Brady Adams v. Biolase, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01300
District Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 19, 2016 at 12:45 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brady Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Blasy +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 mblasy@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Walton +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 davew@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Biolase, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Biffar +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 tbiffar@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra N Fries +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 afries@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neil Landau +1 949 851 3939 elandau@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hugh Logan +1 949 553 7529 klogan@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Gallagher +1 415 315 6369 +1 415 315 4848 richard.gallagher@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky C. Tsai +1 415 315 6358 +1 415 315 6350 rocky.tsai@ropesgray.com
No Logo Federico Pignatelli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Biffar +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 tbiffar@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra N Fries +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 afries@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neil Landau +1 949 851 3939 elandau@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hugh Logan +1 949 553 7529 klogan@jonesday.com
No Logo Frederick D Furry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Biffar +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 tbiffar@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra N Fries +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 afries@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Neil Landau +1 949 851 3939 elandau@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hugh Logan +1 949 553 7529 klogan@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Gallagher +1 415 315 6369 +1 415 315 4848 richard.gallagher@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky C. Tsai +1 415 315 6358 +1 415 315 6350 rocky.tsai@ropesgray.com
No Logo Alexander K Arrow, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Biffar +1 949 851 3939 +1 949 553 7539 tbiffar@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Gallagher +1 415 315 6369 +1 415 315 4848 richard.gallagher@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky C. Tsai +1 415 315 6358 +1 415 315 6350 rocky.tsai@ropesgray.com
No Logo David T. Long, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordanna G Thigpen +1 310 975 1080 +1 310 975 1095 jthigpen@jjllplaw.com
No Logo John D. MacGregor, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Arroyo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory E. Del Gaizo +1 619 525 3990 gdelgaizo@robbinsarroyo.com
No Logo paul gabriel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Pradeep Khurana, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Haber +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 haber@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wagner Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Avraham Noam Wagner +1 310 491 7949 avi@thewagnerfirm.com
No Logo Ralph Divizio, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wagner Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Avraham Noam Wagner +1 310 491 7949 avi@thewagnerfirm.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 101 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Emails from Abid and Traute Barth)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 105 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 11-3.8 re: Lacking name, address, phone, facsimile numbers, and e-mail address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 101 , Affidavit,,,, 103 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 102 served on June 22, 2016. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Affidavit 103 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 11-3.8 re: Lacking name, address, phone, facsimile numbers, and e-mail address. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Tina Chiango re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 101 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Authorized Claimants, # 2 Exhibit B - Eligible Claimants, # 3 Exhibit C - Rejected Claims, # 4 Exhibit D - Barth Claim Form, # 5 Exhibit E - Biolase Price History, # 6 Exhibit F - Deficiency Letter, # 7 Exhibit G - Deficiency Letter, # 8 Exhibit H - Letter from Abid Barth, # 9 Exhibit I - Letter from Claims Administrator, # 10 Exhibit J - Letter from Abid Barth, # 11 Exhibit K - Letter from Traute Barth, # 12 Exhibit L - Letter from Claims Administrator, # 13 Exhibit M - Letter from Traute Barth, # 14 Exhibit N - Letter from Claims Administrator, # 15 Exhibit O - Letter from Abid Barth, # 16 Exhibit P - Letter from Traute Barth, # 17 Exhibit Q - Letter from Claims Administrator, # 18 Exhibit R - Email from Traute Barth, # 19 Exhibit S - Email from Abid Barth, # 20 Exhibit T - Claims Administration Fees and Costs)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 101 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - In re LJ International Order, # 2 Exhibit B - In re Micromuse Order)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Avi N Wagner counsel for Movant Pradeep Khurana. Jeffrey M. Haber is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Plan of Allocation, and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 86 , Motion Hearing 96 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Continued Objection to Claims Administrator filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claims Administrator Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Transaction History, # 3 Exhibit C - Letter to Claimant)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Plan of Allocation, and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 86 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lwag) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Objection filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objection)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Josephine L. Staton, ORDERING Motion-Complaint Against Claims Administrator submitted Arun Kumar Bhattacharya received on 8/17/2015 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.5 No letters to the judge; Plaintiff is currently represented by counsel. (lwag) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None For Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Approving Lead Counsel's Proposal of Cy Pres Recipient for Remaining Settlement Funds 81 and Vacating Hearing Set for August 28, 2015 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lead Counsel's proposal of Loyola