TCYK, LLC v. Doe 30
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-02209
District Judge Mary S. Scriven, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 9:54 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Doe 30, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Bradford A Patrick Pa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder bap@baplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Copyright Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/6/2014. (APV) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: 1/20/2014 Notice of voluntary dismissal
      NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by TCYK, LLC (Yant, Catherine)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Amended Attorney Appearance by Bradford A. Patrick on behalf of Doe 30 (Patrick, Bradford)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford A. Patrick on behalf of Doe 30 (Patrick, Bradford) Item terminated. See 10 . Counsel's office notified by telephone on 11/22/13 that this item has wrong defendant's name. Counsel refiled. See docket number 10 .
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve non-party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins on 10/21/2013. (RAS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
              MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Interested persons orderCourt Filing
                INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/24/2013. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/10/2013. (APV)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
                  RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/24/2013. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/10/2013. (APV)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                    NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (DG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                        Copyright Report sent to Washington. (DG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2013: # 1 Main Document, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DG). (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against Doe 30 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-19056) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 170 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?