McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company et al v. United States of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-02106
District Judge Marsha J. Pechman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2016 at 4:04 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MCFARLAND CASCADE POLE & LUMBER COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William N Baldwin +1 206 839 4823 bill.baldwin@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joel R Junker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel R Junker +1 206 621 7878 joel@jrjtradelaw.com
No Logo Oeser Company The, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Commerce Department of the United States, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Kipnis +1 206 553 7970 Brian.Kipnis@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against plaintiffs; signed by Docket Clerk M. Duett at the direction of Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commerce Department of the United States,, United States of America,, and STRIKING 11 MOTION for Discovery & Expedited Case Schedule filed by Oeser Company The,, McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
      REPLY, filed by Defendants United States of America, Commerce Department of the United States, TO RESPONSE to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
        REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The, TO RESPONSE to 11 MOTION for Discovery & Expedited Case Schedule (Junker, Joel) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
          RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The, to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Junker, Joel) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
            RESPONSE, by Defendants United States of America, Commerce Department of the United States, to 11 MOTION for Discovery & Expedited Case Schedule. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Plaintiffs McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The that the following is RE-NOTED: 11 MOTION for Discovery & Expedited Case Schedule Noting Date 1/14/2005. (Junker, Joel) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                MOTION for Discovery & Expedited Case Schedule by Plaintiffs McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The. Noting Date 12/20/2004. (Attachments: # 1proposed order )(Junker, Joel) Modified text on 12/21/2004 (MD, ). (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants United States of America, Commerce Department of the United States. Noting Date 1/14/2005. Proposed Order and (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Rick Shimon# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11)(Bryce, Peter) Modified text on 12/21/2004 (MD, ). (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER Joint Status Report STAYED pending resolution of cross-mtns for discovery and dismissal; signed by Docket Clerk M. Duett at the direction of Judge Pechman.(SC, ) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendants United States of America, Commerce Department of the United States (Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2005; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                          SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States of America on 11/20/2004; Commerce Department of the United States on 11/20/2004 by certified mail (MD, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS & issued re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company. (MD, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant all defendants, filed by McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The. (Attachments: # 1summons)(Junker, Joel) Modified text on 11/22/2004 (MD, ). (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States of America on 10/13/2004; Commerce Department of the United States on 10/13/2004 by certified mail (MD, ) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                                  Return of service/summons and complaint: only second page filed. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant(s)United States of America, Commerce Department of the United States (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # 318219) , filed by McFarland Cascade Pole & Lumber Company, Oeser Company The. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons)(PM, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2004 (PM, ). (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?