University's Institute for Investor Protection (the "Institute") as the cy pres recipient for the unclaimed remainder of the Net Settlement Fund is APPROVED. (Doc. 81.) The hearing on this issue set for August 28, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED. (lwag) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rocky C Tsai on behalf of Consol Defendant Alexander K Arrow, Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry (Attorney Rocky C Tsai added to party Alexander K Arrow(pty:condft), Attorney Rocky C Tsai added to party Biolase, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Rocky C Tsai added to party Frederick D Furry(pty:dft))(Tsai, Rocky) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Memorandum in Support of Motion 73 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of - Preliminary Approval of Settlement 72 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, # 2 Exhibit A-1 - Long Form Notice, # 3 Exhibit A-2 - Proof of Claim, # 4 Exhibit A-3 - Publication Notice, # 5 Exhibit A to Brief - In re China Medicine, # 6 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Judgment and Order, # 7 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Settlement)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN CONFIRMATORY DISCOVERY 70 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. **NOTE: Changes Made by the Court.** See Order for details. (es) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION for Order to Govern the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information in Confirmatory Discovery filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Richard Lawrence Gallagher in placed on Attorneys Eric Landau, Travis Biffar, Kevin Logan and Alexandra Fires of Jones Day for Defendant Frederick D Furry. (mt) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Richard Lawrence Gallagher in placed of Attorneys Eric Landau, Travis Biffar, Kevin Logan and Alexandra Fires of Jones Day for Defendant Biolase, Inc. 67 (mt) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Order Order Taking Motions to Dismiss Off Calendar filed by Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Taking Motions to Dismiss Off Calendar, # 2 Proof of Service)(Landau, Eric) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, granting Stipulation to Continue 61 . The hearings re Motion originally scheduled have been rescheduled. The Scheduling Conference set for October 10, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. isVACATED.( Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.) (twdb) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference from September 26, 2014 and October 10, 2014 to October 10, 2014 and TBD by Court, Respectively, filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/16/2014, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatellito Request for Judicial Notice 56 Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice (Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE and Statement of Non-Opposition filed by Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 42 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proxy Statement, # 2 Exhibit B: Earnings Conference Call, # 3 Exhibit C: Pretrial Brief)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 42 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric N Landau on behalf of Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli (Attorney Eric N Landau added to party Biolase, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Eric N Landau added to party Frederick D Furry(pty:dft), Attorney Eric N Landau added to party Federico Pignatelli(pty:dft))(Landau, Eric) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mary K Blasy counsel for Plaintiff Brady Adams. Mary K. Blasy will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.Mary K. Blasy is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Brady Adams. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David C Walton counsel for Plaintiff Brady Adams. David C. Walton will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice.David C. Walton is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Brady Adams. (Walton, David) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra Nicole Fries on behalf of Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli (Attorney Alexandra Nicole Fries added to party Biolase, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Nicole Fries added to party Frederick D Furry(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Nicole Fries added to party Federico Pignatelli(pty:dft))(Fries, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin Hugh Logan on behalf of Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli (Attorney Kevin Hugh Logan added to party Biolase, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Hugh Logan added to party Frederick D Furry(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Hugh Logan added to party Federico Pignatelli(pty:dft))(Logan, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, granting Stipulation to Reschedule on motion to dismiss consolidated complaint 46 . (twdb) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Reschedule Briefing filed by defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Travis Biffar ISO Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order re Stipulation)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting 43 Request to Substitute Attorney Alexander K. Arrow. Attorney Travis Biffar terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Scheduling Conference is set for October 10, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Corrected REQUEST to Substitute attorney Richard Gallagher in place of attorney Travis Biffar filed by Co-defendant Alexander K Arrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order Granting MTD, # 3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Declaration of Travis Biffar ISO RJN, # 5 Exhibit (Part 1) to Dec of Travis Biffar, # 6 Exhibit (Part 2) to Dec of Travis Biffar, # 7 Proposed Order ISO RJN)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Alexander K Arrow. (Attorney Richard Lawrence Gallagher added to party Alexander K Arrow(pty:condft))(Gallagher, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST to Substitute attorney Richard Gallagher in place of attorney Travis Biffar filed by Defendant Alexander K Arrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 38 . (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Alexander K Arrow, Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Travis Biffar, # 2 Proposed Order)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Ira Fistel, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Brady Adams. Michael I. Fistel, Jr. is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brady Adams. (Attorney Michael Ira Fistel, Jr added to party Brady Adams(pty:pla))(Fistel, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT related to: 1 Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting 34 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey Haber on behalf of plaintiff, designating Avi Wagner as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Jeffrey M. Haber to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13397988 paid.) filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton Expanding Lead Plaintiff's Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint 32 . Lead Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint by 02/24/14. Defendant shall respond no later than 60 days after the filing of the Amended Complaint. (nbo) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Lead Plaintiff Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Time To File Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting Motion to Consolidate Related Cases, Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Approve of Selection of Counsel 15 , 18 , 21 . 