Matias Cabrera, Luis Alicea, Zacharie Porcenat, David Pearson, Roberto Velez, Nadine King, Jose Logan, Debra King. Daniel Miley served on 1/17/2013, answer due 2/7/2013. (Kurzyna, Mariusz) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Matias Cabrera, Luis Alicea, Zacharie Porcenat, David Pearson, Roberto Velez, Nadine King, Jose Logan, Debra King. New Haven Bus Svc, Inc served on 1/17/2013, answer due 2/7/2013. (Kurzyna, Mariusz) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE re 5 NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols by Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Debra King, Nadine King, Jose Logan, David Pearson, Zacharie Porcenat, Roberto Velez (Kurzyna, Mariusz) Modified on 1/22/2013 to edit the text and link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Daniel Miley, New Haven Bus Svc, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mariusz Kurzyna* *The Law Office of Mariusz Kurzyna* *19 Bassett St., P.O. Box 3104* *New Britain, CT 06050*. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Protective Order, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint, filed by Roberto Velez, Debra King, Nadine King, Zacharie Porcenat, Jaime Garcia, Luis Alicea, Matias Cabrera, James Earl Ebron, David Pearson, Jose Logan, 5 Notice. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/13. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/5/13. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/5/13. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/5/13. (Attachments: # 1 Efile Attachment)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2013 Discovery due by 7/7/2013. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/13. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2735887.), filed by James Earl Ebron, Jaime Garcia, Matias Cabrera, Luis Alicea, Zacharie Porcenat, David Pearson, Roberto Velez, Nadine King, Jose Logan, Debra King. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurzyna, Mariusz) (Entered: 01/05/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?