Oscar Ortega, et al v. Uponor, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 12-3179

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802210125 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED. [4052342] [12-2761, 12-3179] (LMT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802191047 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion. ROGER L. WOLLMAN, DIANA E. MURPHY and LAVENSKI R. SMITH Hrg May 2013 [4043168] [12-2761, 12-3179] (LMT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802190988 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
      OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Diana E. Murphy and Lavenski R. Smith AUTHORING JUDGE:Diana E. Murphy (PUBLISHED) [4043141] [12-2761, 12-3179] (Complete Publisher letter attached)--[Edited 06/07/2013 by LMT] (LMT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802176117 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ARGUED & SUBMITTED in St. Paul to Judges Roger L. Wollman, Diana E. Murphy, Lavenski R. Smith on 05/15/2013 Mr. Michael D. Turner for Appellants Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul, Mr. Howard L. Lieber for Appellees Uponor, Inc. and Radiant Technology, Inc. and Mr. Shawn Michael Raiter for Appellees Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Steve Spina, Ms. Kim Spina, Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Mr. Paul Roth and Ms. Lynn Roth in 12-2761, Mr. Michael D. Turner for Appellants Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul, Mr. Howard L. Lieber for Appellees Uponor, Inc. and Radiant Technology, Inc. and Mr. Shawn Michael Raiter for Appellees Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Steve Spina, Ms. Kim Spina, Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Ms. Krystal Fielstra, Mr. Paul Roth and Ms. Lynn Roth in 12-3179. Rebuttal by Mr. Michael D. Turner for Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, Mr. Michael D. Turner for Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 RECORDED [4035868] [12-2761, 12-3179] (JMM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802155874 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
          ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Howard L. Lieber for Uponor, Inc. and Radiant Technology, Inc. in 12-2761 for argument in May, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4025877] [12-2761, 12-3179] (HLL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802154737 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
            ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Shawn Michael Raiter for Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Steve Spina, Ms. Kim Spina, Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Mr. Paul Roth and Ms. Lynn Roth in 12-2761 for argument in May, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4025382] [12-2761, 12-3179] (SMR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802154551 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
              ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Michael D. Turner for Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, Mr. Michael D. Turner for Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 for argument in May, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4025281] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802114011 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by. w/service 02/14/2013 , Length: 6803 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Bonnie Abbott, Toney Abbott, Alberto Aguilar, Irma Aguilar, Steven A. Archangel, Alejandro Camarena, Monica Camarena, Evelyn Candido, Luis Carillo, Jaime Cubides, Marta Cubides, Verna Culp, Louise Ellis, Rosario Lopez, Monica McCulloch, Angel Morales, Micaela Negrete, Sylvia O'Neal, Todd O'Neal, Oscar Ortega, John Parrett, Roberto Perez, Henry Pimentel, Gerardo Rivera, Daniel Saenz, Gregorio Sanchez, Marisol Sanchez, Cassandra Smith, Laura Spindola, Wilber Torres, Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Luis Zapata, Raul Zelaya, Jose Zul and Lucila Zul due 02/20/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4005558] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802113768 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                  REPLY brief of Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4005421] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802101338 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                    LETTER from Appellees Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Ms. Krystal Fielstra, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Ms. Lynn Roth, Mr. Paul Roth, Ms. Kim Spina and Mr. Steve Spina in 12-2761, 12-3179 regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 01/29/2013 [3999182] [12-2761, 12-3179] (SMR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802100263 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                      LETTER from Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 01/28/2013 [3998657] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802099991 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK ORDER: Granting [3998448-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel. However, no further extensions will be granted. Reply brief of Bonnie Abbott, et al., due 02/14/2013 [3998530] [12-2761, 12-3179] (CAH)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802099820 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/14/2013 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 w/service 01/28/2013. [3998448] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802088909 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                            CLERK ORDER:Granting [3993254-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel. Reply brief of Bonnie Abbott, Toney Abbott, Alberto Aguilar, Irma Aguilar, Steven A. Archangel, Alejandro Camarena, Monica Camarena, Evelyn Candido, Luis Carillo, Jaime Cubides, Marta Cubides, Verna Culp, Louise Ellis, Rosario Lopez, Monica McCulloch, Angel Morales, Micaela Negrete, Sylvia O'Neal, Todd O'Neal, Oscar Ortega, John Parrett, Roberto Perez, Henry Pimentel, Gerardo Rivera, Daniel Saenz, Gregorio Sanchez, Marisol Sanchez, Cassandra Smith, Laura Spindola, Wilber Torres, Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Luis