TCYK, LLC v. Doe 145
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-02213
District Judge James S. Moody, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 25, 2016 at 8:37 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Doe 145, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Copyright Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/17/2014. (LN)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [6] Motion for Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/3/2013. (LN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 (f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
            NOTICE of pendency of related cases re [4] Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
              RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2013. (SMB) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                Copyright Report sent to Washington. (DMS) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (DMS) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against Doe 145 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number TPA19052) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DMS) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 140 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?