FL Health Sciences Center, Inc, et al v. Kathleen Sebelius
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5015

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 10:24 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207524273 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
APPENDIX [1453646] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/27/2013 ] [13-5011, 13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207521721 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
    APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1452177] filed by Kathleen Sebelius in 13-5011, 13-5015 [Service Date: 08/16/2013 ] Length of Brief: 6,998 Words. [13-5011, 13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207517448 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
      APPELLEE BRIEF [1449704] filed by Allina Health Services, Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., Henry Ford Health System, Highland Hospital of Rochester, Kaleida Health, Kingsbrook Jewish Medical Center, Lutheran Hospital Center, Maimonides Medical Center, Methodist Dallas Medical Center, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Sinai Medical Center of Florida, Inc., New York Hospital Medical Center of Queens, New York Methodist Hospital, New York and Presbyterian Hospital, North Carolina Baptist Hospital, North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System, Inc., Shands Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc. and University of Rochester in 13-5011, Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 13-5015 [Service Date: 08/01/2013 ] Length of Brief: 13,992 words. [13-5011, 13-5015] (Webster, Stephanie)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207509093 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
        APPELLANT BRIEF [1444609] filed by Kathleen Sebelius in 13-5011, 13-5015 [Service Date: 07/01/2013 ] Length of Brief: 12,618 Words. [13-5011, 13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207495483 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
          CLERK'S ORDER filed [1436021] granting the joint motion to modify the briefing schedule [1435403-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 07/01/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/01/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/16/2013. Deferred Appendix due 08/27/2013. Final Briefs due 08/30/2013. [13-5011, 13-5015]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207494417 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1435403] by Kathleen Sebelius and Allina Health Services, Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., Henry Ford Health System, Highland Hospital of Rochester, Kaleida Health, Kingsbrook Jewish Medical Center, Lutheran Hospital Center, Maimonides Medical Center, Methodist Dallas Medical Center, Methodist Hospitals of Dallas, Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Sinai Medical Center of Florida, Inc., New York Hospital Medical Center of Queens, New York Methodist Hospital, New York and Presbyterian Hospital, North Carolina Baptist Hospital, North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System, Inc., Shands Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc. and University of Rochester in 13-5011, Kathleen Sebelius and Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc. and Henry Ford Health System in 13-5015 Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. [Service Date: 05/09/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5011, 13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207493609 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1434865] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/08/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/07/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/21/2013. Deferred Appendix due 08/28/2013. Final Briefs due 09/11/2013. [13-5011, 13-5015]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207467644 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1420485] granting motion to consolidate [1420420-2] in 13-5011 13-5015 (Consolidation started 02/14/2013) with 13-5011 [13-5011, 13-5015]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207467525 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                  UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1420421] by Kathleen Sebelius to consolidate cases [Service Date: 02/13/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207467512 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                    UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1420417] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 02/13/2013 ] [13-5015] (Marcus, Stephanie)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 107 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?