Zapata, Raul Zelaya, Jose Zul and Lucila Zul due 01/31/2013 [3993277] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802088849 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/31/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 w/service 01/10/2013. [3993254] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802082546 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Ms. Krystal Fielstra, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Ms. Lynn Roth, Mr. Paul Roth, Ms. Kim Spina and Mr. Steve Spina in 12-2761, 12-3179, w/service 12/26/2012 , Length: 13,732 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Carl Fielstra III, Krystal Fielstra, Jay Livermont, Mary Livermont, Helen McGregor, John McGregor, Charles Perrone, Lynn Roth, Paul Roth, Kim Spina and Steve Spina due 01/08/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Bonnie Abbott, Toney Abbott, Alberto Aguilar, Irma Aguilar, Steven A. Archangel, Alejandro Camarena, Monica Camarena, Evelyn Candido, Luis Carillo, Jaime Cubides, Marta Cubides, Verna Culp, Louise Ellis, Rosario Lopez, Monica McCulloch, Angel Morales, Micaela Negrete, Sylvia O'Neal, Todd O'Neal, Oscar Ortega, John Parrett, Roberto Perez, Henry Pimentel, Gerardo Rivera, Daniel Saenz, Gregorio Sanchez, Marisol Sanchez, Cassandra Smith, Laura Spindola, Wilber Torres, Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Luis Zapata, Raul Zelaya, Jose Zul and Lucila Zul due on 01/17/2013. [3990271] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802082494 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Radiant Technology, Inc. and Uponor, Inc. in 12-2761, 12-3179, w/service 12/26/2012 , Length: 7419 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Radiant Technology, Inc. and Uponor, Inc. due 01/08/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [3990244] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802079211 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                    APPELLEE brief of Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Ms. Krystal Fielstra, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Ms. Lynn Roth, Mr. Paul Roth, Ms. Kim Spina and Mr. Steve Spina in 12-3179 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3988666] [12-3179, 12-2761] (SMR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802079121 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                      Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Shawn Michael Raiter for Appellees Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Steve Spina, Ms. Kim Spina, Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Mr. Paul Roth and Ms. Lynn Roth in 12-2761 and 12-3179. [3988621] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802078677 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                        APPELLEE brief of Radiant Technology, Inc. and Uponor, Inc. in 12-2761 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3988423] [12-3179, 12-2761] (HLL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802078662 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                          APPELLEE brief of Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Ms. Krystal Fielstra, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Ms. Lynn Roth, Mr. Paul Roth, Ms. Kim Spina and Mr. Steve Spina in 12-3179 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3988415] [12-3179, 12-2761] (SMR)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802078634 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            APPEARANCE filed by Joshua J. Whiteside for Appellees Radiant Technology, Inc. and Uponor, Inc. w/service 12/26/2012 [3988405] [12-3179] (JJW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802078395 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                              APPELLEE brief of Radiant Technology, Inc. and Uponor, Inc. in 12-3179 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3988302] [12-2761, 12-3179] (HLL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802061933 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [3980617-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David Stephen Evinger. Brief of Carl Fielstra III, Krystal Fielstra, Jay Livermont, Mary Livermont, Helen McGregor, John McGregor, Charles Perrone, Radiant Technology, Inc., Lynn Roth, Paul Roth, Kim Spina, Steve Spina and Uponor, Inc. due 12/26/2012.; [3980659] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802061823 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/26/2012 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. David Stephen Evinger for Appellee Uponor, Inc. in 12-2761 w/service 12/03/2012. [3980617] [12-3179, 12-2761] (DSE)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802061664 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE filed by David S. Evinger for Appellee Uponor, Inc. w/service 12/03/2012 [3980519] [12-3179] (DSE)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802045540 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                      ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179. w/service 11/08/2012 [3972795] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802044585 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 [3972353] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802044488 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179. w/service 11/05/2012 , Length: 13,997 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Bonnie Abbott, Toney Abbott, Alberto Aguilar, Irma Aguilar, Steven A. Archangel, Alejandro Camarena, Monica Camarena, Evelyn Candido, Luis Carillo, Jaime Cubides, Marta Cubides, Verna Culp, Louise Ellis, Rosario Lopez, Monica McCulloch, Angel Morales, Micaela Negrete, Sylvia O'Neal, Todd O'Neal, Oscar Ortega, John Parrett, Roberto Perez, Charles Perrone, Henry Pimentel, Gerardo Rivera, Daniel Saenz, Gregorio Sanchez, Marisol Sanchez, Cassandra Smith, Laura Spindola, Wilber Torres, Uponor, Inc., F1807 Plumbing Fittings Products Liability Litigation, Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Luis Zapata, Raul Zelaya, Jose Zul and Lucila Zul due 11/13/2012 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs.. Brief of Carl Fielstra III, Krystal Fielstra, Jay Livermont, Mary Livermont, Helen McGregor, John McGregor, Charles Perrone, Radiant