8:13-cv-01300-JLS-(FFMx) and 8:13-cv-01317-JLS (FFMx) are to beconsolidated for all purposes, including trial, under 8:13-cv-01300-JLS-(FFMx), and shall bear the following caption: (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Motion to Consolidate Cases,, 15 filed by movant paul gabriel. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Interested Parties filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana, identifying Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 [Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Pradeep Khurana's Motion to Consolidate Related Cases, Be Appointed As Lead Plaintiff, and For Approval of His Choice of Counsel, and In Opposition to Competing Motions] filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-01300-JLS-FFM and 13-01317-JLS-FFM, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 21 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Motion ot Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15 , MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-1317, 13 filed by Movant John D. MacGregor. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate Cases, 13 filed by Interested Party David T. Long. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-01300-JLS-FFM and 13-01317-JLS-FFM, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 21 , Declaration (Motion related), 17 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 16 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 22 , Declaration (Motion related), 23 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Motion ot Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 19 , Declaration (Motion related), 20 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): Certification of Interested Parties needed for movants.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dro) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gregory E. Del Gaizo in Support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-01300-JLS-FFM and 13-01317-JLS-FFM, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 21 filed by Movant John D. MacGregor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-01300-JLS-FFM and 13-01317-JLS-FFM, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 21 filed by Movant John D. MacGregor. (Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-01300-JLS-FFM and 13-01317-JLS-FFM,, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant John D. MacGregor. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Del Gaizo, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Avi Wagner in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B -Movant Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Bernstein Liebhard Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit E - Wagner Firm Resume)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, 18 filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff ( Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.), MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-cv-1300-JLS-FFM and 13-cv-1317-JLS-FFM, filed by Movant Pradeep Khurana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Avi) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Laurence Rosen in support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Motion ot Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15 filed by Movant paul gabriel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Declaration 4)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Motion ot Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 15 filed by Movant paul gabriel. (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Motion ot Appoint Lead Plaintiff ( Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.), MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant paul gabriel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Interested Party David T. Long, re MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-1317, 13 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 12 served on 10/22/13. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 13-1317, filed by Interested Party David T. Long. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Jordanna Thigpen with Exhibits A-D, # 3 Proposed Order)(Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Interested Party David T. Long, identifying David T. Long. (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jordanna G Thigpen on behalf of Interested Party David T. Long (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Josephine Staton Tucker has restored her former name, which is Josephine L. Staton. On all documents filed in this case on or after October 1, 2013, substitute the initials JLS after the case number in place of JST. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ehu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer and extablishing a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss 7 , by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. (twdb) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of Interested Parties (Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Summons Issued 2 , Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, Federico Pignatelli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint And Establishing A Briefing Schedule)(Biffar, Travis) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE STATON TUCKER. (Guerrero, Terry) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Michael I. Fistel, Jr and Marshall P. Dees for Plaintiff Brady Adams (nbo) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(nbo) (nbo). (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brady Adams. (nbo) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, and Federico Pignatelli. (nbo) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Defendants Biolase, Inc, Frederick D Furry, and Federico Pignatelli. Case assigned to Judge Josephine Staton Tucker for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff Brady Adams. (nbo) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?