Saleh v. Bush et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01124
District Judge Jon S. Tigar, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 11, 2017 at 7:33 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sundus Shaker Saleh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Comar, Dave Inder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dave Inder Comar +1 415 640 5856 +1 415 513 0445 inder@comarlaw.com
v.
No Logo Colin L. Powell, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
No Logo Paul M. Wolfowitz, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"
No Logo The United States, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None USCA Case Number
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPLY (re 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint ) filed bySundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE to (re 43 MOTION to Dismiss) filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service) (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE to (re 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint) filed by The United States. (Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Order Granting Stipulated Request for Enlargement of Briefing ScheduleThe parties' stipulated request for enlargement of the briefing schedule, ECF No. 44, is GRANTED. The parties' briefs shall be due as set forth in their stipulation.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; -Stipulated Request for an Order Regarding Briefing Deadlines filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/7/2014. Replies due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE filed by The United States of Notice of Substitution of The United States as Sole Defendant on Counts I and II (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Scope Certification, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 8/27/2014 is CONTINUED to 10/29/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/15/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint; -STIPULATED Request for an Order Enlarging Briefing Deadlines filed by George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Paul M. Wolfowitz. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (second) by Plaintiff against All Defendants. Filed bySundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/8/2014) (Entered: 06/08/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 8/13/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER VACATING HEARING re 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States, 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss , 31 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byThe United States. (Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RESPONSE (re 31 MOTION to Dismiss ) to United States' Motion to Dismiss filed bySundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Declaration)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 11/29/2013) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE by The United States Notice of Substitution of the United States as Sole Defendant (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Scope Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 11/29/2013) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/29/2014. Replies due by 2/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 11/29/2013) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE by The United States Notice of Substitution of the United States as Sole Defendant (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Scope Certification, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 11/29/2013) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Enlargement of Briefing Deadlines filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Enlargement of Briefing Deadlines filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Enlargement of Briefing Deadlines filed by George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Paul M. Wolfowitz. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT For Conspiracy To Commit Aggression; And The Crime Of Aggression against All Defendants. Filed bySundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 9/10/2013) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Deadlines filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. Motions terminated as moot: 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Deadlines filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. Motions terminated as moot: 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulated Request for an Order Regarding Briefing Deadlines filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 9/6/2013) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Time of Motion Hearing as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss. The Motion Hearing previously noticed for for 12/12/2013 at 2:00 PM is ADVANCED to begin at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The date of the hearing remains the same. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Stewart Greene (Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 8/20/2013) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/21/2013. Replies due by 11/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 8/20/2013) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE filed by The United States of Notice of Substitution of the United States as Sole Defendant (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certification of Scope of Employment, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 8/20/2013) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh on US Attorney and Department of Justice (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on Richard Cheney (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on Donald Rumsfeld (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on Paul Wolfowitz PhD (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on George W. Bush (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on Colin Powell (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sundus Shaker Saleh of summons on Condoleezza Rice, PhD (Comar, Dave) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 8 Stipulation; denying as moot 9 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/12/2013) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 2 ADR Scheduling Order; Stipulated Request to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice, Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Stewart Greene (Greene, Glenn) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Comar, Dave) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Defendants George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld & Paul M. Wolfowitz. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filedby Plaintiff Sundus Shaker Saleh. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 6/12/2013 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 6/19/2013 at 2:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Conspiracy to Commit Aggression, and The Crime of Aggression & Demand for Jury Trial - [No Summons Issued] against George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Colin L. Powell, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld & Paul M. Wolfowitz, [Filing Fee: $350.00, receipt number 34611084105] Filed byPlaintiff Sundus Shaker Saleh. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 456 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?