Technology, Inc., Lynn Roth, Paul Roth, Kim Spina, Steve Spina and Uponor, Inc. due on 12/07/2012 [3972308] [12-2761, 12-3179] (YML)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802044450 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761. New electronic copy of addendum due on 11/13/2012 [3972280] [12-2761, 12-3179] (YML)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802043194 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 [3971669] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802043188 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                APPELLANT brief of Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [3971667] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802015428 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179. Transcript ordered 09/17/12 [3958506] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802015419 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179 - Separate Appendix w/service 09/28/2012 [3958503] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802015121 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      JUDGE ORDER: Upon consideration of Appellants' motion for stay of the bond order, Appellees' Opposition, and Appellants' Reply, the motion for immediate stay of the district court's bond order is granted in part: the requirement that Appellants post an appeal bond in excess of $25,000 is stayed pending appeal; in all other respects, the motion for immediate relief is denied. [3955976-2] Adp Sep 2012 [3958349] [12-2761, 12-3179] (MDS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802013356 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Graham B. LippSmith for Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul w/service 09/26/2012 [3957459] [12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802012118 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY to response , [3956351-2], filed by Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, 12-3179. w/service 09/25/2012. [3956883] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802010997 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay, [3955976-2], motion for miscellaneous relief, [3955976-3], motion for an expedited appeal, [3955976-4], motion for expedited hearing, [3955976-5] filed by Attorney Mr. Shawn Michael Raiter for Appellees Mr. John McGregor, Mr. Helen McGregor, Mr. Charles Perrone, Mr. Jay Livermont, Ms. Mary Livermont, Mr. Steve Spina, Ms. Kim Spina, Mr. Carl Fielstra, III, Mr. Paul Roth and Ms. Lynn Roth in 12-2761 , w/service 09/24/2012. [3956351] [12-2761, 12-3179] (SMR)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802010196 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for temporary stay, Immediate stay of appeal bond order and modification of appeal bond amount, or, alternatively, stay of appeal bond order pending full briefing and oral argument and expedite briefing and oral argument on appeal of appeal bond order, for an expedited appeal, for an expedited hearing, filed by Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Mr. Oscar Ortega, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-2761, Attorney Mr. Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Kenneth Wright, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. Toney Abbott, Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 w/service 09/21/2012. [3955976] [12-2761, 12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802007441 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                APPELLANT'S FORM A FILED from Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179 [3954646] [12-3179, 12-2761] (BMZ)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802007438 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul in 12-3179. - FOR CAL. [3954645] [12-3179, 12-2761] (BMZ)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802007435 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Kenneth S. Kasdan for Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul w/service 09/18/2012 [3954644] [12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802007432 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Michael D. Turner for Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul w/service 09/18/2012 [3954643] [12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802007429 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Bryan M. Zuetel for Appellants Ms. Bonnie Abbott, Mr. Toney Abbott, Mr. Alberto Aguilar, Ms. Irma Aguilar, Mr. Steven A. Archangel, Mr. Alejandro Camarena, Ms. Monica Camarena, Ms. Evelyn Candido, Mr. Luis Carillo, Mr. Jaime Cubides, Ms. Marta Cubides, Ms. Verna Culp, Ms. Louise Ellis, Ms. Rosario Lopez, Ms. Monica McCulloch, Mr. Angel Morales, Ms. Micaela Negrete, Ms. Sylvia O'Neal, Mr. Todd O'Neal, Mr. Oscar Ortega, Mr. John Parrett, Mr. Roberto Perez, Mr. Henry Pimentel, Mr. Gerardo Rivera, Mr. Daniel Saenz, Mr. Gregorio Sanchez, Ms. Marisol Sanchez, Ms. Cassandra Smith, Ms. Laura Spindola, Mr. Wilber Torres, Ms. Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Mr. Luis Zapata, Mr. Raul Zelaya, Mr. Jose Zul and Ms. Lucila Zul w/service 09/18/2012 [3954642] [12-3179] (BMZ)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802004963 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/24/2012. Appendix due 11/05/2012. BRIEF APPELLANT, Bonnie Abbott, Toney Abbott, Alberto Aguilar, Irma Aguilar, Steven A. Archangel, Alejandro Camarena, Monica Camarena, Evelyn Candido, Luis Carillo, Jaime Cubides, Marta Cubides, Verna Culp, Louise Ellis, Rosario Lopez, Monica McCulloch, Angel Morales, Micaela Negrete, Sylvia O'Neal, Todd O'Neal, Oscar Ortega, John Parrett, Roberto Perez, Henry Pimentel, Gerardo Rivera, Daniel Saenz, Gregorio Sanchez, Marisol Sanchez, Cassandra Smith, Laura Spindola, Wilber Torres, Debra Wright, Kenneth Wright, Luis Zapata, Raul Zelaya, Jose Zul and Lucila Zul due 11/05/2012 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [3953388] [12-2761, 12-3179] (CYZ)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802004887 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 9/11/12 [3953360] [12-3179] (CYZ)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802004884 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Civil case docketed. [3953354] [12-3179] (CYZ)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?