ALHAMI v. RUMSFELD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-01917
District Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 9:46 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RAFIQ ALHAMI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DENBEAUX & DENBEAUX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua W. Denbeaux +1 201 664 8855 +1 201 666 8589 jdenbeaux@denbeauxlaw.com
v.
No Logo AIR FORCE GENERAL RICHARD MYERS, Defendant
No Logo ARMY BRIGADIER GEN GREGORY ZANETTI, Defendant
No Logo ARMY BRIGADIER GEN JAY HOOD, Defendant
No Logo ARMY GENERAL JAMES T. HILL, Defendant
No Logo ARMY GENERAL TERRY CARRICO, Defendant
No Logo ARMY GENERAL TOMMY FRANKS, Defendant
No Logo ARMY LT. COLONEL DIANE BEAVER, Defendant
No Logo ARMY LT. COLONEL WILLIAM CLINE, Defendant
No Logo ARMY LT. GENERAL MCNEILL, Defendant
No Logo ARMY MAJ GEN MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, Defendant
No Logo ARMY MAJOR GENERAL GEOFFREY MILLER, Defendant
No Logo CAPTAIN CAROLYN WOOD, Defendant
No Logo DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., Defendant
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE TENET, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo MARINE BRIG GEN MICHAEL LEHNERT, Defendant
No Logo NELSON J. CANNON, Defendant
No Logo REAR ADMIRAL HARRY B. HARRIS, Defendant
No Logo REAR ADMIRAL JAMES G. STAVRIDIS, Defendant
No Logo REAR ADMIRAL MAK H. BUZBY, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OF THE UNITED STATES, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE purs to F.R.Civ.P.4(m) w/out prejudice & w/out costs. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 11/25/09. (sr, ) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m) Motion set for 11/24/2009 09:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4 before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. (spc, ) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against HARRY B. HARRIS, MAK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, JAMES G. STAVRIDIS, MCNEILL, TOMMY FRANKS, GREGORY ZANETTI, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, WILLIAM CLINE, DIANE BEAVER, CAROLYN WOOD, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN DOES 1-100, THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE OF THE UNITED STATES, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2499001.) None. (No Summons Submitted), filed by RAFIQ ALHAMI.(ld, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2009: # 1 Faxed Signature Page to Complaint) (ld, ). (Entered: 04/24/2009)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 80 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?